Goldstein v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Esther Goldstein
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Credit One Bank
Case Number: 1:2023cv10342
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Rochon
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The request for an extension of time to respond to the Complaint until January 31, 2024, is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 1/16/2024) (jca)
January 16, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: Credit One Bank answer due 1/31/2024. (jca)
January 12, 2024 Filing 10 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Blaec C. Croft dated 1/12/2024. Document filed by Credit One Bank..(Croft, Blaec)
December 28, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024. Document filed by Esther Goldstein..(Saland, Tamir)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint or Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Blaec C. Croft dated December 21, 2023. The requested extension of time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint until January 17, 2024, is GRANTED. Credit One Bank answer due 1/17/2024. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 12/21/2023) (jca)
December 21, 2023 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint or Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Blaec C. Croft dated December 21, 2023. Document filed by Credit One Bank..(Croft, Blaec)
December 7, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Credit One Bank served on 12/6/2023, answer due 12/27/2023. Service was accepted by Melissa R. Carias.. Document filed by Esther Goldstein..(Saland, Tamir)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/27/2024 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 20B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 11/29/2023) (jca)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Credit One Bank..(pc)
November 28, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
November 28, 2023 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
November 28, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Credit One Bank, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Esther Goldstein..(Saland, Tamir)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Saland, Tamir)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Credit One Bank, Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28614912)Document filed by Esther Goldstein..(Saland, Tamir)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldstein v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esther Goldstein
Represented By: Tamir Saland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit One Bank
Represented By: Blaec C Croft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?