Jackson v. Destiny's Child et al
Plaintiff: Jouan J. Jackson
Defendant: Mary J. Blige, Rodney Jerkins, Destiny's Child, Beyonce Giselle Knowles-Carter, Kelly Rowland, Fred Jerkins, III, Latavia Roberson, Letoya Luckett, Beyone Publishing, Inc., Parkwood Entertainment, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Columbia Records and The Estate of Lashawn Daniels
Case Number: 1:2023cv10507
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUBMIT DIGITAL RECORDINGS. Document filed by Jouan J. Jackson.(sc)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court dismisses this action. The Court dismisses Plaintiff's federal-law claims for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). The Court declines to consider, under its supplemental jurisdiction, Plaintiff's state-law claims. See 28 U.S.C. 1367(c)(3). The Court, however, grants Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a second amended complaint insofar as the Court grants Plaintiff 60 days' leave to file a second amended complaint, as specified above.7 (ECF 6.) If Plaintiff fails to file a second amended complaint within the time allowed, and cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, the Court will direct the Clerk of Court to enter a judgment dismissing this action for the reasons set forth in this order. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Court directs the Clerk of Court not to close this action, as the Court has granted Plaintiff leave to replead his claims in a second amended complaint. SO ORDERED. Motions terminated: #6 MOTION to Amend/Correct #4 Amended Complaint. MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend. filed by Jouan J. Jackson. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/18/2024) (sac)
January 18, 2024 Filing 6 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME, Re: to Amend/Correct #4 Amended Complaint, MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend - 90 days. Document filed by Jouan J. Jackson.(sc)
January 9, 2024 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (va)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/4/2023) (vn)
December 1, 2023 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Rodney Jerkins, Destiny's Child, Beyonce Giselle Knowles-Carter, Kelly Rowland, Fred Jerkins, III, Latavia Roberson, Letoya Luckett, Beyone Publishing, Inc., Parkwood Entertainment, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Columbia Records, The Estate of Lashawn Daniels with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Jouan J. Jackson. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copyright).(sac)
November 30, 2023 Filing 3 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Jouan J. Jackson consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Jouan J. Jackson. (sac) Modified on 12/1/2023 (sac).
November 30, 2023 Filing 2 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Jouan J. Jackson. (sac) Modified on 12/1/2023 (sac).
November 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mary J. Blige, Rodney Jerkins. Document filed by Jouan J. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Main Document) (sac) Modified on 12/1/2023 (sac).
November 30, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (sac) Modified on 12/1/2023 (sac).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Destiny's Child et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jouan J. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary J. Blige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Jerkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Destiny's Child
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beyonce Giselle Knowles-Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Jerkins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latavia Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Letoya Luckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beyone Publishing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parkwood Entertainment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Music Entertainment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Records
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Lashawn Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?