Garvin v. The City of New York et al
Plaintiff: CLAY GARVIN
Defendant: THE CITY OF NEW YORK, CPT. M. TURNER, CPT. HALYARD, CO PARTRICK NEWLAND, CO A. NARINE, CO KARL VIALOT, CO SPIELMANN, CO K. HALL, CO LATOYA NEMBHARD, CO MAN, CO ZUREYLS LANTINGUA, CO PRIOLEAU, JOHN/JANE DOES 1-5 and CO Patrick Newland
Case Number: 1:2023cv10314
Filed: November 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2024 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. CO A. Narine served on 1/10/2024, answer due 1/31/2024; CO K. Hall served on 1/10/2024, answer due 1/31/2024; CO Latoya Nembhard served on 1/10/2024, answer due 1/31/2024; CO Patrick Newland served on 1/10/2024, answer due 1/31/2024; CO Prioleau served on 1/10/2024, answer due 1/31/2024; CO Spielmann served on 1/10/2024, answer due 1/31/2024; CO Zureyls Lantingua served on 1/10/2024, answer due 1/31/2024; CPT. Halyard served on 1/10/2024, answer due 1/31/2024; CPT. M. Turner served on 1/10/2024, answer due 1/31/2024. Service was accepted by CO Glayze. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Clay Garvin..(Panousieris, Stephanie)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #10 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Seema Kassab dated December 20, 2023.. The City of New York answer due 2/20/2024 (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (Liman, Lewis)
December 20, 2023 Filing 10 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Seema Kassab dated December 20, 2023. Document filed by The City of New York..(Kassab, Seema)
December 1, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. The City of New York served on 11/29/2023, answer due 12/20/2023. Service was made by EMAIL. Document filed by Clay Garvin..(Panousieris, Stephanie)
December 1, 2023 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CO A. Narine, CO K. Hall, CO Karl Vialot, CO Latoya Nembhard, CO Man, CO Patrick Newland, CO Prioleau, CO Spielmann, CO Zureyls Lantingua, CPT. Halyard, CPT. M. Turner. (vf)
November 30, 2023 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CPT. M. TURNER; CPT. HALYARD; CO PARTRICK NEWLAND; CO A. NARINE; CO KARL VIALOT; CO SPIELMANN; CO K. HALL; CO LATOYA NEMBHARD; CO MAN; CO ZUREYLS LANTINGUA; CO PRIOLEAU, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Clay Garvin..(Panousieris, Stephanie)
November 30, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Stephanie Panousieris to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; all of the party names must be listed on the PDF case caption. If all of the party names do not fit, include 'et al'. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
November 29, 2023 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CPT. M. TURNER; CPT. HALYARD; CO PARTRICK NEWLAND; CO A. NARINE; CO KARL VIALOT; CO SPIELMANN; CO K. HALL; CO LATOYA NEMBHARD; CO MAN; CO ZUREYLS LANTINGUA; CO PRIOLEAU, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Clay Garvin..(Panousieris, Stephanie) Modified on 11/30/2023 (jgo).
November 28, 2023 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The City of New York. (vf)
November 28, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Stephanie Panousieris to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Defendant Party Name Error. Defendant party name listed on Summons and Summons Caption does not correspond exactly to pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Captain M. Turner #1155; Captain Halyard #1319; CO Patrick Newland #4308; CO A. Narine #11234; CO Karl Vialot #11420; CO Spielmann #4479; K. Hall #9761; CO Latoya Nembhard #11717; CO Man #12611; CO Zureyls Lantinga #7950; and CO Prioleau #1321, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Clay Garvin..(Panousieris, Stephanie) Modified on 11/28/2023 (vf).
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Clay Garvin..(Panousieris, Stephanie)
November 27, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Stephanie Panousieris. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: JOHN/JANE DOES 1-5, CO K. HALL, CPT. HALYARD, CO ZUREYLS LANTINGUA, CO MAN, CO A. NARINE, CO LATOYA NEMBHARD, CO PARTRICK NEWLAND, CO PRIOLEAU, CO SPIELMANN, THE CITY OF NEW YORK, CPT. M. TURNER, CO KARL VIALOT, CLAY GARVIN.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (vf)
November 27, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
November 27, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
November 27, 2023 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
November 24, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Panousieris, Stephanie)
November 24, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN/JANE DOES 1-5, CO K. HALL, CPT. HALYARD, CO ZUREYLS LANTINGUA, CO MAN, CO A. NARINE, CO LATOYA NEMBHARD, CO PARTRICK NEWLAND, CO PRIOLEAU, CO SPIELMANN, THE CITY OF NEW YORK, CPT. M. TURNER, CO KARL VIALOT. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28609967)Document filed by CLAY GARVIN..(Panousieris, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garvin v. The City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLAY GARVIN
Represented By: Stephanie Panousieris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CITY OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Seema Kassab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPT. M. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPT. HALYARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO PARTRICK NEWLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO A. NARINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO KARL VIALOT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO SPIELMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO K. HALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO LATOYA NEMBHARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO MAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO ZUREYLS LANTINGUA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO PRIOLEAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN/JANE DOES 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Patrick Newland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?