Raw Story Media, Inc. et al v. OpenAI Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Raw Story Media, Inc. and AlterNet Media, Inc.
Defendant: OpenAI Inc., OpenAI GP LLC, OpenAI LLC, OpenAI OpCo LLC, OpenAI Global LLC, OAI Corporation, LLC and OpenAI Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv01514
Filed: February 28, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 1201 Digital Millennium Copyright Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/18/2024 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/6/2024) (ks)
March 5, 2024 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(tro)
March 5, 2024 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (tro)
March 5, 2024 CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 1:23-cv-11195-SHS and declined by Judge Sidney H. Stein and returned to wheel for assignment. (tro)
March 4, 2024 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. OpenAI LLC waiver sent on 2/29/2024, answer due 4/29/2024. Document filed by AlterNet Media, Inc.; Raw Story Media, Inc...(Match, Stephen)
March 4, 2024 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. OpenAI Inc. waiver sent on 2/29/2024, answer due 4/29/2024. Document filed by AlterNet Media, Inc.; Raw Story Media, Inc...(Match, Stephen)
March 4, 2024 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. OpenAI OpCo LLC waiver sent on 2/29/2024, answer due 4/29/2024. Document filed by AlterNet Media, Inc.; Raw Story Media, Inc...(Match, Stephen)
March 4, 2024 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. OpenAI Holdings, LLC waiver sent on 2/29/2024, answer due 4/29/2024. Document filed by AlterNet Media, Inc.; Raw Story Media, Inc...(Match, Stephen)
March 4, 2024 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. OpenAI GP LLC waiver sent on 2/29/2024, answer due 4/29/2024. Document filed by AlterNet Media, Inc.; Raw Story Media, Inc...(Match, Stephen)
March 4, 2024 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. OpenAI Global LLC waiver sent on 2/29/2024, answer due 4/29/2024. Document filed by AlterNet Media, Inc.; Raw Story Media, Inc...(Match, Stephen)
March 4, 2024 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. OAI Corporation, LLC waiver sent on 2/29/2024, answer due 4/29/2024. Document filed by AlterNet Media, Inc.; Raw Story Media, Inc...(Match, Stephen)
March 1, 2024 Filing 8 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(gp)
February 29, 2024 Filing 7 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Match, Stephen)
February 29, 2024 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Match, Stephen)
February 29, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Stephen Stich Match to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Signature Error. The Form is not properly signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
February 29, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
February 29, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (vf)
February 29, 2024 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Sidney H. Stein as possibly related to 1:23-cv-11195. (vf)
February 29, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Stephen Stich Match to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
February 28, 2024 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 23-cv-11195. Document filed by AlterNet Media, Inc., Raw Story Media, Inc...(Match, Stephen)
February 28, 2024 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by AlterNet Media, Inc., Raw Story Media, Inc...(Match, Stephen)
February 28, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Stich Match on behalf of AlterNet Media, Inc., Raw Story Media, Inc...(Match, Stephen)
February 28, 2024 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Match, Stephen) Modified on 2/29/2024 (vf).
February 28, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OAI Corporation, LLC, OpenAI GP LLC, OpenAI Global LLC, OpenAI Holdings, LLC, OpenAI Inc., OpenAI LLC, OpenAI OpCo LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29007160)Document filed by AlterNet Media, Inc., Raw Story Media, Inc...(Match, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raw Story Media, Inc. et al v. OpenAI Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raw Story Media, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Stich Match
Represented By: Jon Loevy
Represented By: Lauren Carbajal
Represented By: Matthew Topic
Represented By: Michael Kanovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AlterNet Media, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Stich Match
Represented By: Jon Loevy
Represented By: Lauren Carbajal
Represented By: Matthew Topic
Represented By: Michael Kanovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OpenAI Inc.
Represented By: Allison Levine Stillman
Represented By: Andrew Gass
Represented By: Joseph C. Gratz
Represented By: Joseph Richard Wetzel, Jr.,
Represented By: Robert A. Van Nest
Represented By: Sarang Damle
Represented By: Allyson R. Bennett
Represented By: Katie Lynn Joyce
Represented By: Luke Budiardjo
Represented By: Michelle S. Ybarra
Represented By: Nicholas S Goldberg
Represented By: Paven Malhotra
Represented By: R. James Slaughter
Represented By: Rose Lee
Represented By: Thomas Edward Gorman
Represented By: Vera Ranieri
Represented By: Yijun Zhong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OpenAI GP LLC
Represented By: Allison Levine Stillman
Represented By: Andrew Gass
Represented By: Joseph C. Gratz
Represented By: Joseph Richard Wetzel, Jr.,
Represented By: Robert A. Van Nest
Represented By: Sarang Damle
Represented By: Allyson R. Bennett
Represented By: Katie Lynn Joyce
Represented By: Luke Budiardjo
Represented By: Michelle S. Ybarra
Represented By: Nicholas S Goldberg
Represented By: Paven Malhotra
Represented By: R. James Slaughter
Represented By: Rose Lee
Represented By: Vera Ranieri
Represented By: Yijun Zhong
Represented By: Thomas Edward Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OpenAI LLC
Represented By: Joseph C. Gratz
Represented By: Joseph Richard Wetzel, Jr.,
Represented By: Robert A. Van Nest
Represented By: Luke Budiardjo
Represented By: R. James Slaughter
Represented By: Rose Lee
Represented By: Thomas Edward Gorman
Represented By: Vera Ranieri
Represented By: Yijun Zhong
Represented By: Allison Levine Stillman
Represented By: Andrew Gass
Represented By: Sarang Damle
Represented By: Allyson R. Bennett
Represented By: Katie Lynn Joyce
Represented By: Michelle S. Ybarra
Represented By: Nicholas S Goldberg
Represented By: Paven Malhotra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OpenAI OpCo LLC
Represented By: Allison Levine Stillman
Represented By: Andrew Gass
Represented By: Joseph C. Gratz
Represented By: Joseph Richard Wetzel, Jr.,
Represented By: Robert A. Van Nest
Represented By: Sarang Damle
Represented By: Allyson R. Bennett
Represented By: Katie Lynn Joyce
Represented By: Luke Budiardjo
Represented By: Michelle S. Ybarra
Represented By: Nicholas S Goldberg
Represented By: Paven Malhotra
Represented By: R. James Slaughter
Represented By: Rose Lee
Represented By: Thomas Edward Gorman
Represented By: Vera Ranieri
Represented By: Yijun Zhong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OpenAI Global LLC
Represented By: Allison Levine Stillman
Represented By: Andrew Gass
Represented By: Joseph C. Gratz
Represented By: Joseph Richard Wetzel, Jr.,
Represented By: Robert A. Van Nest
Represented By: Sarang Damle
Represented By: Luke Budiardjo
Represented By: Michelle S. Ybarra
Represented By: Allyson R. Bennett
Represented By: Katie Lynn Joyce
Represented By: Nicholas S Goldberg
Represented By: Paven Malhotra
Represented By: R. James Slaughter
Represented By: Rose Lee
Represented By: Thomas Edward Gorman
Represented By: Yijun Zhong
Represented By: Vera Ranieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OAI Corporation, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Gass
Represented By: Allison Levine Stillman
Represented By: Joseph C. Gratz
Represented By: Joseph Richard Wetzel, Jr.,
Represented By: Robert A. Van Nest
Represented By: Sarang Damle
Represented By: Nicholas S Goldberg
Represented By: Paven Malhotra
Represented By: Allyson R. Bennett
Represented By: Katie Lynn Joyce
Represented By: Luke Budiardjo
Represented By: Michelle S. Ybarra
Represented By: R. James Slaughter
Represented By: Rose Lee
Represented By: Thomas Edward Gorman
Represented By: Vera Ranieri
Represented By: Yijun Zhong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OpenAI Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Gass
Represented By: Joseph C. Gratz
Represented By: Joseph Richard Wetzel, Jr.,
Represented By: Allison Levine Stillman
Represented By: Robert A. Van Nest
Represented By: Allyson R. Bennett
Represented By: Luke Budiardjo
Represented By: Michelle S. Ybarra
Represented By: Nicholas S Goldberg
Represented By: Paven Malhotra
Represented By: Sarang Damle
Represented By: Katie Lynn Joyce
Represented By: R. James Slaughter
Represented By: Thomas Edward Gorman
Represented By: Rose Lee
Represented By: Vera Ranieri
Represented By: Yijun Zhong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?