Wilburn v. Galloway et al
Plaintiff: Andre Wilburn
Defendant: Valerie Galloway, Samuel Gompers Houses and New York City Housing Authority
Case Number: 1:2023cv10513
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 cv Fed. Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2024 Appeal Remark as to #10 Notice of Appeal filed by Andre Wilburn. IFP Denied 1/8/2024. (tp)
January 24, 2024 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #10 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
January 24, 2024 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #10 Notice of Appeal filed by Andre Wilburn were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
January 24, 2024 Appeal Fee Due: for #10 Notice of Appeal. Appeal fee due by 2/7/2024. (tp)
January 23, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #7 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), #6 Order of Dismissal. Document filed by Andre Wilburn. Form D-P is due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (tp) Modified on 1/24/2024 (tp).
January 19, 2024 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 9. Mailed to: Andre Wilburn ID:73608-298 MDC Brooklyn P.O. Box 329002 Brooklyn, NY 11232. (mt)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying as moot #8 Motion re: #8 MOTION TO APPOINT U.S. MARSHALS TO SERVE DEFENDANTS. Because the Court has dismissed this action, the Court denies Plaintiff's motion (ECF 8) as moot. This action remains closed. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/10/24) (yv)
January 10, 2024 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 6. Mailed to: Andre Wilburn ID:73608-298 MDC Brooklyn P.O. Box 329002 Brooklyn, NY 11232. (mt)
January 10, 2024 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 7. Mailed to: Andre Wilburn ID:73608-298 MDC Brooklyn P.O. Box 329002 Brooklyn, NY 11232. (mt)
January 8, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION TO APPOINT U.S. MARSHALS TO SERVE DEFENDANTS. Document filed by Andre Wilburn.(sc)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CIVIL JUDGMENT: For the reasons stated in the January 8, 2024, order, this action is dismissed. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/8/2024) (Attachments: #1 Supplement Appeal Package) (vfr)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL.... The Court dismisses the complaint for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction of any state law claims Plaintiff may be asserting. See 28 U.S.C. 1367(c)(3). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in this action. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/8/2024) (vfr)
January 3, 2024 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (va)
December 26, 2023 Request for Copies/Transcripts/Docket Sheet Processed: Re #5 Letter. Request for Docket Report, from Andre Wilburn received on 12/26/23. Docket sheet mailed to ID#73608, MDC Brooklynd, P.O. 329002, Brooklyn, NY 11232 . (sc) Modified on 12/28/2023 (sc).
December 21, 2023 Filing 5 LETTER from Andre Wilburn, dated 12/17/23 re: I am writing to request an update regarding a civil lawsuit which I mailed to this Court on or about 11/18/23. Document filed by Andre Wilburn.(sc)
December 21, 2023 Request for Copy of updated Docket Sheet Received: Re #5 Letter. Request for Docket Report, from Andre Wilburn received on 12/21/23. Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
December 20, 2023 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 4. Mailed to: Andre Wilburn ID:73608-298 MDC Brooklyn P.O. Box 329002 Brooklyn, NY 11232. (mt)
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/19/2023) (vn)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Andre Wilburn. (sac)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Andre Wilburn. (sac)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Valerie Galloway, New York City Housing Authority, Samuel Gompers Houses. Document filed by Andre Wilburn. (sac)
November 28, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilburn v. Galloway et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Wilburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Galloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Gompers Houses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?