Quantum Technology Innovations, LLC v. Showtime Networks Inc et al
Plaintiff: Quantum Technology Innovations, LLC
Defendant: Showtime Networks Inc, SHOWTIME DIGITAL, INC. and Paramount Global
Case Number: 1:2024cv01103
Filed: February 15, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margaret M Garnett
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 pt Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Michael Hamlin Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Margaret M. Garnett)(Text Only Order) (kv)
March 15, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION for Michael Hamlin Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Paramount Global, Showtime Digital, Inc., Showtime Networks Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit M. Jones Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - M. Jones Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order M. Jones Proposed Order).(Jones, Michael)
March 15, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #19 MOTION for Michael Hamlin Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #14 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Margaret M. Garnett from Steven L. Lieberman dated March 7, 2024. Application GRANTED. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by April 29, 2024. The Initial Pretrial Conference is adjourned to Tuesday, May 14, 2024, at 1:00 p.m. The conference will be held in person in Courtroom 906 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007. The parties shall file on ECF a joint letter, as well as a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order attached as an exhibit to the joint letter, no later than May 7, 2024. SO ORDERED. Paramount Global answer due 4/29/2024; Showtime Digital, Inc. answer due 4/29/2024; Showtime Networks Inc answer due 4/29/2024. (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 3/8/2024) (mml)
March 8, 2024 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 5/14/2024 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Margaret M. Garnett. (mml)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Sharon L. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Margaret M. Garnett)(Text Only Order) (kv)
March 7, 2024 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - MOTION for Michael Hamlin Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29049147. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Paramount Global, Showtime Digital, Inc., Showtime Networks Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit M. Jones Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - M. Jones Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order M. Jones Proposed Order).(Jones, Michael) Modified on 3/7/2024 (bc).
March 7, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Sharon L. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29048289. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Paramount Global, Showtime Digital, Inc., Showtime Networks Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit S. Davis Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - S. Davis Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order S. Davis Proposed Order).(Davis, Sharon)
March 7, 2024 Filing 14 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Margaret M. Garnett from Steven L. Lieberman dated March 7, 2024. Document filed by Paramount Global, Showtime Digital, Inc., Showtime Networks Inc..(Lieberman, Steven)
March 7, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven M Lieberman on behalf of Paramount Global, Showtime Digital, Inc., Showtime Networks Inc..(Lieberman, Steven)
March 7, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #16 MOTION for Michael Hamlin Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29049147. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Virginia;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bc)
March 7, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #15 MOTION for Sharon L. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29048289. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc)
February 21, 2024 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Paramount Global. (vf)
February 21, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PATENT FORM. Notice to Attorney David Allen Ward to RE-FILE Document No. #8 AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the AO 120 Patent/Trademark form is not correct.. Re-file the document using the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct AO 120 Patent/Trademark PDF form. (gp)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/9/2024 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 906, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Margaret M. Garnett. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 2/20/2024) (vfr)
February 20, 2024 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paramount Global, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Quantum Technology Innovations, LLC..(Ward, David)
February 20, 2024 Filing 9 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ward, David)
February 20, 2024 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Ward, David) Modified on 2/21/2024 (gp).
February 16, 2024 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Showtime Networks Inc..(pc)
February 16, 2024 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Showtime Digital, Inc...(pc)
February 16, 2024 Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
February 16, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Margaret M. Garnett. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
February 16, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 16, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Allen Ward. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: SHOWTIME DIGITAL, INC.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc)
February 16, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney David Allen Ward. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
February 16, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David Allen Ward to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; defendant's name is incorrect;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
February 16, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney David Allen Ward to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
February 15, 2024 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paramount Global, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Quantum Technology Innovations, LLC..(Ward, David) Modified on 2/16/2024 (pc).
February 15, 2024 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Showtime Digital, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Quantum Technology Innovations, LLC..(Ward, David)
February 15, 2024 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Showtime Networks, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Quantum Technology Innovations, LLC..(Ward, David)
February 15, 2024 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management, LLC for Quantum Technology Innovations, LLC. Document filed by Quantum Technology Innovations, LLC..(Ward, David)
February 15, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paramount Global, SHOWTIME DIGITAL, INC., Showtime Networks Inc. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28949567)Document filed by Quantum Technology Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Patent, #2 Exhibit 2 Claim Chart).(Ward, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quantum Technology Innovations, LLC v. Showtime Networks Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quantum Technology Innovations, LLC
Represented By: David Allen Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Showtime Networks Inc
Represented By: Steven M Lieberman
Represented By: Michael Jones
Represented By: Sharon Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHOWTIME DIGITAL, INC.
Represented By: Michael Jones
Represented By: Sharon Davis
Represented By: Steven M Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Global
Represented By: Steven M Lieberman
Represented By: Michael Jones
Represented By: Sharon Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?