PORETSKIN v. CHANEL, INC. et al
Plaintiff: COURTNEY PORETSKIN
Defendant: Chanel Inc, CARL POULTER, LISA GASPERINI and John Doe's One through Ten
Case Number: 1:2024cv01643
Filed: March 4, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 nr Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER STAYING THE PROCEEDING IT IS on this 3rd day of April, 2024 ORDERED that: 1. This matter is hereby stayed pending the outcome of the arbitration proceedings. 2. A copy of this Order shall be provided to all parties within three (3) days of the entry of this Order. 3. The parties are directed to submit a status update to the Court as to the disposition of the arbitration proceedings within 48 hours thereof. Case stayed. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/3/2024) (jca)
April 3, 2024 Filing 21 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Chanel Inc..(Rainone, Anthony)
March 28, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aladekemi Omoregie on behalf of Chanel Inc..(Omoregie, Aladekemi)
March 12, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Harrison on behalf of COURTNEY PORETSKIN..(Harrison, David)
March 6, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Michael Rainone on behalf of Chanel Inc..(Rainone, Anthony)
March 4, 2024 Filing 17 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of New Jersey; Case Number: 2:23-cv-22613. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received.
March 4, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vba)
March 4, 2024 Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
March 4, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (vba)
March 4, 2024 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (vba)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER adopting #15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; denying #8 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand; denying without prejudice #11 Defendant Chanel, Inc.'s Cross Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration; granting Defendant Chanel, Inc.'s request to transfer this matter to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 2/21/2024. (dam) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
February 21, 2024 ***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #16 Order Adopting R&R (dam) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
January 29, 2024 Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by COURTNEY PORETSKIN Objections, if any, to R&R due by 2/13/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/29/2024. (sm) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: The Telephone Scheduling Conference on 1/29/2024 is adjourned to 2/27/2024 at 2:00 p.m. The parties will dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the conference. The parties shall file a joint discovery plan by 2/23/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/24/2024. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: The parties shall electronically file the joint discovery plan by 1/25/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/23/2024. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
January 9, 2024 Filing 12 BRIEF in Opposition filed by COURTNEY PORETSKIN re #8 MOTION to Remand , #11 Cross MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively to Transfer to the Southern District of New York (Attachments: #1 Certification of Exhibits, #2 Exhibits A-D) (MULICK, MARK) Modified on 1/9/2024 (dam). [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
January 2, 2024 Filing 11 Cross MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively to Transfer to the Southern District of New York by CHANEL, INC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Chanel, Inc.'s Cross-Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of Arnold G. Sooklall, Esq., #4 Declaration of Tyler Beauchea, #5 Declaration of Michelle Rhee, #6 Declaration of James Galli) (RAINONE, ANTHONY) Modified on 1/2/2024 (dam). [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
January 2, 2024 Set Deadlines as to #11 Cross MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively to Transfer to the Southern District of New York. Cross Motion set for 1/16/2024 before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
December 18, 2023 Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Remand. Motion reset for 1/16/2024 before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
December 14, 2023 Filing 10 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #8 MOTION to Remand . (SOOKLALL, ARNOLD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 1/29/2024 at 12:30 p.m. The parties will dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the conference. The parties shall file a joint discovery plan by 1/25/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/7/2023. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
December 6, 2023 #8 MOTION to Remand REFERRED to Michael A. Hammer. (cds) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
December 5, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Remand. Motion set for 1/2/2024 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
December 4, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by COURTNEY PORETSKIN. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Letter Brief, #3 Certification Mark Mulick, #4 Exhibits A-E) (MULICK, MARK) Modified on 12/5/2023 (dam). [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
December 1, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK A. MULICK on behalf of COURTNEY PORETSKIN (MULICK, MARK) Modified on 12/4/2023 (dam). [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
December 1, 2023 Filing 6 Diversity Disclosure Statement by COURTNEY PORETSKIN. (MULICK, MARK) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
November 27, 2023 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHANEL, INC.. (SOOKLALL, ARNOLD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 Diversity Disclosure Statement by CHANEL, INC.. (SOOKLALL, ARNOLD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHANEL, INC.. (SOOKLALL, ARNOLD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by ARNOLD GEWAN SOOKLALL on behalf of CHANEL, INC. (SOOKLALL, ARNOLD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
November 27, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #2 Notice of Appearance submitted by Arnold Sooklall on 11/27/2023 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov and the Manage My Account section of PACER for information and instructions on maintaining your account. Please be advised that the primary e-mail address for Counsel has been modified for this case to reflect the information found in the #2 Notice of Appearance. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dam) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
November 26, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court. #Click here to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (dam) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
November 26, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party or intervenor. Please refer to the Court's website at #www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (dam) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
November 26, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The State Court Complaint at ECF No. #1 -1 - Exhibit 1 submitted on 11/22/2023 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case as to Mark Mulick, Esq., Counsel for Plaintiff. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov and the Manage My Account section of PACER for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (dam) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CHANEL, INC. from Superior Court of Middlesex County, case number MID-L-005639-23. (Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14892238), filed by CHANEL, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (RAINONE, ANTHONY) Modified on 11/26/2023 (dam). [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
November 22, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PORETSKIN v. CHANEL, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COURTNEY PORETSKIN
Represented By: MARK A. MULICK
Represented By: David Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chanel Inc
Represented By: ARNOLD GEWAN SOOKLALL
Represented By: ANTHONY M. RAINONE
Represented By: Anthony Michael Rainone
Represented By: Aladekemi Omoregie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARL POULTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA GASPERINI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe's One through Ten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?