Castro v. Designs on Fifth, LTD et al
Plaintiff: Juan Castro
Defendant: Designs on Fifth, LTD and David Ambalo
Case Number: 1:2023cv10351
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 2/5/2024. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/29/2023) (rpr)
January 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #14 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the #1 Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Theo E.M. Gould dated January 12, 2024., #1 Complaint. Time to respond to the complaint extended to 2/9/24. So Ordered. David Ambalo answer due 2/9/2024; Designs on Fifth, LTD answer due 2/9/2024. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 1/15/2024) (rro)
January 12, 2024 Filing 14 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the #1 Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Theo E.M. Gould dated January 12, 2024. Document filed by David Ambalo, Designs on Fifth, LTD..(Gould, Theo)
January 12, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Theo E. M. Gould on behalf of David Ambalo, Designs on Fifth, LTD..(Gould, Theo)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Accordingly, the plaintiff is directed to file a proposed order to show cause for a default judgment in accordance with the Local Rules and this Court's Individual Practices by January 26, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 1/12/2024) (ks)
January 2, 2024 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of COURT'S ORDER served on DESIGNS ON FIFTH, LTD and DAVID AMBALO on 1/2/24. Service was made by MAIL -- SEE ATTACHED RECEIPTS. Document filed by Juan Castro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tracking Number USCIS Receipt).(Stillman, Lina)
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a), the time for the defendants to answer was December 26, 2023. To date, no answer has been filed.The time for the defendants to answer or respond to the complaint is extended to January 9, 2024. Failure to respond to the complaint by this date could result in a default judgment being entered against the defendants. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this Order on the defendants and to file proof of such service on the docket by January 2, 2024. SO ORDERED., David Ambalo answer due 1/9/2024; Designs on Fifth, LTD answer due 1/9/2024. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/29/2023) (ama)
December 27, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Designs on Fifth, LTD served on 12/4/2023, answer due 12/26/2023. Service was accepted by DAVID AMBALO, Personally. Document filed by Juan Castro..(Stillman, Lina)
December 27, 2023 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Designs on Fifth, LTD, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Juan Castro..(Stillman, Lina) Modified on 12/28/2023 (pc).
December 27, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. David Ambalo served on 12/4/2023, answer due 12/26/2023. Service was accepted by DAVID AMBALO, Personally. Document filed by Juan Castro..(Stillman, Lina)
November 30, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 4/4/2024 at 12:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie)
November 28, 2023 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Stillman, Lina)
November 28, 2023 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Ambalo, Designs on Fifth, LTD. (vf)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Stillman, Lina) Modified on 11/28/2023 (vf).
November 28, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Lina Stillman to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Form is blank. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
November 28, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lina Stillman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: David Ambalo. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf)
November 28, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lina Stillman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act; Fee Status code pend (IFP pending). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:216(b) FLSA: Minimum wage or overtime compensation; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (vf)
November 28, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Lina Stillman to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Signature Error. Form is not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
November 28, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
November 28, 2023 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
November 28, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT BLANK FORM - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Stillman, Lina) Modified on 11/28/2023 (vf).
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DESIGNS ON FIFTH, LTD and DAVID AMBALO, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Juan Castro..(Stillman, Lina)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Ambalo, Designs on Fifth, LTD. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28615997)Document filed by Juan Castro..(Stillman, Lina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castro v. Designs on Fifth, LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Castro
Represented By: Lina Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Designs on Fifth, LTD
Represented By: Theo E. M. Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ambalo
Represented By: Theo E. M. Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?