H&H Metals Corp v. Bernadet et al
Plaintiff: H&H Metals Corp
Defendant: Ernesto Bernadet, AMA Resources Inc and Electroquimica Del Nauquen, S.A.
Case Number: 1:2023cv10640
Filed: December 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 oc Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a letter by February 7, 2024, addressing (1) whether service on Defendants Ernesto Bernadet and AMA Resources Inc. complied with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4, and (2) the steps Plaintiff has taken to serve Defendant Electroquimica Del Nauquen, S.A. in Argentina. It is further ORDERED that the initial pretrial conference scheduled for February 7, 2024, is ADJOURNED to February 21, 2024, at 4:10 P.M. Plaintiff shall refile preconference materials that are prepared jointly with Defendants by February 14, 2024. If Defendants have not appeared by February 14, 2024, Plaintiff shall file a letter requesting further adjournment of the initial pretrial conference. ( Initial Conference set for 2/21/2024 at 04:10 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/2/2024) (tg)
January 31, 2024 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Ernesto Bernadet served on 1/31/2024, answer due 2/21/2024. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by H&H Metals Corp..(Lara-Garduno, Nelida)
January 31, 2024 Filing 12 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by H&H Metals Corp..(Lara-Garduno, Nelida)
January 31, 2024 Filing 11 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Nelida Lara dated January 31, 2024 re: Status of the case. Document filed by H&H Metals Corp..(Lara-Garduno, Nelida)
January 24, 2024 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order served on Ernesto Bernadet and AMA Resources Inc. on January 24, 2024. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by H&H Metals Corp..(Lara-Garduno, Nelida)
January 12, 2024 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. AMA Resources Inc served on 1/2/2024, answer due 1/23/2024. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by H&H Metals Corp..(Lara-Garduno, Nelida)
January 12, 2024 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Ernesto Bernadet served on 1/2/2024, answer due 1/23/2024. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by H&H Metals Corp..(Lara-Garduno, Nelida)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that a telephonic conference will be held on February 7, 2024 at 4:10 p.m. The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. The telephonic conference is public, and the time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. All pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. The parties shall ensure they are all dialed into the conference call by the appointed conference time, as further set forth. Initial Conference set for 2/7/2024 at 04:10 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/11/2023) (mml)
December 8, 2023 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMA Resources Inc, Ernesto Bernadet, Electroquimica Del Nauquen, S.A...(pc)
December 8, 2023 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against AMA Resources Inc, Ernesto Bernadet, Electroquimica Del Nauquen, S.A.. Document filed by H&H Metals Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Security Agreement Bernadet, #2 Exhibit Security Agreement AMA, #3 Exhibit UCC Filings, #4 Exhibit Power of Attorney Spanish, #5 Exhibit Translation PoA, #6 Exhibit SEC Form 10-Q, #7 Exhibit Mortgage Spanish, #8 Exhibit Contract Spanish, #9 Exhibit Translation Ex G and H).(Lara-Garduno, Nelida)
December 7, 2023 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ernesto Bernadet, AMA Resources, Inc., and Electroquimica del Nauquen, S.A., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by H&H Metals Corp..(Lara-Garduno, Nelida)
December 7, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Nelida Lara-Garduno to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; multiple Citizenship Defendant codes were selected under Citizenship of Principal Parties. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
December 7, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Nelida Lara-Garduno to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
December 7, 2023 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
December 7, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
December 7, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 7, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Nelida Lara-Garduno to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the Court name was not selected on the PDF; the attorney information was omitted. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
December 6, 2023 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lara-Garduno, Nelida) Modified on 12/7/2023 (jgo).
December 6, 2023 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ernesto Bernadet, AMA Resources Inc., Electroquimica Del Nauquen S.A., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by H&H Metals Corp..(Lara-Garduno, Nelida) Modified on 12/7/2023 (jgo).
December 6, 2023 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28659243)Document filed by H&H Metals Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Security Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Security Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - UCC Financing Statement, #4 Exhibit D - Translation, #5 Exhibit E - Translation, #6 Exhibit F - SEC Filing, #7 Exhibit G - Translation, #8 Exhibit H - Translation, #9 Exhibit I - Translation).(Lara-Garduno, Nelida) Modified on 12/7/2023 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H&H Metals Corp v. Bernadet et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H&H Metals Corp
Represented By: Nelida Lara-Garduno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernesto Bernadet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMA Resources Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electroquimica Del Nauquen, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?