PowX Inc. v. Performance Solutions, LLC
Plaintiff: POWX, INC and PowX Inc.
Defendant: Performance Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv01389
Filed: February 23, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margaret M Garnett
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2024 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Performance Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of K. Dye, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Dr. R. Abbott, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of L. Copley, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of J. Lewis, #5 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of C. Scott, #6 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of A. Puri).(Puri, Asheesh)
April 10, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by Performance Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Motion for Entry of Preliminary Injunction).(Puri, Asheesh)
April 10, 2024 Filing 14 ANSWER to #9 Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against PowX Inc.. Document filed by Performance Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10).(Puri, Asheesh)
April 10, 2024 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Performance Solutions, LLC..(Puri, Asheesh)
April 4, 2024 Filing 12 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(pc)
April 3, 2024 Filing 11 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Lekht, Eliezer)
April 3, 2024 Filing 10 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lekht, Eliezer)
April 3, 2024 Filing 9 COMPLAINT against Performance Solutions, LLC. Document filed by PowX Inc...(Lekht, Eliezer)
April 3, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eliezer Lekht on behalf of PowX Inc...(Lekht, Eliezer)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/2/2024 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Margaret M. Garnett. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 2/29/2024) (jca)
February 26, 2024 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Performance Solutions, LLC..(pc)
February 26, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Tuvia Rotberg to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
February 26, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Tuvia Rotberg to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
February 26, 2024 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
February 26, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Margaret M. Garnett. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
February 26, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Tuvia Rotberg. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code Disbarment Proceedings; County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:2201; the County code has been modified to Orange;. (pc)
February 26, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 26, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Tuvia Rotberg. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: POWX, INC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc)
February 26, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Tuvia Rotberg to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; Origin is blank, Jurisdiction is blank, Cause of action is blank, office is blank, civil cover sheet was not signed;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (pc)
February 26, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Tuvia Rotberg to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
February 23, 2024 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Performance Solutions, LLC, re: #3 Amended Complaint. Document filed by POWX, INC..(Rotberg, Tuvia)
February 23, 2024 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rotberg, Tuvia) Modified on 2/26/2024 (pc).
February 23, 2024 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against POWX, INC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by POWX, INC. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Rotberg, Tuvia) Modified on 2/26/2024 (pc).
February 23, 2024 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by POWX, INC..(Rotberg, Tuvia)
February 23, 2024 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against POWX, INC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28987268)Document filed by POWX, INC..(Rotberg, Tuvia) Modified on 2/26/2024 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PowX Inc. v. Performance Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: POWX, INC
Represented By: Tuvia Rotberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PowX Inc.
Represented By: Eliezer Lekht
Represented By: Tuvia Rotberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Performance Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Asheesh P. Puri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?