Gillings v. Manhattan North Management Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Shaka Gillings
Defendant: Manhattan North Management Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv10453
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2024 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 2/7/2024.(sge)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 1/19/2024. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/10/2019) (rpr)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Laurent S. Drogin, Esq. dated January 2, 2024., #1 Complaint. Application GRANTED. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby ADJOURNED to February 2, 2024. The Court notes, however, that the Affidavit of Service filed at docket entry 5 indicates that Defendant was served with the Complaint on December 4, 2023, which would have rendered the deadline for Defendant's response December 26, 2023. Accordingly, the Court will construe Defendant's request as one for an extension nunc pro tunc. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at docket entry 8. Manhattan North Management Company, Inc. answer due 2/2/2024. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/3/2024) (rro)
January 2, 2024 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Laurent S. Drogin, Esq. dated January 2, 2024. Document filed by Manhattan North Management Company, Inc...(Drogin, Laurent)
January 2, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Zack Sharpe, IV on behalf of Manhattan North Management Company, Inc...(Sharpe, Zack)
January 2, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laurent Scott Drogin on behalf of Manhattan North Management Company, Inc...(Drogin, Laurent)
December 4, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Manhattan North Management Company, Inc. served on 12/4/2023, answer due 12/26/2023. Service was accepted by New York Secretary of State. Document filed by Shaka Gillings..(Hassan, Abdul)
December 1, 2023 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Manhattan North Management Company, Inc.. (vf)
December 1, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Abdul Karim Hassan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:216(b) FLSA: Minimum wage or overtime compensation; the County code has been modified to Queens. (vf)
December 1, 2023 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
December 1, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
December 1, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
November 30, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hassan, Abdul)
November 30, 2023 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Manhattan North Management Company, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Shaka Gillings..(Hassan, Abdul)
November 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Manhattan North Management Company, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28630491)Document filed by Shaka Gillings..(Hassan, Abdul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gillings v. Manhattan North Management Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaka Gillings
Represented By: Abdul Karim Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manhattan North Management Company, Inc.
Represented By: Laurent Scott Drogin
Represented By: Zack Sharpe, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?