Nokaj et al v. Pappas New York et al
Plaintiff: Ardiana Nokaj, Lorik Mehmetaj, Kristo Foto, Xhovan Kola, Summer Sanders, Shkodran Idrizaj, Malvina Hasa, Endrit Gashi, Marco Vazquez, Erdonit Gashi, Armend Krasniqi, Jorge Perez Jerez, Jaime Jimenez, Fadil Mulkurti, Antonio Navarrete Moran, Egzon Haxhiu, Hekuran Brahimaj and Sebastian Frroku
Defendant: Pappas New York, Pappas OG, LLC, Pappas Taverna, Dream Hospitality Group, LLC, ABC Corporations 1- 3, George Karavias, Joseph Licul, Danielle Jimenez Marine, JOHN and JANE DOES 1-4 and Dennis Turcinovic
Case Number: 1:2024cv01076
Filed: February 14, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margaret M Garnett
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Emre Polat re: Document No. #16 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading is amended more than 21 days after service of the original pleading; opposing party did not consent to the amendment of the pleading; the order granting permission to file the pleading was not attached; Court's leave has not been granted.. File the Exhibit to Pleading event found under the event list Other Documents and attach either opposing party's written consent or Court's leave. (jgo)
April 9, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Emre Polat to RE-FILE Document No. #17 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the summons request was not processed due to deficient pleading;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
April 8, 2024 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dennis Turcinovic, re: #16 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Hekuran Brahimaj, Kristo Foto, Sebastian Frroku, Endrit Gashi, Erdonit Gashi, Malvina Hasa, Egzon Haxhiu, Shkodran Idrizaj, Jaime Jimenez, Xhovan Kola, Armend Krasniqi, Lorik Mehmetaj, Fadil Mulkurti, Antonio Navarrete Moran, Ardiana Nokaj, Jorge Perez Jerez, Summer Sanders, Marco Vazquez..(Polat, Emre)
April 8, 2024 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FRCP RULE 15 NON-COMPLIANCE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Dream Hospitality Group, LLC, Danielle Jimenez Marine, George Karavias, Joseph Licul, Pappas New York, Pappas OG, LLC, Dennis Turcinovic with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Lorik Mehmetaj, Ardiana Nokaj, Kristo Foto, Xhovan Kola, Summer Sanders, Shkodran Idrizaj, Malvina Hasa, Endrit Gashi, Marco Vazquez, Erdonit Gashi, Armend Krasniqi, Jorge Perez Jerez, Jaime Jimenez, Fadil Mulkurti, Antonio Navarrete Moran, Egzon Haxhiu, Hekuran Brahimaj, Sebastian Frroku. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Polat, Emre) Modified on 4/9/2024 (jgo).
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: All Defendants (Pappas New York; Pappas OG, LLC; Pappas Taverna; Dream Hospitality Group, LLC; George Karavias; Joseph Licul; and Danielle Jimenez Marine) appear to be in default in this action. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file any motion for default judgment in accordance with the Court's Individual Rules & Practices no later than April 19, 2024. ( Motions due by 4/19/2024.) (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 4/4/2024) (ate)
March 15, 2024 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. George Karavias served on 3/12/2024, answer due 4/2/2024. Document filed by Kristo Foto; Lorik Mehmetaj; Xhovan Kola; Ardiana Nokaj..(Polat, Emre)
March 14, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alan Avery Heller on behalf of Danielle Jimenez Marine, Pappas New York, Pappas OG, LLC..(Heller, Alan)
March 14, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeanne Claire Barenholtz on behalf of Danielle Jimenez Marine, Pappas New York, Pappas OG, LLC..(Barenholtz, Jeanne)
March 11, 2024 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Pappas New York served on 3/6/2024, answer due 3/27/2024. Document filed by Kristo Foto; Lorik Mehmetaj; Xhovan Kola; Ardiana Nokaj..(Polat, Emre)
March 11, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Pappas Taverna served on 3/6/2024, answer due 3/27/2024. Document filed by Kristo Foto; Lorik Mehmetaj; Xhovan Kola; Ardiana Nokaj..(Polat, Emre)
March 11, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Danielle Jimenez Marine served on 3/6/2024, answer due 3/27/2024. Document filed by Kristo Foto; Lorik Mehmetaj; Xhovan Kola; Ardiana Nokaj..(Polat, Emre)
March 6, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Dream Hospitality Group, LLC served on 2/27/2024, answer due 3/19/2024. Service was accepted by via Secretary of State. Document filed by Kristo Foto; Lorik Mehmetaj; Xhovan Kola; Ardiana Nokaj..(Polat, Emre)
March 6, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Pappas OG, LLC served on 2/27/2024, answer due 3/19/2024. Service was accepted by via Secretary of State. Document filed by Kristo Foto; Lorik Mehmetaj; Xhovan Kola; Ardiana Nokaj..(Polat, Emre)
March 5, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Joseph Licul served on 2/26/2024, answer due 3/18/2024. Service was accepted by Stanka at residence. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Kristo Foto; Lorik Mehmetaj; Xhovan Kola; Ardiana Nokaj..(Polat, Emre)
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES THAT INCLUDE CLAIMS UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. 201 et seq: ORDERED that, prior to the case management conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), the Court is referring this case to mediation under Local Civil Rule 83.9; and that mediation shall be scheduled within 60 days. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that to facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the following: and further set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 3/1/2024. (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 2/16/2024) (rro)
February 15, 2024 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dream Hospitality Group, LLC, Danielle Jimenez Marine, George Karavias, Joseph Licul, Pappas New York, Pappas OG, LLC, Pappas Taverna. (vf)
February 15, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Emre Polat. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:5(a) Fair Labor Standards Act; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act; the County code has been modified to Queens. (vf)
February 15, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Emre Polat. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: ABC Corporations 1- 3, Dream Hospitality Group, LLC, JOHN and JANE DOES 1-4, Danielle Jimenez Marine, George Karavias, Joseph Licul, Pappas New York, Pappas OG, LLC, Pappas Taverna, Kristo Foto, Lorik Mehmetaj, Xhovan Kola, Ardiana Nokaj. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted. (vf)
February 15, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Margaret M. Garnett. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
February 15, 2024 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
February 15, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
February 14, 2024 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pappas New York, Pappas OG, LLC, Pappas Taverna, Dream Hospitality Group, LLC, George Karavias, Joseph Licul, Danielle Jimenez Marine, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kristo Foto, Xhovan Kola, Lorik Mehmetaj, Ardiana Nokaj..(Polat, Emre)
February 14, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Polat, Emre)
February 14, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABC Corporations 1- 3, Dream Hospitality Group, LLC, JOHN and JANE DOES 1-4, Danielle Jimenez Marine, George Karavias, Joseph Licul, Pappas New York, Pappas OG, LLC, Pappas Taverna. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28945288)Document filed by Kristo Foto, Lorik Mehmetaj, Xhovan Kola, Ardiana Nokaj..(Polat, Emre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nokaj et al v. Pappas New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ardiana Nokaj
Represented By: Emre Polat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorik Mehmetaj
Represented By: Emre Polat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristo Foto
Represented By: Emre Polat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xhovan Kola
Represented By: Emre Polat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summer Sanders
Represented By: Emre Polat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shkodran Idrizaj
Represented By: Emre Polat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malvina Hasa
Represented By: Emre Polat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Endrit Gashi
Represented By: Emre Polat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Vazquez
Represented By: Emre Polat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erdonit Gashi
Represented By: Emre Polat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armend Krasniqi
Represented By: Emre Polat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Perez Jerez
Represented By: Emre Polat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Jimenez
Represented By: Emre Polat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fadil Mulkurti
Represented By: Emre Polat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Navarrete Moran
Represented By: Emre Polat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Egzon Haxhiu
Represented By: Emre Polat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hekuran Brahimaj
Represented By: Emre Polat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sebastian Frroku
Represented By: Emre Polat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pappas New York
Represented By: Alan Avery Heller
Represented By: Jeanne Claire Barenholtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pappas OG, LLC
Represented By: Alan Avery Heller
Represented By: Jeanne Claire Barenholtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pappas Taverna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dream Hospitality Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporations 1- 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Karavias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Licul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle Jimenez Marine
Represented By: Alan Avery Heller
Represented By: Jeanne Claire Barenholtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN and JANE DOES 1-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Turcinovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?