Dalewitz v. JusLaw LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael Dalewitz
Defendant: JusLaw LLC, JusGlobal, LLC and Beatrice O'Brien
Case Number: 1:2024cv00457
Filed: January 22, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2024 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Michael Dalewitz. Document filed by Beatrice O'Brien, JusGlobal, LLC, JusLaw LLC..(Sorenson, Sigurd)
March 15, 2024 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by JusGlobal, LLC, JusLaw LLC..(Sorenson, Sigurd)
March 8, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sigurd Ansgar Sorenson on behalf of JusGlobal, LLC, JusLaw LLC, Beatrice O'Brien..(Sorenson, Sigurd)
March 8, 2024 Filing 14 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Bruce Menken and Sigurd Sorenson dated March 8, 2024 re: Joint letter declining referral of case to Magistrate Judge. Document filed by JusGlobal, LLC, JusLaw LLC, Beatrice O'Brien..(Sorenson, Sigurd)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by March 25, 2024, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/24/2024) (jca)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/24/2024) (jca)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by January 25, 2024, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. Counsel who have noticed an appearance as of the issuance of this order are directed:(1) to notify all other parties' attorneys in this action by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Practices forthwith, and (2) to file proof of such notice with the Court. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must forthwith send a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Practices to that party personally. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/24/2024) (jca) Modified on 2/13/2024 (jca).
January 23, 2024 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Beatrice O'Brien..(pc)
January 23, 2024 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Beatrice O'Brien..(pc)
January 23, 2024 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to JusLaw LLC..(pc)
January 23, 2024 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to JusGlobal, LLC..(pc)
January 23, 2024 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
January 23, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 23, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
January 22, 2024 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Beatrice O'Brien, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Dalewitz..(Menken, Bruce)
January 22, 2024 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Beatrice O'Brien, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Dalewitz..(Menken, Bruce)
January 22, 2024 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JusGlobal, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Dalewitz..(Menken, Bruce)
January 22, 2024 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JusLaw LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Dalewitz..(Menken, Bruce)
January 22, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Menken, Bruce)
January 22, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JusGlobal, LLC, JusLaw LLC, Beatrice O'Brien. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28840110)Document filed by Michael Dalewitz..(Menken, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dalewitz v. JusLaw LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dalewitz
Represented By: Bruce Eric Menken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JusLaw LLC
Represented By: Sigurd Ansgar Sorenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JusGlobal, LLC
Represented By: Sigurd Ansgar Sorenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beatrice O'Brien
Represented By: Sigurd Ansgar Sorenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?