Canal@Camp Apartments, LLC v. Mt. Hawley Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Canal@Camp Apartments, LLC
Defendant: MT Hawley Insurance Company and Aparicio, Walker and Seeling, Inc. doing business as AWS Insurance
Interested Party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Case Number: 1:2024cv02413
Filed: March 29, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 in Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order CASE REMANDED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the State Court - Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Sent certified copy of docket entries and remand order. Mailed via UPS Tracking Number 1ZE22E530210050484 on 4/24/2024..(ks)
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court has considered all of the arguments raised by the parties. To the extent not specifically addressed, the arguments are either moot or without merit. For the foregoing reasons, the plaintiff's motion to remand is granted. The Clerk is directed to remand this action to the New York State Supreme Court, New York County, to close all pending motions, and to close this case on the docket of this Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/23/2024) (ks) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #32 Motion for Kiley A. Aycock to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/17/2024) (ks)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Kiley Anne Aycock to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29193176. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by MT Hawley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of the Supreme Court of Texas, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Aycock, Kiley)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #32 MOTION for Kiley Anne Aycock to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29193176. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc)
April 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Telephone Conference held on 4/8/2024. (Fletcher, Donnie)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #30 Motion for Greg K. Winslett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/5/2024) (ks)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for Greg K. Winslett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29173338. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by MT Hawley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order proposed Order).(Winslett, Greg)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #30 MOTION for Greg K. Winslett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29173338. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc)
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew David Kraus on behalf of MT Hawley Insurance Company..(Kraus, Matthew)
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Jesse Furman on behalf of MT Hawley Insurance Company..(Furman, Andrew)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: The parties are directed to appear for a telephone conference on April 8, 2024, at 3:00 p.m. Dial-in: 888-363-4749, with access code 8140049. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 4/8/2024 at 03:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/1/2024) (tg)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number: 2:23-cv-05547. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received.
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (vba)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (vba)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vba)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's #15 MOTION to Transfer Venue is GRANTED, and this matter is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Plaintiff's #9 Motion to Remand remains pending. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 3/27/2024.(sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2024.]
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Hannah Quicksell for Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. Attorney Julie Schwartzwald Meaders terminated. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 02/05/2024. (ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2024.]
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Julie S. Meaders as Attorney , MOTION to Substituted Attorney Hannah L. R. Quicksell by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schmeeckle, Seth) Modified on 2/2/2024 (sa). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2024.]
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #20 Reply to Response to Motion. **Document marked as filed in error, see rec. doc. 21 for corrected filing.** (am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2024.]
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company re #15 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Meaders, Julie) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2024.]
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 **FILED IN ERROR SEE REC. DOC. 21**REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company re #15 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue . (Meaders, Julie) Modified text on 1/3/2024 (am). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2024.]
December 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Canal@Camp Apartments, LLC re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Luminais, Ryan) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2024.]
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Fourth Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/12/2023.(lag) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2024.]
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #16 MOTION to Continue Submission Date. IT IS ORDERED that #15 MOTION to Transfer Venue is RESET for submission on January 3, 2024. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 12/13/2023.(sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2024.]
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date by Canal@Camp Apartments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Luminais, Ryan) Modified text on 12/12/2023 (am). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2024.]
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission, #4 Exhibit A Policy, #5 Exhibit B In re Mt Hawley Insurance Company, #6 Exhibit C Canal@Camp, #7 Exhibit D SR Hospitality, #8 Exhibit E Starlight Studios, #9 Exhibit F Esplanade 2018 Partners, #10 Exhibit G Domingue, #11 Exhibit H Coleman, #12 Exhibit I Burk Holding, #13 Exhibit J Brooks & Brooks, #14 Exhibit K UMMIID, #15 Exhibit L S R Hospitality, #16 Exhibit M Capital One First Management, #17 Exhibit N Valdes, #18 Exhibit O Krishiv, #19 Exhibit P Smith, #20 Exhibit Q Ninora, #21 Exhibit R Recovery Performance, #22 Exhibit S 421 NW 12 St, #23 Exhibit T Oasis Beauty, #24 Exhibit U La Teresita, #25 Exhibit V Murrayt Hill Presbyterian, #26 Exhibit W Storm Damage Solutions, #27 Exhibit X Summerwind, #28 Exhibit Y Doral City, #29 Exhibit Z Pinto, #30 Exhibit AA Missionary Baptist Church, #31 Exhibit BB US Rubber, #32 Exhibit CC Davilyn, #33 Exhibit DD La Porte, #34 Errata EE Amusam)(Meaders, Julie) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2024.]
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, and Affirmative Defenses by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company.(Meaders, Julie) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2024.]
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Canal@Camp Apartments, LLC re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (jls) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2024.]
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 11/27/2023. (jls) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2024.]
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Response to Mt. Hawley Insurance Company's Opposition to Motion to Remand by Canal@Camp Apartments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Luminais, Ryan) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2024.]
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion filed by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court in Opposition. (Meaders, Julie) Modified on 11/15/2023 (sa). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2024.]
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Canal@Camp Apartments, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Notice of Submission)(Garner, James) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2024.]
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Amended Exhibit A to Hurricane Ida Case Management Order. (lag) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2024.]
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Third Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/14/2023.(lag) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2024.]
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Lance M Africk recused. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 09/28/2023. (NEF: Section H)(ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2024.]
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 with Addendum. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/2022.(ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2024.]
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (mb) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2024.]
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement. (Meaders, Julie) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2024.]
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Black Rock, Inc., Corporate Parent The Vanguard Group, Inc., Corporate Parent RLI Corp., Corporate Parent RLI Insurance Company, Corporate Parent State Street Corporation for Mt. Hawley Insurance Company (Meaders, Julie) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2024.]
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court Orleans Parish, case number 2023-09532 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10177471) filed by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A Certified Copy of State Court Record, #3 Exhibit B Notice to State Court, #4 Exhibit C Listing)Attorney Julie Schwartzwald Meaders added to party Mt. Hawley Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Meaders, Julie) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canal@Camp Apartments, LLC v. Mt. Hawley Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canal@Camp Apartments, LLC
Represented By: James M Garner
Represented By: Martha Y. Curtis
Represented By: Ryan O'Neil Luminais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MT Hawley Insurance Company
Represented By: Seth Andrew Schmeeckle
Represented By: Hannah Quicksell
Represented By: Julie Schwartzwald Meaders
Represented By: Andrew Jesse Furman
Represented By: Greg K Winslett
Represented By: Matthew David Kraus
Represented By: Kiley Anne Aycock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aparicio, Walker and Seeling, Inc. doing business as AWS Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By: Francis Joseph Lobrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?