Trisura Insurance Company v. Bighorn Construction and Reclamation, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Trisura Insurance Company
Defendant: Bighorn Construction and Reclamation, LLC, Bighorn Investments and Properties, LLC, Bighorn Sand & Gravel LLC, Bridgelink Commodities LLC, Bridgelink Engineering LLC, Bridgelink Investments, LLC, Bridgelink Renewable Energy Development LLC, Bridgelink Renewable Energy Investments LLC, Intermoutain Electric Service, Inc., Cole Wayne Johnson, Cord Henry Johnson and Cassie Hamilton
Case Number: 1:2023cv11053
Filed: December 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jennifer E Willis
Referring Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Trisura Group Ltd., Corporate Parent Trisura (US) Holding Company for Trisura Insurance Company. Document filed by Trisura Insurance Company..(Cowling, Dennis)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #5 Complaint,, against Bighorn Construction and Reclamation, LLC, Bighorn Investments and Properties, LLC, Bighorn Sand & Gravel LLC, Bridgelink Commodities LLC, Bridgelink Engineering LLC, Bridgelink Investments, LLC, Bridgelink Renewable Energy Development LLC, Bridgelink Renewable Energy Investments LLC, Cassie Hamilton, Intermoutain Electric Service, Inc., Cole Wayne Johnson, Cord Henry Johnson.Document filed by Trisura Insurance Company. Related document: #5 Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Indemnity Agreement in favor of Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit B-1: Bonds, Performance and Payment, TIC01702, #3 Exhibit B-2: Rider No. 1 to Bonds TIC01702, #4 Exhibit C: Collateral Demand Letter to Defendants).(Cowling, Dennis)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Trisura Group Ltd., Corporate Parent Trisura (US) Holding Company for Trisura Insurance Company. Document filed by Trisura Insurance Company..(Cowling, Dennis)
December 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/26/2023) (jca)
December 26, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Dennis O'Neil Cowling to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the jurisdiction of this action is based on diversity - the party/intervenor did not name and identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes or No radio button - If Yes - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time - name and identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. (kw)
December 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MISSING DIVERSITY INFORMATION - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Trisura U.S. Holding Company, Corporate Parent Trisura Group Ltd. for Trisura Insurance Company. Document filed by Trisura Insurance Company..(Cowling, Dennis) Modified on 12/26/2023 (kw).
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Bighorn Construction and Reclamation, LLC, Bighorn Investments and Properties, LLC, Bighorn Sand & Gravel LLC, Bridgelink Commodities LLC, Bridgelink Engineering LLC, Bridgelink Investments, LLC, Bridgelink Renewable Energy Development LLC, Bridgelink Renewable Energy Investments LLC, Cassie Hamilton, Intermoutain Electric Service, Inc., Cole Wayne Johnson, Cord Henry Johnson. Document filed by Trisura Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Indemnity Agreement in favor of Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit B-1: Bonds, Performance and Payment, TIC01702, #3 Exhibit B-2: Rider No. 1 to Bonds TIC01702, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C: Collateral Demand Letter to Defendants).(Cowling, Dennis)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cowling, Dennis)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bighorn Construction and Reclamation, LLC, Bighorn Investments and Properties, LLC, Bighorn Sand & Gravel LLC, Bridgelink Commodities LLC, Bridgelink Engineering LLC, Bridgelink Investments, LLC, Bridgelink Renewable Energy Development LLC, Bridgelink Renewable Energy Investments LLC, Cassie Hamilton, Intermoutain Electric Service, Inc., Cole Wayne Johnson, Cord Henry Johnson. (vf)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Dennis O'Neil Cowling. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Dennis O'Neil Cowling to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (vf)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bighorn Construction and Reclamation, LLC; Bighorn Investments and Properties, LLC; Bighorn Sand & Gravel LLC; Bridgelink Commodities LLC; Bridgelink Engineering LLC; Bridgelink Investments, LLC; Bridgelink Renewable Energy Development LLC; Bridgelink Renewable Energy Investments LLC; Intermoutain Electric Service, Inc.; Cole Wayne Johnson; Cord Henry Johnson; Cassie Hamilton,, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Trisura Insurance Company..(Cowling, Dennis)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against Bighorn Construction and Reclamation, LLC, Bighorn Investments and Properties, LLC, Bighorn Sand & Gravel LLC, Bridgelink Commodities LLC, Bridgelink Engineering LLC, Bridgelink Investments, LLC, Bridgelink Renewable Energy Development LLC, Bridgelink Renewable Energy Investments LLC, Cassie Hamilton, Intermoutain Electric Service, Inc., Cole Wayne Johnson, Cord Henry Johnson. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28723009)Document filed by Trisura Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Indemnity Agreement in favor of Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-1: Bonds, Performance and Payment, TIC01702, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B-2: Rider No. 1 to Bonds TIC01702, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C: Collateral Demand Letter to Defendants).(Cowling, Dennis) Modified on 12/22/2023 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trisura Insurance Company v. Bighorn Construction and Reclamation, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trisura Insurance Company
Represented By: Dennis O'Neil Cowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bighorn Construction and Reclamation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bighorn Investments and Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bighorn Sand & Gravel LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgelink Commodities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgelink Engineering LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgelink Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgelink Renewable Energy Development LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgelink Renewable Energy Investments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intermoutain Electric Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cole Wayne Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cord Henry Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassie Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?