The Legal Aid Society v. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Plaintiff: The Legal Aid Society
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 1:2024cv02344
Filed: March 28, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Eric J. Mahr to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (jcs)
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time Application GRANTED. Defendant shall answer the Complaint by May 31, 2024. The parties shall file the joint letter by May 30, 2024.. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/29/2024) (jca)
April 29, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement answer due 5/31/2024. (jca)
April 26, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Eric J. Mahr to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29276657. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The Legal Aid Society. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Eric Mahr, #2 Exhibit PA Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Mahr, Eric)
April 26, 2024 Filing 13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for ICE to respond to the complaint and for the parties to file a joint letter addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Elizabeth J. Kim dated April 26, 2024. Document filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Kim, Elizabeth)
April 26, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth J. Kim on behalf of United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Kim, Elizabeth)
April 26, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for Eric J. Mahr to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29276657. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
April 4, 2024 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE) Summons and Complaint, served. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 4/1/2024, answer due 5/1/2024. Service was accepted by Osrick Gordon, Civil Clerk of US Attorney for S.D.N.Y.. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by The Legal Aid Society..(Henderson, Andrew)
April 2, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Julie Dona on behalf of The Legal Aid Society..(Dona, Julie)
April 2, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kyle Barron on behalf of The Legal Aid Society..(Barron, Kyle)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that, by April 30, 2024, the parties shall negotiate a schedule for the search, processing and potential production of responsive documents, and file a joint letter on ECF apprising the Court of that schedule and whether the initial pretrial conference is necessary to resolve any open issues, or if adjournment of the conference is appropriate. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/1/2024) (vfr)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Andrew W. Henderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (jcs)
March 29, 2024 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (vf)
March 29, 2024 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
March 29, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
March 29, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
March 28, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Andrew W. Henderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29146253. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The Legal Aid Society. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Andrew Henderson, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order on Motion).(Henderson, Andrew)
March 28, 2024 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Legal Aid Society..(Bayoumi, Jeanette)
March 28, 2024 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by The Legal Aid Society..(Bayoumi, Jeanette)
March 28, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bayoumi, Jeanette)
March 28, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29144064)Document filed by The Legal Aid Society. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E).(Bayoumi, Jeanette)
March 28, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #5 MOTION for Andrew W. Henderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29146253. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Legal Aid Society v. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Legal Aid Society
Represented By: Andrew Henderson
Represented By: Jeanette Bayoumi
Represented By: Julie Dona
Represented By: Kyle Barron
Represented By: Eric J. Mahr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?