Sanchez et al v. O.E. Contracting Solutions LLC et al
Plaintiff: Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez, Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez, Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos, Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz and Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca
Defendant: O.E. Contracting Solutions LLC and Wilfredo Garcia
Case Number: 1:2023cv10463
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 fl Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. O.E. Contracting Solutions LLC served on 12/13/2023, answer due 1/3/2024. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty. Document filed by Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez(on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Avshalumov, Roman)
December 1, 2023 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wilfredo Garcia, O.E. Contracting Solutions LLC..(pc)
December 1, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Roman Mikhail Avshalumov. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez, Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz, Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos, Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez, Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
December 1, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Roman Mikhail Avshalumov re: Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Add Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez, Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz, Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos, Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez, Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca to CM ECF with the party text "on behalf of all others similarly situated". Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (pc)
December 1, 2023 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos, Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez, Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz, Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez, Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca, Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez, Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz, Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca, Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez, Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos, Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez, Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz, Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez, Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca, Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez, Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz, Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca, Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez, Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Avshalumov, Roman)
December 1, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 1, 2023 Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
December 1, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
November 30, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Avraham Y. Scher on behalf of Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos, Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz, Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca, Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez, Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez..(Scher, Avraham)
November 30, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Patrick Peter O'Donnell on behalf of Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos, Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz, Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca, Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez, Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez..(O'Donnell, James)
November 30, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to O.E. CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS LLC and WILFREDO GARCIA, as an individual, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos, Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz, Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca, Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez, Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez..(Avshalumov, Roman)
November 30, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Avshalumov, Roman)
November 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wilfredo Garcia, O.E. Contracting Solutions LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28631153)Document filed by Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez, Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz, Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos, Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez, Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca..(Avshalumov, Roman)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez et al v. O.E. Contracting Solutions LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabian Orlando Rojas Sanchez
Represented By: James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
Represented By: Avraham Y. Scher
Represented By: Roman Mikhail Avshalumov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liliana Katherin Rojas Sanchez
Represented By: Avraham Y. Scher
Represented By: James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
Represented By: Roman Mikhail Avshalumov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Alexander Vargas Penagos
Represented By: James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
Represented By: Avraham Y. Scher
Represented By: Roman Mikhail Avshalumov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Stiven Cuesta Ruiz
Represented By: James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
Represented By: Avraham Y. Scher
Represented By: Roman Mikhail Avshalumov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jhon Jairo Sanabria Salamanca
Represented By: Avraham Y. Scher
Represented By: James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
Represented By: Roman Mikhail Avshalumov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O.E. Contracting Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilfredo Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?