Fletcher et al v. Niang et al
Plaintiff: Bryan Fletcher and Garrett Fletcher
Defendant: Abdoulaye Niang, Alexander Niang, Mewza LLC, Abarika LLC, Henan Fanding Network Technology Co., LTD, John and Jane Does A-Z and XYZ Companies 1-10
Case Number: 1:2024cv01913
Filed: March 13, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Arun Subramanian
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2024 Filing 38 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Abarika LLC, Henan Fanding Network Technology Co., LTD, Mewza LLC, Abdoulaye Niang, Alexander Niang, John and Jane Does A-Z, XYZ Companies 1-10.Document filed by Bryan Fletcher, Garrett Fletcher. Related document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit B - Amazon Counter Notice, #3 Exhibit C - Twitter Counter Notice, #4 Supplement Redlined Amended Complaint).(Weber, Dorothy)
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 36.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 4/23/24) (yv)
April 19, 2024 Filing 36 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Dorothy M. Weber dated April 19, 2024. Document filed by Bryan Fletcher, Garrett Fletcher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation For Extension of Time).(Weber, Dorothy)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #34 Letter filed by Garrett Fletcher, Bryan Fletcher. ENDORSEMENT: Once Plaintiffs file an amended complaint, Defendants may either (i) file an answer; (ii) file a new motion to dismiss; or (iii) submit a letter stating that it relies on the initially filed motion to dismiss. In addition, in light of Plaintiffs' intention to file an amended complaint, the initial pretrial conference is adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED. ( Amended Pleadings due by 5/2/2024.) (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 4/18/2024) (vfr)
April 17, 2024 Filing 34 LETTER addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Dorothy M. Weber dated April 17, 2024 re: Notice to File Amended Complaint. Document filed by Bryan Fletcher, Garrett Fletcher..(Weber, Dorothy)
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #28 Motion for James W. Hawkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 4/12/2024) (vfr)
April 11, 2024 Filing 32 NOTICE of Notice of Motion re: #31 MOTION to Transfer Case To Transfer Jurisdiction.. Document filed by Abarika LLC, Mewza LLC, Abdoulaye Niang, Alexander Niang..(Bloomberg, Mark)
April 11, 2024 Filing 31 MOTION to Transfer Case To Transfer Jurisdiction. Document filed by Abarika LLC, Mewza LLC, Abdoulaye Niang, Alexander Niang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Bloomberg, Mark)
April 11, 2024 Filing 30 NOTICE of Notice of Motion re: #29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction .. Document filed by Abarika LLC, Mewza LLC, Abdoulaye Niang, Alexander Niang..(Bloomberg, Mark)
April 11, 2024 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Document filed by Abarika LLC, Mewza LLC, Abdoulaye Niang, Alexander Niang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Bloomberg, Mark)
April 5, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #28 MOTION for James W. Hawkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
April 4, 2024 Filing 28 MOTION for James W. Hawkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Abarika LLC, Mewza LLC, Abdoulaye Niang, Alexander Niang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of James W Hawkins, #2 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order re PHV Admission).(Hawkins, James)
April 4, 2024 Filing 27 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Abarika LLC, Mewza LLC, Abdoulaye Niang, Alexander Niang. Related Document Number: #26 ..(Hawkins, James) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 4/4/2024 (bc).
April 4, 2024 Filing 26 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - MOTION for James W. Hawkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29176929. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Abarika LLC, Mewza LLC, Abdoulaye Niang, Alexander Niang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of James Hawkins in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission).(Hawkins, James) Modified on 4/4/2024 (bc).
April 4, 2024 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order and Judge's rules served on Abdoulaye Niang, Alexander Niang, Mewza LLC, and Abarika LLC on April 3, 2024. Document filed by Bryan Fletcher, Garrett Fletcher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AS Subramanian Civil Individual Practices, #2 Exhibit Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference).(Weber, Dorothy)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 23. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 4/4/2024) (tg)
April 4, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #26 MOTION for James W. Hawkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29176929. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Proposed Order;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bc)
April 4, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: Abarika LLC answer due 4/11/2024; Henan Fanding Network Technology Co., LTD answer due 4/11/2024; Mewza LLC answer due 4/11/2024; Abdoulaye Niang answer due 4/11/2024; Alexander Niang answer due 4/11/2024. (tg)
April 3, 2024 Filing 23 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Defendants Counsel dated April 3, 2024. Document filed by Abarika LLC, Mewza LLC, Abdoulaye Niang, Alexander Niang..(Bloomberg, Mark)
April 3, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Henry Bloomberg on behalf of Abarika LLC, Mewza LLC, Abdoulaye Niang, Alexander Niang..(Bloomberg, Mark)
April 2, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/24/2024 at 04:00 PM before Judge Arun Subramanian. The conference will be held via Microsoft Teams. The parties should dial in by calling (646) 453-4442 and entering the Phone Conference ID: 928 517 221, followed by the pound (#) sign. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 4/2/2024) (vfr)
March 26, 2024 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Mewza LLC served on 3/15/2024, answer due 4/5/2024. Service was accepted by Anna Newton, Northwest Registered Agent Service, Inc.. Document filed by Bryan Fletcher; Garrett Fletcher..(Weber, Dorothy)
March 26, 2024 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Abarika LLC served on 3/15/2024, answer due 4/5/2024. Service was accepted by Mr. Abdoulaye Niang, Registered Agent. Document filed by Bryan Fletcher; Garrett Fletcher..(Weber, Dorothy)
March 26, 2024 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Alexander Niang served on 3/15/2024, answer due 4/5/2024. Service was accepted by Mr. Abdoulaye Niang, Father. Document filed by Bryan Fletcher; Garrett Fletcher..(Weber, Dorothy)
March 26, 2024 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Abdoulaye Niang served on 3/15/2024, answer due 4/5/2024. Service was accepted by Mr. Abdoulaye Niang. Document filed by Bryan Fletcher; Garrett Fletcher..(Weber, Dorothy)
March 14, 2024 Filing 16 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(jgo)
March 14, 2024 Filing 15 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(jgo)
March 14, 2024 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mewza LLC..(jgo)
March 14, 2024 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Henan Fanding Network Technology Co., LTD..(jgo)
March 14, 2024 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alexander Niang..(jgo)
March 14, 2024 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Abdoulaye Niang..(jgo)
March 14, 2024 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Abarika LLC..(jgo)
March 14, 2024 Filing 9 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Weber, Dorothy)
March 14, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Dorothy M Weber. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $500,000,000; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $500,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
March 14, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Arun Subramanian. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
March 14, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
March 14, 2024 Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
March 13, 2024 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mewza LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Bryan Fletcher, Garrett Fletcher..(Weber, Dorothy)
March 13, 2024 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HENAN FANDING NETWORK TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Bryan Fletcher, Garrett Fletcher..(Weber, Dorothy)
March 13, 2024 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alexander Niang, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Bryan Fletcher, Garrett Fletcher..(Weber, Dorothy)
March 13, 2024 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Abdoulaye Niang, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Bryan Fletcher, Garrett Fletcher..(Weber, Dorothy)
March 13, 2024 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Abarika LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Bryan Fletcher, Garrett Fletcher..(Weber, Dorothy)
March 13, 2024 Filing 3 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Weber, Dorothy)
March 13, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Weber, Dorothy)
March 13, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Abarika LLC, Henan Fanding Network Technology Co., LTD, Mewza LLC, Abdoulaye Niang, Alexander Niang. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29077345)Document filed by Bryan Fletcher, Garrett Fletcher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit Amazon Counter Notice, #3 Exhibit Twitter Counter Notice).(Weber, Dorothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fletcher et al v. Niang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Fletcher
Represented By: Dorothy M Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrett Fletcher
Represented By: Dorothy M Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abdoulaye Niang
Represented By: James William Hawkins
Represented By: Mark Henry Bloomberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Niang
Represented By: James William Hawkins
Represented By: Mark Henry Bloomberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mewza LLC
Represented By: James William Hawkins
Represented By: Mark Henry Bloomberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abarika LLC
Represented By: James William Hawkins
Represented By: Mark Henry Bloomberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henan Fanding Network Technology Co., LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does A-Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Companies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?