D'Arrigio Bros. Co. Of New York, Inc. v. 65 Burnside Meat Market Corp. et al
Plaintiff: D'Arrigio Bros. Co. Of New York, Inc.
Defendant: 65 Burnside Meat Market Corp., Sagal Meat Market Inc., 134th Meat Market, Inc., G & H Supermarket Corp., D D & S Meat, Fish & Produce Inc., Lenin Sanchez, Sr. and Fernando Sanchez
Case Number: 1:2024cv00138
Filed: January 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499 Agricultural Commodities Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CONSENT JUDGMENT: In favor of Plaintiff and against Defendants in the principal amount of $77,490.50, plus accrued interest at the rate of 18% per annum through January 12, 2024, in the amount of $3,217.48 and attorneys' fees and expenses in the amount of $9,716.00, for a total judgment under the trust provisions of PACA in the amount of$90,423.98, and that Plaintiff shall have immediate execution therefor. So Ordered. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment and to close the case. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/12/2024) (mml)
January 12, 2024 Filing 24 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER. Document filed by D'Arrigio Bros. Co. Of New York, Inc...(Brown, Gregory)
January 11, 2024 Filing 23 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Gregory Brown dated January 11, 2024 re: Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by D'Arrigio Bros. Co. Of New York, Inc...(Brown, Gregory)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER with respect to #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. ENDORSEMENT: The parties are directed to discuss the possibility of stipulating to the requested or alternative interim relief to avoid the need for a court order. By January 11, 2024, at 5:00 P.M., the parties shall submit a joint letter reporting on those discussions and proposing a briefing schedule if necessary. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/10/2024) (mml)
January 10, 2024 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fernando Sanchez..(pc)
January 10, 2024 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sagal Meat Market Inc...(pc)
January 10, 2024 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 65 Burnside Meat Market Corp...(pc)
January 10, 2024 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to G & H Supermarket Corp...(pc)
January 10, 2024 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 134th Meat Market, Inc...(pc)
January 10, 2024 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to D D & S Meat, Fish & Produce Inc...(pc)
January 10, 2024 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lenin Sanchez, Sr..(pc)
January 9, 2024 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Fernando Sanchez, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by D'Arrigio Bros. Co. Of New York, Inc...(Brown, Gregory)
January 9, 2024 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lenin Sanchez, Sr., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by D'Arrigio Bros. Co. Of New York, Inc...(Brown, Gregory)
January 9, 2024 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to D D & S Meat, Fish & Produce Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by D'Arrigio Bros. Co. Of New York, Inc...(Brown, Gregory)
January 9, 2024 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to G & H Supermarket Corp., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by D'Arrigio Bros. Co. Of New York, Inc...(Brown, Gregory)
January 9, 2024 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 134th Meat Market, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by D'Arrigio Bros. Co. Of New York, Inc...(Brown, Gregory)
January 9, 2024 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sagal Meat Market Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by D'Arrigio Bros. Co. Of New York, Inc...(Brown, Gregory)
January 9, 2024 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 65 Burnside Meat Market Corp., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by D'Arrigio Bros. Co. Of New York, Inc...(Brown, Gregory)
January 9, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
January 9, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
January 9, 2024 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
January 9, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Gregory Adam Brown to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; each summons request must be filed separately or one summons request may be filed with a rider/addendum attached. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
January 8, 2024 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by D'Arrigio Bros. Co. Of New York, Inc...(Brown, Gregory)
January 8, 2024 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Karina Roman in Support re: #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by D'Arrigio Bros. Co. Of New York, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Brown, Gregory)
January 8, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by D'Arrigio Bros. Co. Of New York, Inc...(Brown, Gregory)
January 8, 2024 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 65 Burnside Meat Market Corp., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by D'Arrigio Bros. Co. Of New York, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed Summons for Sagal Meat Market Inc., #2 Supplement Proposed Summons for 134th Meat Market, Inc., #3 Supplement Proposed Summons for G & H Supermarket Corp., #4 Supplement Proposed Summons for D D & S Meat, Fish & Produce Inc., #5 Supplement Proposed Summons for Lenin Sanchez, Sr., #6 Supplement Proposed Summons for Fernando Sanchez).(Brown, Gregory) Modified on 1/9/2024 (jgo).
January 8, 2024 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by D'Arrigio Bros. Co. Of New York, Inc...(Brown, Gregory)
January 8, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Brown, Gregory)
January 8, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 134th Meat Market, Inc., 65 Burnside Meat Market Corp., D D & S Meat, Fish & Produce Inc., G & H Supermarket Corp., Sagal Meat Market Inc., Fernando Sanchez, Lenin Sanchez, Sr. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28782634)Document filed by D'Arrigio Bros. Co. Of New York, Inc...(Brown, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D'Arrigio Bros. Co. Of New York, Inc. v. 65 Burnside Meat Market Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D'Arrigio Bros. Co. Of New York, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Adam Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 65 Burnside Meat Market Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sagal Meat Market Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 134th Meat Market, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G & H Supermarket Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D D & S Meat, Fish & Produce Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenin Sanchez, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fernando Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?