Defosse v. Trans Union, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael Defosse
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv01173
Filed: February 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2024 Filing 22 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Attorney Steven Richman, Esq. is granted leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC. The Clerk of Court is instructed to terminate Attorney Steven Richman from the list of active counsel in this case, and to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 21. Attorney Steven Mark Richman terminated. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/16/2024) (rro)
March 15, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION for Steven M. Richman to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC..(Richman, Steven)
March 15, 2024 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc...(Orujlu, Nurlan)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. The Court has received and reviewed the proposed order for substitution of attorney filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC's counsel at Dkt. 18. The Court declines to issue the order as proposed because it does not fully comply with Local Rule 1.4. Under Local Rule 1.4, such a stipulation must be signed by all parties to the litigation. Alternatively, counsel may move for leave to withdraw. Any such motion must comply fully with the requirements of Local Rule 1.4. The parties are also reminded that the Courts Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases requires that any proposed order be filed with an accompanying joint letter. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods) (Text Only Order) (wv)
March 8, 2024 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC..(Stiers, Joshua)
March 8, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Allen Stiers on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC..(Stiers, Joshua)
March 1, 2024 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Trans Union, LLC..(Weyand, Jacqueline)
February 29, 2024 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC..(Richman, Steven)
February 29, 2024 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. Document filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC..(Richman, Steven)
February 29, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Mark Richman on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC..(Richman, Steven)
February 29, 2024 Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Michael Defosse.(Singer, Adam)
February 29, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Proof of Service - Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference and Judge Woods Civil Practice Rules served via email on all defendants re: #7 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference,. Document filed by Michael Defosse..(Singer, Adam)
February 27, 2024 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Document filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc...(Orujlu, Nurlan)
February 27, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nurlan Orujlu on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc...(Orujlu, Nurlan)
February 23, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Guttmann Singer on behalf of Michael Defosse..(Singer, Adam)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The conference will be conducted by telephone. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 5/24/2024 at 04:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/21/2024) (jca)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER This action was removed from the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York, on February 16, 2024. Dkt. No. 1. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 81(c)(3), if any party wishes to demand a jury trial in this matter, the demand must be served and filed no later than March 1, 2024. Additionally, counsel for Plaintiff is directed to promptly file a notice of appearance in this case. Counsel for Defendants is directed to serve a copy of this order on Plaintiff, and to retain proof of service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/21/2024) (jca)
February 20, 2024 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Defendant Trans Union, LLC's: (1) Notice of Removal (Doc. No. 1), dated and filed on 2/16/2024; (2) Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. No. 4), dated 2/16/2024 and filed on 2/20/2024; along with (3) the Civil Cover Sheet (Doc. No. 3), dated and filed on 2/16/2024; (4) Judge Gregory H. Woods Individual Rules in Civil Cases; and (5) Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn Individual Rules in Civil Cases. served on Plaintiff Michael Defosse, Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., and Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC, via their respective attorneys on February 20, 2024. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Trans Union, LLC..(Weyand, Jacqueline)
February 20, 2024 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc.,, Other Affiliate TransUnion for Trans Union, LLC. Document filed by Trans Union, LLC..(Weyand, Jacqueline)
February 20, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
February 20, 2024 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
February 20, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Jacqueline M Weyand to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes or No radio button - If Yes - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
February 16, 2024 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Weyand, Jacqueline)
February 16, 2024 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE ENTERED INCORRECTLY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Trans Union LLC is a wholly owned subsidiary of TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. is wholly owned by TransUnion. TransUnion is a publicly traded entity with the ticker symbol TRU. Investment funds affiliated with T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., a publicly-traded entity with the ticker symbol TROW, own more than 10 percent of TransUnions stock. for Trans Union, LLC. Document filed by Trans Union, LLC..(Weyand, Jacqueline) Modified on 2/20/2024 (lb).
February 16, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 150694/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28958634).Document filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of Summons with Notice AND Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Copy of Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Copy of Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal to be filed with the New York County Supreme Court, #4 Exhibit D - Copies of Defendants Experian's and Equifax's Consent to Removal).(Weyand, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Defosse v. Trans Union, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Defosse
Represented By: Adam Guttmann Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline M Weyand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Nurlan Orujlu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Allen Stiers
Represented By: Steven Mark Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?