Zia Furs LLC v. Capital One Bank (USA), Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Zia Furs LLC
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), Inc. and John and Jane Does 1-15
Case Number: 1:2023cv10419
Filed: November 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1693 ef Electronic Fund Transfer Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion) addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Philip A. Goldstein dated January 26, 2024. Document filed by Capital One Bank (USA), Inc...(Goldstein, Philip)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Philip A. Goldstein dated December 20, 2023. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/20/2023) Capital One Bank (USA), Inc. answer due 1/26/2024 (ks)
December 20, 2023 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corporation for Capital One Bank (USA), Inc.. Document filed by Capital One Bank (USA), Inc...(Goldstein, Philip)
December 20, 2023 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Philip A. Goldstein dated December 20, 2023. Document filed by Capital One Bank (USA), Inc...(Goldstein, Philip)
December 20, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Philip A. Goldstein on behalf of Capital One Bank (USA), Inc...(Goldstein, Philip)
November 30, 2023 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gamarello, Thomas)
November 30, 2023 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Capital One Bank (USA), Inc.. (vf)
November 30, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 4/4/2024 at 03:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie)
November 30, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
November 30, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Thomas Nicholas Gamarello. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
November 30, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
November 30, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Thomas Nicholas Gamarello. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Rockland. (vf)
November 30, 2023 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
November 29, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Capital One Bank (USA), Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Zia Furs LLC..(Gamarello, Thomas)
November 29, 2023 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Zia Furs LLC..(Gamarello, Thomas)
November 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capital One Bank (USA), Inc., John and Jane Does 1-15. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28626104)Document filed by Zia Furs LLC..(Gamarello, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zia Furs LLC v. Capital One Bank (USA), Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zia Furs LLC
Represented By: Thomas Nicholas Gamarello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Philip A. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?