Lovoi v. Chesapeake Energy Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Gerald Joseph Lovoi
Defendant: Chesapeake Energy Corporation, Domenic J. Dell'Osso, Jr., Michael A. Wichterich, Timothy S. Duncan, Benjamin C. Duster, IV, Sarah A. Emerson, Matthew M. Gallagher and Brian Steck
Case Number: 1:2024cv01896
Filed: March 13, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #6 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED in part. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for May 15, 2024, is ADJOURNED to June 12, 2024, at 4:10 P.M. The parties shall file their conference materials by June 5, 2024, or by the same date shall file a status letter regarding settlement discussions and requesting further adjournment.. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/8/2024) Initial Conference set for 6/12/2024 at 04:10 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (ks)
May 7, 2024 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Shane T. Rowley dated May 7, 2024. Document filed by Gerald Joseph Lovoi..(Rowley, Shane)
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for April 24, 2024, is ADJOURNED to May 15, 2024, at 4:10 P.M. The parties shall file their initial pretrial conference materials by May 8, 2024. Initial Conference set for 5/15/2024 at 04:10 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/22/2024) (mml)
April 22, 2024 Filing 4 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Shane T. Rowley dated April 22, 2024. Document filed by Gerald Joseph Lovoi..(Rowley, Shane)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that a telephonic conference will be held on April 24, 2024 at 4:10 p.m. The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. ( Initial Conference set for 4/24/2024 at 04:10 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Telephone Conference set for 4/24/2024 at 04:10 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/18/2024) (va)
March 14, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
March 14, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
March 14, 2024 Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
March 13, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rowley, Shane)
March 13, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chesapeake Energy Corporation, Domenic J. Dell'Osso, Jr, Timothy S. Duncan, Benjamin C. Duster, IV, Sarah A. Emerson, Matthew M. Gallagher, Brian Steck, Michael A. Wichterich. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29074429)Document filed by Gerald Joseph Lovoi..(Rowley, Shane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lovoi v. Chesapeake Energy Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Joseph Lovoi
Represented By: Shane Thomas Rowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domenic J. Dell'Osso, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Wichterich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy S. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin C. Duster, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah A. Emerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew M. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Steck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?