Jones v. Combs et al
Plaintiff: RODNEY JONES
Defendant: SEAN COMBS, JUSTIN DIOR COMBS, ETHIOPIA HABTEMARIAM, LUCIAN CHARLES GRAINGE, KRISTINA KHORRAM, CHALICE RECORDING STUDIOS, LOVE RECORDS, MOTOWN RECORDS, UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP, COMBS GLOBAL ENTERPRISES, JOHN and JANE DOES 1-10, ABC CORPORATIONS. 1-10 and Cuba Gooding, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2024cv01457
Filed: February 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2024 Filing 44 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sean Combs, Justin Dior Combs, Cuba Gooding, Jr., Lucian Charles Grainge, Kristina Khorram, Love Records, Motown Records, Universal Music Group, Combs Global Enterprises, re: #38 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Rodney Jones. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Defendants List Rider-Summons).(Blackburn, Tyrone)
April 25, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Tyrone Anthony Blackburn to RE-FILE Document No. #43 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party name on the docket text and the attached rider does not match exactly as it appears on the pleading caption (Justin Combs). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
April 24, 2024 Filing 43 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sean Combs, Justin Combs, Cuba Gooding, Jr., Lucian Charles Grainge, Kristina Khorram, Love Records, Motown Records, Universal Music Group, and Combs Global Enterprises, re: #38 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Rodney Jones. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Defendants List Rider-Summons).(Blackburn, Tyrone) Modified on 4/25/2024 (jgo).
April 24, 2024 Filing 42 DECLARATION of Donald S. Zakarin in Support re: #40 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Lucian Charles Grainge, Motown Records, Universal Music Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Sir Lucian Grainge, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Martha Braithwaite, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Ethiopia Habtemariam, #4 Exhibit 4 - Second Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 - Ventura v. Combs et al, #6 Exhibit 6 - Transcript of April 9, 2024 Court Telephone Conference, #7 Exhibit 7 - Blackburn 3/25 Email to Davis, #8 Exhibit 8 - Zakarin 3/4 Letter to Blackburn).(Saady, Nicholas)
April 24, 2024 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #40 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Lucian Charles Grainge, Motown Records, Universal Music Group..(Saady, Nicholas)
April 24, 2024 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Lucian Charles Grainge, Motown Records, Universal Music Group..(Saady, Nicholas)
April 18, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Tyrone Anthony Blackburn to RE-FILE Document No. #39 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Defendant party name errors. Defendant party names listed on Summons PDF and ECF docket entry do not correspond exactly to pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
April 17, 2024 Filing 39 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sean Combs, Justin Combs, Cuba Gooding, Jr., Kristina Khorram, Love Records, Combs Global, re: #38 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Rodney Jones. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Defendant List).(Blackburn, Tyrone) Modified on 4/18/2024 (vf).
April 12, 2024 Filing 38 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #27 Amended Complaint,, #16 Amended Complaint,, against ABC Corporations. 1-10, Justin Dior Combs, Sean Combs, Combs Global Enterprises, Cuba Gooding, Jr., Lucian Charles Grainge, John and Jane Does 1-10, Kristina Khorram, Love Records, Motown Records, Universal Music Group with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Rodney Jones. Related document: #27 Amended Complaint,, #16 Amended Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit A).(Blackburn, Tyrone)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying without prejudice #24 Motion to Dismiss. The UMG Defendants' motion to dismiss the First Amended Complaint is denied as moot and without prejudice to re-filing in light of the filing of a Second Amended Complaint. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #30 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document: As discussed during the telephone conference held on April 9, 2024, Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a second amended complaint is granted. Plaintiff shall file the proposed second amended complaint on ECF as a separate docket entry. The UMG Defendants shall file their motion to dismiss by April 30, 2024. Plaintiff's opposition shall be filed within three weeks of the filing of Defendants' motion and any reply shall be filed within two weeks of the filing of Plaintiff's opposition. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.)
April 9, 2024 Filing 35 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Tyrone A. Blackburn, Esq. dated 04/09/24 re: Response to Defendants letter dated 4/4/24. Document filed by Rodney Jones..(Blackburn, Tyrone)
April 9, 2024 Filing 34 FIRST REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #30 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Tyrone A. Blackburn, Esq. dated 3/28/24. . Document filed by Rodney Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Blackburn, Tyrone)
April 9, 2024 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Paul Oetken: Telephonic Pretrial Conference held on 4/9/2024. See Order. See transcript. (bh)
April 4, 2024 Filing 33 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Donald S. Zakarin, Esq. dated April 4, 2024 Document filed by Lucian Charles Grainge, Motown Records, Universal Music Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Judge Cote Order).(Saady, Nicholas)
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: Counsel for the parties shall appear for a telephone conference on April 9, 2024, at 3:30 p.m. At the scheduled time, counsel should call (888) 557-8511 and enter passcode 9300838. So ordered. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken) (Text Only Order) (nhb)
April 1, 2024 Filing 31 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Donald S. Zakarin dated April 1, 2024 re: #30 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Tyrone A. Blackburn, Esq. dated 3/28/24. . Document filed by Lucian Charles Grainge, Motown Records, Universal Music Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Ethiopia Habtemariam, #2 Exhibit 2 - Lin Letter to Blackburn, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Martha Braithwaite, #4 Exhibit 4 - Blackburn X Statement).(Saady, Nicholas)
March 28, 2024 Filing 30 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Tyrone A. Blackburn, Esq. dated 3/28/24. Document filed by Rodney Jones. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B).(Blackburn, Tyrone)
March 28, 2024 Filing 29 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Donald S. Zakarin, Esq. dated March 28, 2024 Document filed by Lucian Charles Grainge, Motown Records, Universal Music Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - March 4, 2024 Letter from D. Zakarin to T. Blackburn).(Saady, Nicholas)
March 28, 2024 Filing 28 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Tyrone A. Blackburn, Esq. dated 3/27/24 re: Defendants Bad Faith Motion To Dismiss. Document filed by Rodney Jones..(Blackburn, Tyrone)
March 28, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Tyrone Anthony Blackburn to RE-FILE re: Document No. #27 Second Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Court's leave has not been granted; the order granting permission to file the pleading was not attached; The pleading is not linked to a First Amended Complaint. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. File the Exhibit to Pleading event found under the event list Other Documents and attach either opposing party's written consent or Court's leave. (vf)
March 27, 2024 Filing 27 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #16 Amended Complaint,, against ABC Corporations. 1-10, Justin Dior Combs, Sean Combs, Combs Global Enterprises, Cuba Gooding, Jr., Lucian Charles Grainge, John and Jane Does 1-10, Kristina Khorram, Love Records, Motown Records, Universal Music Group with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Rodney Jones. Related document: #16 Amended Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attachment B, #2 Exhibit Attachment A).(Blackburn, Tyrone)
March 27, 2024 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Donald S. Zakarin in Support re: #24 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Lucian Charles Grainge, Motown Records, Universal Music Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Sir Lucian Grainge, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Martha Braithwaite, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Ethiopia Habtemariam, #4 Exhibit 4 - First Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 - Love Records Incorporation, #6 Exhibit 6 - Discover Music Article, #7 Exhibit 7 - List of UMG Labels, #8 Exhibit 8 - Billboard & Revolt Articles, #9 Exhibit 9 - Ventura v. Combs et al, #10 Exhibit 10 - March 4, 2024 Letter from D. Zakarin to T. Blackburn).(Saady, Nicholas)
March 27, 2024 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #24 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Lucian Charles Grainge, Motown Records, Universal Music Group..(Saady, Nicholas)
March 27, 2024 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint. Document filed by Lucian Charles Grainge, Motown Records, Universal Music Group. Responses due by 4/10/2024 Return Date set for 4/17/2024 at 11:59 PM..(Saady, Nicholas)
March 27, 2024 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Lucian Charles Grainge..(Saady, Nicholas)
March 27, 2024 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Motown Records..(Saady, Nicholas)
March 27, 2024 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Universal Music Group..(Saady, Nicholas)
March 27, 2024 Filing 20 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Universal Music Group N.V., Other Affiliate Compagnie de Cornouaille SAS, Other Affiliate PS VII Master, L.P. for Motown Records, Universal Music Group. Document filed by Motown Records, Universal Music Group..(Saady, Nicholas)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff Rodney Jones hereby gives notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice, against Defendant Ethiopia Habtemariam only. So ordered. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the below-named defendant from this case., (Ethiopia Habtemariam terminated.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 3/26/24) (yv)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff Rodney Jones hereby gives notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, WITHOUT prejudice, against Defendant Chalice Recording Studios only. Plaintiff will refile against Defendant Chalice Recording Studios in Los Angeles, California. So ordered. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the below-named defendant from this case., (Chalice Recording Studios terminated.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 3/26/24) (yv)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Amend/Correct: Granted. So ordered. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (nhb)
March 26, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Tyrone Anthony Blackburn to RE-FILE Document No. #16 Second Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the Court name contains a typographical error; the PDF must be titled to correspond with the proper event type; the wrong event type was used to file the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
March 25, 2024 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #2 Complaint, against ABC Corporations. 1-10, Justin Dior Combs, Sean Combs, Combs Global Enterprises, Lucian Charles Grainge, John and Jane Does 1-10, Kristina Khorram, Love Records, Motown Records, Universal Music Group, Cuba Gooding, Jr. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Rodney Jones. Related document: #2 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit B, #2 Affidavit A).(Blackburn, Tyrone) Modified on 3/26/2024 (jgo).
March 25, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alina Jamil Mian on behalf of Lucian Charles Grainge, Ethiopia Habtemariam, Motown Records, Universal Music Group..(Mian, Alina)
March 25, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas George Saady on behalf of Lucian Charles Grainge, Ethiopia Habtemariam, Motown Records, Universal Music Group..(Saady, Nicholas)
March 25, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Laurence Charron on behalf of Lucian Charles Grainge, Ethiopia Habtemariam, Motown Records, Universal Music Group..(Charron, William)
March 25, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James A. Janowitz on behalf of Lucian Charles Grainge, Ethiopia Habtemariam, Motown Records, Universal Music Group..(Janowitz, James)
March 25, 2024 Filing 11 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Donald S. Zakarin, Esq. dated March 25, 2024 Document filed by Lucian Charles Grainge, Ethiopia Habtemariam, Motown Records, Universal Music Group..(Zakarin, Donald)
March 25, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Donald S. Zakarin on behalf of Lucian Charles Grainge, Ethiopia Habtemariam, Motown Records, Universal Music Group..(Zakarin, Donald)
March 25, 2024 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal,, was reviewed and referred to Judge J. Paul Oetken for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety;. (nd)
March 23, 2024 Filing 9 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Tyrone A. Blackburn, Esq. dated 03/23/24 re: Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants Ethiopia Habtemariam, and Chalice Recording Studios pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Document filed by Rodney Jones..(Blackburn, Tyrone)
March 23, 2024 Filing 8 FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, . Document filed by Rodney Jones..(Blackburn, Tyrone)
March 23, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Chalice Recording Studios. Document filed by Rodney Jones. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Blackburn, Tyrone)
March 23, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Ethiopia Habtemariam. Document filed by Rodney Jones. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Blackburn, Tyrone)
March 20, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #5 FIRST MOTION for Rodney Diggs, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice For Plaintiff Rodney Jones. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29102400. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.>/FO. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California; Must provide a Declaration or a signed and notarized affidavit; Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (rju)
March 19, 2024 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION for Rodney Diggs, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice For Plaintiff Rodney Jones. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29102400. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Rodney Jones. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Blackburn, Tyrone) Modified on 3/20/2024 (rju).
March 5, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Tyrone Anthony Blackburn. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: RODNEY JONES; SEAN COMBS; JUSTIN DIOR COMBS; ETHIOPIA HABTEMARIAM; LUCIAN CHARLES GRAINGE; KRISTINA KHORRAM; CHALICE RECORDING STUDIOS; LOVE RECORDS; MOTOWN RECORDS; UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP; COMBS GLOBAL ENTERPRISES; JOHN and JANE DOES 1-10 ; ABC CORPORATIONS. 1-10. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
March 5, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Tyrone Anthony Blackburn. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $30,000,000,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to none;. (jgo)
March 5, 2024 Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
March 5, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
March 5, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
March 5, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Tyrone Anthony Blackburn to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party name on the attached rider does not match exactly as it appears on the pleading caption (Combs Enterprises). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
March 4, 2024 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SEAN COMBS, JUSTIN DIOR COMBS, ETHIOPIA HABTEMARIAM, LUCIAN CHARLES GRAINGE, KRISTINA KHORRAM, CHALICE RECORDING STUDIOS, LOVE RECORDS, MOTOWN RECORDS, UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP, COMBS GLOBAL ENTERPRISES, re: #2 Complaint,. Document filed by RODNEY JONES. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Defendants List Rider-Summons).(Blackburn, Tyrone) Modified on 3/5/2024 (jgo).
March 4, 2024 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Blackburn, Tyrone)
March 4, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against ABC CORPORATIONS. 1-10, CHALICE RECORDING STUDIOS, JUSTIN DIOR COMBS, SEAN COMBS, COMBS GLOBAL ENTERPRISES, LUCIAN CHARLES GRAINGE, ETHIOPIA HABTEMARIAM, JOHN and JANE DOES 1-10, KRISTINA KHORRAM, LOVE RECORDS, MOTOWN RECORDS, UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29026491)Document filed by RODNEY JONES..(Blackburn, Tyrone)
February 27, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Tyrone Anthony Blackburn to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the PDF must be titled to correspond with the event type used. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 3/4/2024. (jgo)
February 27, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Tyrone Anthony Blackburn to RE-FILE Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; all of the party names must be listed on the PDF case caption. If all of the party names do not fit, include 'et al'; the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet; the PDF must be filed separately. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
February 26, 2024 Filing 1 FILING ERROR DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against ABC CORPORATIONS. 1-10, CHALICE RECORDING STUDIOS, JUSTIN DIOR COMBS, SEAN COMBS, COMBS GLOBAL ENTERPRISES, LUCIAN CHARLES GRAINGE, ETHIOPIA HABTEMARIAM, JOHN and JANE DOES 1-10, KRISTINA KHORRAM, LOVE RECORDS, MOTOWN RECORDS, UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28998805)Document filed by RODNEY JONES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet).(Blackburn, Tyrone) Modified on 2/27/2024 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Combs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODNEY JONES
Represented By: Tyrone Anthony Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEAN COMBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUSTIN DIOR COMBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ETHIOPIA HABTEMARIAM
Represented By: Nicholas George Saady
Represented By: William Laurence Charron
Represented By: Alina Jamil Mian
Represented By: James A. Janowitz
Represented By: Donald S. Zakarin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUCIAN CHARLES GRAINGE
Represented By: Donald S. Zakarin
Represented By: Alina Jamil Mian
Represented By: James A. Janowitz
Represented By: William Laurence Charron
Represented By: Nicholas George Saady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRISTINA KHORRAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHALICE RECORDING STUDIOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOVE RECORDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOTOWN RECORDS
Represented By: William Laurence Charron
Represented By: Nicholas George Saady
Represented By: Alina Jamil Mian
Represented By: James A. Janowitz
Represented By: Donald S. Zakarin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP
Represented By: Alina Jamil Mian
Represented By: James A. Janowitz
Represented By: William Laurence Charron
Represented By: Nicholas George Saady
Represented By: Donald S. Zakarin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMBS GLOBAL ENTERPRISES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN and JANE DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuba Gooding, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?