Adomni, Inc. v. CT Media, LLC
Plaintiff: Adomni, Inc.
Defendant: CT Media, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv10338
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Dale E Ho
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER By Order of Reference dated January 23, 2024 (ECF 15), Judge Dale E. Ho referred this case to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott for settlement. On January 24, 2024, that referral was reassigned to me. A settlement conference is scheduled for Tuesday, April 16, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 9B at 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY, 10007. If this date is not convenient for parties, counsel should email my chambers at TarnofskyNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov by 2/1/2024 to propose three alternative dates for a settlement conference during the week of 4/15/2024. The parties are instructed to complete the Ex Parte Settlement Conference Summary Report and prepare pre-conference submissions in accordance with my Individual Rules of Practice. Pre-conference submissions must be received no later than Tuesday, April 9, 2024, at 5:00 p.m. Corporate parties must send the person with decision-making authority to settle the matter to the conference. If attending in person presents a hardship for any party, they may submit a letter on the docket explaining the situation and the reasons why they believe the settlement conference should be held remotely. SO ORDERED. (Settlement Conference set for 4/16/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky on 1/25/2024) (jca)
January 24, 2024 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF A REFERRAL TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The referral in the above entitled action has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky, for Settlement. Magistrate Judge James L. Cott no longer referred to the case. (laq)
January 24, 2024 Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is so redesignated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. (laq)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the initial pretrial conference is CANCELLED. If the parties wish to proceed with the conference, they shall promptly file a letter on ECF so the conference can be reinstated on the Court's calendar. The case management plan and scheduling order, as well as the requested settlement referral, will issue separately. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 1/23/24) (yv)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 1/23/24) (yv)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER : All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are free to withhold consent without any adverse substantive consequences. The case is not to be tried to a jury. Motions due by 3/1/2024. Deposition due by 7/15/2024. Fact Discovery due by 5/31/2024. Expert Discovery due by 7/15/2024. Telephone Conference set for 8/1/2024 at 10:30 AM before Judge Dale E. Ho. The parties shall join the conference by dialing (646) 453-4442 and entering the conference ID: 969 392 222, followed by the pound sign (#). Counsel for the parties have conferred and their best estimate of the length of trial is 2 days. SO ORDERED. Pretrial Order due by 8/16/2024. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 1/23/24) (yv)
January 23, 2024 Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Dale E. Ho from Richard S. Mandel dated January 23, 2024 re: proposed Case Management Plan. Document filed by Adomni, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order).(Mandel, Richard)
January 19, 2024 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Adomni, Inc.. Document filed by CT Media, LLC..(Matalon, Howard)
January 19, 2024 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by CT Media, LLC..(Matalon, Howard)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned attorneys that the time within which Defendant CT Media, LLC may move, answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby extended up to and including Friday, January 19, 2024. There have been no previous requests for an extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Application GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is adjourned to January 19, 2024, at 11:59 p.m. (E.T.). SO ORDERED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to terminate ECF No. 9., Motions terminated: #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . filed by CT Media, LLC. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 12/18/2023) (ks)
December 15, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . Document filed by CT Media, LLC..(Matalon, Howard)
December 13, 2023 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Court's Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference served on CT Media LLC on December 12, 2023. Service was accepted by Sean Rose, Counsel. Document filed by Adomni, Inc...(Mandel, Richard)
December 5, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. CT Media, LLC served on 11/29/2023, answer due 12/20/2023. Service was accepted by Kelsey Flemmings, registered agent clerk. Document filed by Adomni, Inc...(Mandel, Richard)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/1/2024 at 11:30 AM before Judge Dale E. Ho. The conference will be held via Microsoft Teams. The parties should dial in by calling (646) 453-4442 and entering the Phone Conference ID: 955 651 620, followed by the pound (#) sign. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 11/29/2023) (ks)
November 28, 2023 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CT Media, LLC..(pc)
November 28, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Dale E. Ho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
November 28, 2023 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
November 28, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 28, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Richard Stephen Mandel. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Plaintiff code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CT Media, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Adomni, Inc...(Mandel, Richard)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Adomni, Inc...(Mandel, Richard)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mandel, Richard)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CT Media, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28614115)Document filed by Adomni, Inc...(Mandel, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adomni, Inc. v. CT Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adomni, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Stephen Mandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CT Media, LLC
Represented By: Howard A Matalon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?