Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2023cv10527
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Arun Subramanian
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Discovery. Plaintiff has filed a motion to pursue a Rule 45 subpoena in advance of the Rule 26(f) conference in this case, seeking only identifying information of the defendant from Verizon Fios (defendant's ISP) and only for purposes of properly serving the defendant with the complaint. Plaintiff's motion is granted based on the authorities cited in support of the motion, Dkt. 9, which establish good cause for pursuing this subpoena. However, this is without prejudice to Verizon raising any objections that it may have to the subpoena. Further, Strike 3 should advise Verizon that in advance of responding to the subpoena with the information requested, Verizon should send the defendant a notice and copy of the subpoena. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(a)(4). Strike 3 is further advised to follow the Court's Individual Practices, including its letter-motion requirement for discovery motions, in the future. The Clerk is directed to terminate Dkt. 8. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 1/3/2024) (vfr)
December 18, 2023 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #8 MOTION for Discovery . . Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Williamson, #2 Exhibit B- Paige, #3 Exhibit C- Staltzer).(James, Jacqueline)
December 18, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Discovery . Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order).(James, Jacqueline)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The request is GRANTED. Plaintiff may file its Rule 26(d) motion by December 22, 2023. The Clerk of Court is directed to close ECF No. 6. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 12/22/2023. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 12/14/2023) (vfr)
December 13, 2023 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Jacqueline M. James. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC..(James, Jacqueline)
December 4, 2023 Filing 5 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (vf)
December 4, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
December 4, 2023 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
December 4, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Arun Subramanian. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
December 1, 2023 Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- a single transaction of each work infringed).(James, Jacqueline)
December 1, 2023 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC..(James, Jacqueline)
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(James, Jacqueline)
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28639474)Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- a single transaction of each work infringed).(James, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline Marie James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?