Arcadipane v. Barclays Bank PLC et al
Plaintiff: Angelo Arcadipane
Defendant: Barclays Bank PLC, D&A Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC and Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv01170
Filed: February 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Rochon
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF DISMISSAL The Court having been advised at ECF No. 11 that all claims asserted herein have been settled in principle, it is ORDERED that the above-entitled action be and is hereby DISMISSED and discontinued without costs, and without prejudice to the right to reopen the action within thirty days of the date of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. To be clear, any application to reopen must be filed by the aforementioned deadline; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. If the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purposes of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court by the deadline to reopen to be "so ordered" by the Court. Per Paragraph 4(C) of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases, unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless it is made part of the public record. Any pending motions are moot. All conferences are cancelled. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 3/7/2024) (jca)
March 5, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement as to All Remaining Parties. Document filed by Angelo Arcadipane..(Russo, Patrick)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #9 Notice of Settlement filed by Angelo Arcadipane. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff shall file a notice of dismissal with respect to Experian or a status update by March 29, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 2/29/2024) (tg)
February 28, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. only. Document filed by Angelo Arcadipane..(Russo, Patrick)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #5 Notice of Settlement filed by Angelo Arcadipane. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff shall file a notice of dismissal with respect to Defendants Trans Union and Equifax or a status update by March 22, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 2/23/24) (yv)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/18/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 20B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 2/23/2024) (jca)
February 23, 2024 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Barclays Bank PLC..(Marmo, Jonathan)
February 21, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Settlement as to Trans Union, LLC and Equifax Information Services, LLC only. Document filed by Angelo Arcadipane..(Russo, Patrick)
February 21, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Paul Russo on behalf of Angelo Arcadipane..(Russo, Patrick)
February 21, 2024 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. Judge Philip M. Halpern is no longer assigned to the case..(tro)
February 21, 2024 NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only..(tro)
February 20, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
February 20, 2024 Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
February 20, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 16, 2024 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Barclays, PLC, Other Affiliate Barclays Bank Delaware, Other Affiliate Barclays Group US Inc., Other Affiliate Barclays US LLC for Barclays Bank PLC. Document filed by Barclays Bank PLC..(Marmo, Jonathan)
February 16, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Marmo, Jonathan)
February 16, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 150381/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28958314).Document filed by Barclays Bank PLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleading).(Marmo, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arcadipane v. Barclays Bank PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelo Arcadipane
Represented By: Patrick Paul Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank PLC
Represented By: Jonathan M Marmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D&A Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?