Grolo LTD et al v. Active Creations LLC et al
Plaintiff: Grolo LTD
Defendant: Active Creations LLC and Sports Fanatics LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv10960
Filed: December 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2024 Filing 18 ANSWER to #16 Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs. Document filed by Sports Fanatics LLC, Active Creations LLC..(Leghorn, Thomas)
January 30, 2024 Filing 17 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Vantage Inc. d/b/a Acqu.co for Active Creations LLC, Sports Fanatics LLC. Document filed by Active Creations LLC, Sports Fanatics LLC..(Leghorn, Thomas)
January 24, 2024 Filing 16 COMPLAINT against Active Creations LLC, Sports Fanatics LLC. Document filed by Grolo LTD, Grolo LTD..(Thompson, Duvol) Modified on 1/25/2024 (jgo).
January 23, 2024 Filing 15 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #14 Letter, filed by Grolo LTD. ENDORSEMENT: The complaint, with the redaction described herein, shall be filed by 1/26/24. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/23/2024) (vfr)
January 23, 2024 Filing 14 LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Duvol M. Thompson dated January 23, 2024 re: Your Honor's Order requiring plaintiffs to show cause why the redactions in the complaint should not be limited to just the "six-figure dollar amount." (ECF No. 13).. Document filed by Grolo LTD..(Thompson, Duvol)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that by January 24, 2024, the plaintiffs shall show cause why they should not file the complaint with only the six-figure dollar amount redacted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/17/2024) (vfr)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER on re: #11 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Grolo LTD Ogranting in part and denying in part #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Thomas A. Leghorn dated January 16, 2024., #1 Complaint. ENDORSEMENT: Any answer or responsive to the complaint shall be due 1/30/24. There shall be no further extensions. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/16/24) (yv) Modified on 1/17/2024 (yv).
January 16, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: All Defendants. (yv)
January 16, 2024 Filing 11 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Duvol M. Thompson dated January 16, 2024 re: #10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Thomas A. Leghorn dated January 16, 2024. . Document filed by Grolo LTD..(Thompson, Duvol)
January 16, 2024 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Thomas A. Leghorn dated January 16, 2024. Document filed by Active Creations LLC, Sports Fanatics LLC..(Leghorn, Thomas)
January 16, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Arthur Leghorn on behalf of Active Creations LLC, Sports Fanatics LLC..(Leghorn, Thomas)
January 12, 2024 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Sports Fanatics LLC served on 12/27/2023, answer due 1/17/2024. Service was accepted by Allison Rothmanner, Office Assistant at Harvard Business Services, Inc., Registered Agent. Service was made by Hand. Document filed by Grolo LTD..(Thompson, Duvol)
January 12, 2024 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Active Creations LLC served on 12/27/2023, answer due 1/17/2024. Service was accepted by Allison Rothmanner, Office Assistant at Harvard Business Services, Inc., Registered Agent. Service was made by Hand. Document filed by Grolo LTD..(Thompson, Duvol)
January 11, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/5/2024 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/11/2024) (vfr)
December 20, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amir Alimehri on behalf of Grolo LTD..(Alimehri, Amir)
December 20, 2023 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Grolo LTD..(Thompson, Duvol)
December 20, 2023 Filing 3 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus)
December 19, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (vf) (pc).
December 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Active Creations LLC, Sports Fanatics LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number 24547)Document filed by Grolo LTD, Grolo LTD.(vf) (pc).
December 19, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Active Creations LLC. (vf)
December 19, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sports Fanatics LLC. (vf)
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER REDACTING PLEADING FILED IN 23-MC-476. (vf)
December 19, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
December 19, 2023 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grolo LTD et al v. Active Creations LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grolo LTD
Represented By: Duvol Maurice Thompson
Represented By: Amir Alimehri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Active Creations LLC
Represented By: Thomas Arthur Leghorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sports Fanatics LLC
Represented By: Thomas Arthur Leghorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?