Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc. v. Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.
Defendant: Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC and Holtzbrinck Publishing Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv11192
Filed: December 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Referring Judge: Gabriel W Gorenstein
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2024 Filing 18 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 2/8/2024 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights.(km)
February 8, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC, Holtzbrinck Publishing Group, Inc.. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Garbarini, Richard)
February 7, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Richard Garbarini. RE-FILE Document No. #16 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were selected. Re-file the document using the event type Notice of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Notices - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (km)
February 6, 2024 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Garbarini, Richard) Modified on 2/7/2024 (km).
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: granting #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #14 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint. addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Robert D. Balin dated January 16, 2024. Extension to February 8, 2024, granted. The parties are directed to direct any request of this kind in the future to the undersigned. See Docket # 12. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 1/17/2024) (ama)
January 17, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC answer due 2/8/2024; Holtzbrinck Publishing Group, Inc. answer due 2/8/2024. (ama)
January 16, 2024 Filing 14 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Robert D. Balin dated January 16, 2024. Document filed by Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC, Holtzbrinck Publishing Group, Inc...(Balin, Robert)
January 3, 2024 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Holtzbrinck Publishing Group, Inc. served on 1/2/2024, answer due 1/23/2024. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/28/2023) (jca) (Main Document 12 replaced on 12/28/2023) (jca).
December 28, 2023 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC. (vf)
December 27, 2023 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
December 27, 2023 Filing 9 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (vf)
December 27, 2023 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Holtzbrinck Publishing Group, Inc.. (vf)
December 27, 2023 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Garbarini, Richard) Modified on 12/27/2023 (vf).
December 27, 2023 Filing 6 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Garbarini, Richard)
December 27, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Richard M Garbarini to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
December 27, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
December 27, 2023 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
December 27, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Richard M Garbarini to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated October 1, 2020. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet. (vf)
December 27, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
December 26, 2023 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Garbarini, Richard) Modified on 12/27/2023 (vf).
December 26, 2023 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Holtzbrinck Publishing Group, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
December 26, 2023 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT- SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard) Modified on 12/27/2023 (vf).
December 26, 2023 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Garbarini, Richard) Modified on 12/27/2023 (vf).
December 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC, Holtzbrinck Publishing Group, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28740611)Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Registration and assignment, #2 Exhibit Notice, #3 Exhibit Notice).(Garbarini, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc. v. Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.
Represented By: Richard M Garbarini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC
Represented By: Robert D. Balin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holtzbrinck Publishing Group, Inc.
Represented By: Robert D. Balin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?