CH ROBINSON COMPANY, INC. v. MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A. et al
Plaintiff: C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC.
Defendant: MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company .S.A., Gloucester Terminals LLC and Holt Logistics
Case Number: 1:2024cv02649
Filed: April 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Referring Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 1300 F.E.L.A. (DISCONTINUED AFTER 1/27/2014)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2024 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:24-cv-02643-VSB. (jca)
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that pursuant to Rule 42(a), the five actions before me are consolidated for pre-trial purposes. All pre-trial filings and submissions shall be made under Case No. 24-CV-2643 only.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/30/2024) (jca)
May 15, 2024 Filing 38 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Edward P. Flood jointly on behalf of all parties dated 5/15/2024 re: consolidation of fifth action with other four actions. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company.S.A...(Flood, Edward)
May 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that the parties file a joint letter in each of the actions before me on or before May 17, 2024 stating their position as to whether the fifth action, Arcotrading, LTDA v. MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, S.A., et al., No. 24-CV-2672 (VSB), should also be consolidated with the four above-referenced actions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/10/2024) (ks)
May 9, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #36 MOTION for Matthew T. Gardella to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29330248. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
May 8, 2024 Filing 36 MOTION for Matthew T. Gardella to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29330248. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Gloucester Terminals LLC, Holt Logistics. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit - Declaration of Matthew T. Gardella, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Gardella, Matthew)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #33 MOTION for Peter C. Hughes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ENDORSEMENT APPLICATION GRANTED SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/7/2024) (jca)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #32 MOTION for John J. Higson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ENDORSEMENT APPLICATION GRANTED SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/7/2024) (jca)
May 2, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #33 MOTION for Peter C. Hughes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29299557. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc)
May 1, 2024 Filing 33 MOTION for Peter C. Hughes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29299557. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Gloucester Terminals LLC, Holt Logistics. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit - Declaration of Peter C. Hughes, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Hughes, Peter)
May 1, 2024 Filing 32 MOTION for John J. Higson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Gloucester Terminals LLC, Holt Logistics. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit -Declaration of John J. Higson, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Higson, John)
May 1, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #31 MOTION for John J. Higson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29291577. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Missing notarized affidavit or declaration;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bc)
May 1, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #32 MOTION for John J. Higson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc)
April 30, 2024 Filing 31 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - MOTION for John J. Higson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29291577. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Gloucester Terminals LLC, Holt Logistics. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Higson, John) Modified on 5/1/2024 (bc).
April 24, 2024 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ira N. Glauber on behalf of Gloucester Terminals LLC, Holt Logistics..(Glauber, Ira)
April 22, 2024 Filing 29 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Martin F Casey dated April 22, 2024. Document filed by C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC...(Casey, Martin)
April 17, 2024 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jon Werner on behalf of MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company.S.A...(Werner, Jon)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: It is further ORDERED that a telephonic conference will be held on May 15, 2024, at 4:00 P.M. The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. The telephonic conference is public, and the time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. All pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. The parties shall ensure they are dialed into the conference call by the appointed conference time. DATE AND TIME OF CONFERENCE: May 15, 2024, at 4:00 P.M. IPTC MATERIALS DUE: May 8, 2024. Initial Conference set for 5/15/2024 at 04:00 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/9/2024) (ate)
April 9, 2024 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:24-cv-02643-VSB. Notice of Assignment to follow. (tro)
April 9, 2024 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Judge Lorna G. Schofield is no longer assigned to the case. (tro)
April 9, 2024 NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (tro)
April 8, 2024 Filing 26 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number: 2:23-cv-01748. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received.
April 8, 2024 Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
April 8, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (vba)
April 8, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vba)
April 8, 2024 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (vba)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE TO THE U.S.D.C. FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 3/29/24. 3/29/24 ENTERED AND NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(JL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
March 29, 2024 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 3/29/24. 3/29/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.(JL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
March 29, 2024 THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS TRANSFERRED TO THE USDC FOR SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK. (JL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC, AND HOLT LOGISTICS CORP.S MOTION TO DISMISS (ECF NO. 9), IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 3/20/24.3/20/24 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL; E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF EDWARD P. FLOOD, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 9/28/23. 9/28/23 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL; E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
September 26, 2023 Filing 21 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Edward P. Flood by MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A.. ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-16970566.). (MARTYN, JESSICA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
August 18, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE by C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC. (ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
August 14, 2023 Filing 19 to Withdraw Stipulation by C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC.. (ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
August 10, 2023 Filing 18 (WITHDRAWN PER CHAMBERS) STIPULATION by C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC.. (ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) Modified on 8/17/2023 (amas). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
August 8, 2023 Filing 17 Response ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC, AND HOLT LOGISTICS CORP. TO THE CROSS-CLAIM OF MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY, S.A. by GLOUCESTER TERMINALS, LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS. (HUGHES, PETER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
July 27, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re: Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by GLOUCESTER TERMINALS, LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS.Memorandum of Law In Support and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Lisa Kline, Esquire, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(HUGHES, PETER) Modified on 3/29/2024 (nd). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
July 18, 2023 Filing 15 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against GLOUCESTER TERMINALS, LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS by MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MARTYN, JESSICA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
July 13, 2023 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against GLOUCESTER TERMINALS, LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS, MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A., filed by C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC..(ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
July 6, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE by C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC. Intent to File Amended Complaint (ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF MARTIN F. CASEY, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 6/28/23. 6/28/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
June 28, 2023 Filing Fee for PRO HAC VICE by C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC.. (Filing Fee $75, receipt number APAEDC-16780032). (ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
June 23, 2023 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by HOLT LOGISTICS.(HIGSON, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
June 23, 2023 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Terminal Holdings LP with Certificate of Service by GLOUCESTER TERMINALS, LLC.(HIGSON, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
June 23, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by GLOUCESTER TERMINALS, LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS.Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Motion To Dismiss and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Lisa Kline, Esquire, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(HUGHES, PETER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
June 22, 2023 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Martin F Casey by C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC... (ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
June 22, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by RUFUS A. JENNINGS on behalf of C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC. (JENNINGS, RUFUS) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
June 22, 2023 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Martin F. Casey by C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC... (JENNINGS, RUFUS) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
June 16, 2023 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MARTYN, JESSICA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
June 16, 2023 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against GLOUCESTER TERMINALS, LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS by MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MARTYN, JESSICA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
May 8, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to GLOUCESTER TERMINALS, LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS, MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A.. (amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
May 5, 2023 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by CH Robinson Company, Inc..(ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
May 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16674374.), filed by CH Robinson Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CH ROBINSON COMPANY, INC. v. MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Martin F Casey
Represented By: RUFUS A. JENNINGS
Represented By: GEORGE R. ZACHARKOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company .S.A.
Represented By: Edward P. Flood
Represented By: JESSICA LINK MARTYN
Represented By: Jon Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloucester Terminals LLC
Represented By: John Joseph Higson
Represented By: Peter C. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holt Logistics
Represented By: John Joseph Higson
Represented By: Peter C. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?