Uber Technologies, Inc. et al v. Maya Assurance Company
Plaintiff: Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber USA, LLC, Rasier-NY, LLC, Rasier, LLC, Vierzehn- NY, LLC and Rasier-CA, LLC
Defendant: Maya Assurance Company
Case Number: 1:2024cv01209
Filed: February 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. APPLICATION GRANTED SO ORDERED. Extension is granted until April 23, 2024. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/29/2024) (jca)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION granting #10 Motion for Selena J. Linde to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/29/2024) (rro)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION granting #7 Motion for Juan J. Fonseca Angel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/29/2024) (rro)
March 29, 2024 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint, addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Philip A. Nemecek dated 3/29/24. Document filed by Maya Assurance Company..(Nemecek, Philip)
March 29, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: Maya Assurance Company answer due 4/23/2024. (jca)
March 28, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Selena J. Linde to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29144353. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Rasier, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC, Rasier-NY, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber USA, LLC, Vierzehn- NY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Selena J. Linde in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order - Proposed Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Linde, Selena)
March 28, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Selena J. Linde to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29144353. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
March 27, 2024 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Civil Cover Sheet and Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement served on Defendant Maya Insurance Company on March 12, 2024. Service was accepted by Rawatee Dhanwa, BI Adjuster. Document filed by Rasier, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC, Rasier-NY, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber USA, LLC, Vierzehn- NY, LLC..(Mandelsberg, Adam)
March 27, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Philip Adam Nemecek on behalf of Maya Assurance Company..(Nemecek, Philip)
March 27, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Juan J. Fonseca Angel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29137799. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Rasier, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC, Rasier-NY, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber USA, LLC, Vierzehn- NY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Juan J. Fonseca Angel in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order - Proposed Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Fonseca Angel, Juan)
March 27, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,, served. Maya Assurance Company served on 3/12/2024, answer due 4/2/2024. Service was accepted by Rawatee Dhanwa, BI Adjuster. Document filed by Rasier-CA, LLC; Uber Technologies, Inc.; Rasier, LLC; Rasier-NY, LLC; Uber USA, LLC; Vierzehn- NY, LLC..(Mandelsberg, Adam)
March 27, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Juan J. Fonseca Angel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29137799. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
March 11, 2024 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Maya Assurance Company. (vf)
March 8, 2024 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Defendant Maya Assurance Company, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Rasier, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC, Rasier-NY, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber USA, LLC, Vierzehn- NY, LLC..(Mandelsberg, Adam)
March 1, 2024 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Uber Technologies, Inc. for Rasier, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC, Rasier-NY, LLC, Uber USA, LLC, Vierzehn- NY, LLC. Document filed by Rasier, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC, Rasier-NY, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber USA, LLC, Vierzehn- NY, LLC..(Mandelsberg, Adam)
February 20, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Adam Ross Mandelsberg. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
February 20, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
February 20, 2024 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
February 20, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
February 16, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mandelsberg, Adam)
February 16, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Maya Assurance Company. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28961606)Document filed by Rasier-CA, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., Rasier, LLC, Rasier-NY, LLC, Uber USA, LLC, Vierzehn- NY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Chart of Underlying Lawsuits, #2 Exhibit B - Maya Assurance Policy, #3 Exhibit C - Cajigas Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Cajigas Denial, #5 Exhibit E - Elliott Complaint, #6 Exhibit F - Elliott Denial, #7 Exhibit G - Nieves Complaint, #8 Exhibit H - Nieves Denial, #9 Exhibit I - Maisonet Complaint, #10 Exhibit J - Maisonet Denial, #11 Exhibit K - Martinez Complaint, #12 Exhibit L - Martinez Denial).(Mandelsberg, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uber Technologies, Inc. et al v. Maya Assurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Ross Mandelsberg
Represented By: Juan Jose Fonseca Angel
Represented By: Selena J Linde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uber USA, LLC
Represented By: Adam Ross Mandelsberg
Represented By: Juan Jose Fonseca Angel
Represented By: Selena J Linde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rasier-NY, LLC
Represented By: Adam Ross Mandelsberg
Represented By: Juan Jose Fonseca Angel
Represented By: Selena J Linde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rasier, LLC
Represented By: Adam Ross Mandelsberg
Represented By: Juan Jose Fonseca Angel
Represented By: Selena J Linde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vierzehn- NY, LLC
Represented By: Adam Ross Mandelsberg
Represented By: Juan Jose Fonseca Angel
Represented By: Selena J Linde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rasier-CA, LLC
Represented By: Adam Ross Mandelsberg
Represented By: Juan Jose Fonseca Angel
Represented By: Selena J Linde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maya Assurance Company
Represented By: Philip Adam Nemecek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?