DOLE CHILE S.A. v. MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A. et al
Plaintiff: DOLE CHILE S.A.
Defendant: MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company .S.A., Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA) Inc., MSC SHIP MANAGEMENT LTD., Greenwich Terminals LLC, Gloucester Terminals LLC, Holt Logistics Corp., M/V MSC OLIA, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, M/V MSC AINO, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, M/V MSC JENONGMIN, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, M/V MSC VITA, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, M/V MSC HARMONY III, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, M/V MSC CELINE, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, M/V MSC CAROLE, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, M/V POMERENIA SKY, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem,, RESOLUTE EXPORT & TRADING, LTD., FPG Shipholding Liberia 17 SA, Xinda International Ship Lease, CHOSEN PARTNER INVESTMENTs LTD.,, HARMONY SHIPPING & TRADING LTD., SALTGATE PANAMA SHIPPING, INC., POMERENIA SKY INC., TAIPING & SINOPEC TJ7 SHIPPING LEASING CO., LTD., John Doe Carriers 1-9, JOHN DOE TERMINAL OPERATORS 1-9, DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC., HOLT CARGO SYSTEMS LLC and JOHN DOE TERMINAL OPERATORS 3-9
Case Number: 1:2024cv02651
Filed: April 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Referring Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 1300 F.E.L.A. (DISCONTINUED AFTER 1/27/2014)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2024 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:24-cv-02643-VSB.. (jca)
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that pursuant to Rule 42(a), the five actions before me are consolidated for pre-trial purposes. All pre-trial filings and submissions shall be made under Case No. 24-CV-2643 only.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/30/2024) (jca)
May 15, 2024 Filing 52 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Edward P. Flood jointly on behalf of all parties dated 5/15/2024 re: consolidation of fifth action with other four actions. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company.S.A...(Flood, Edward)
May 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that the parties file a joint letter in each of the actions before me on or before May 17, 2024 stating their position as to whether the fifth action, Arcotrading, LTDA v. MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, S.A., et al., No. 24-CV-2672 (VSB), should also be consolidated with the four above-referenced actions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/10/2024) (ks)
May 9, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #50 MOTION for Matthew T. Gardella to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29330284. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
May 8, 2024 Filing 50 MOTION for Matthew T. Gardella to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29330284. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC., Gloucester Terminals LLC, Greenwich Terminals LLC, HOLT CARGO SYSTEMS LLC, Holt Logistics Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit - Declaration of Matthew T. Gardella, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Gardella, Matthew)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #47 MOTION for Peter C. Hughes to Appear Pro Hac Vice.ENDORSEMENT APPLICATION GRANTED SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/7/2024) (jca)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #46 MOTION for John J. Higson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ENDORSEMENT APPLICATION GRANTED SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/7/2024) (jca)
May 2, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #46 MOTION for John J. Higson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29299183. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc)
May 2, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #47 MOTION for Peter C. Hughes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29299592. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc)
May 1, 2024 Filing 47 MOTION for Peter C. Hughes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29299592. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC., Gloucester Terminals LLC, Greenwich Terminals LLC, HOLT CARGO SYSTEMS LLC, Holt Logistics Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit - Declaration of Peter C. Hughes, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Hughes, Peter)
May 1, 2024 Filing 46 MOTION for John J. Higson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29299183. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC., Gloucester Terminals LLC, Greenwich Terminals LLC, HOLT CARGO SYSTEMS LLC, Holt Logistics Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit - Declaration of John J. Higson, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Higson, John)
April 24, 2024 Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ira N. Glauber on behalf of DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC., Gloucester Terminals LLC, Greenwich Terminals LLC, HOLT CARGO SYSTEMS LLC, Holt Logistics Corp...(Glauber, Ira)
April 22, 2024 Filing 44 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Martin F Casey dated April 22, 2024. Document filed by DOLE CHILE S.A...(Casey, Martin)
April 17, 2024 Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jon Werner on behalf of MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company.S.A...(Werner, Jon)
April 17, 2024 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Martin F Casey on behalf of DOLE CHILE S.A...(Casey, Martin)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to file a joint status report by April 16, 2024. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 4/9/2024) (ate)
April 9, 2024 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:24-cv-02643-VSB. Notice of Assignment to follow. (tro)
April 9, 2024 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr is no longer assigned to the case..(tro)
April 9, 2024 NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (tro)
April 8, 2024 Filing 40 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number: 2:23-cv-01504. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received.
April 8, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr.. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vba)
April 8, 2024 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
April 8, 2024 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (vba)
April 8, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (vba)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT (ECF NO. #16 ) AND THE BILLS OF LADING (ECF NO #22 -1), THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 03/29/2024. 03/29/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
March 29, 2024 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 03/29/2024. 03/29/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC, AND HOLT LOGISTICS CORP.S MOTION TO DISMISS #6 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 3/20/24.3/20/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
November 7, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by STEPHEN J. GALATI on behalf of All Plaintiffs (GALATI, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
November 7, 2023 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE R. ZACHARKOW on behalf of DOLE CHILE S.A. (ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF EDWARD P. FLOOD, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 9/28/23. 9/28/23 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
September 26, 2023 Filing 33 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Edward P. Flood by MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC., MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A.. ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-16970544.). (MARTYN, JESSICA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
September 14, 2023 Filing 32 SUR REPLY OF PLAINTIFF IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS OFDEFENDANTS GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC,DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC., HOLT CARGO SYSTEMS LLC ANDHOLT LOGISTICS CORP. filed by DOLE CHILE S.A.. (bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFF, DOLE CHILE S.A (PLAINTIFF OR DOLE) UNCONTESTED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUR REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION OF DEFENDANTS GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC, DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC., HOLT CARGO SYSTEMS LLC AND HOLT LOGISTICS CORP. (TERMINAL OR SHORESIDE DEFENDANTS) TO DISMISS THE PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. C. P. 12(B)(6) #22 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED, AND THE SUR-REPLY ATTACHED TO THE UNDERLYING MOTION AS EXHIBIT A SHALL BE DEEMED FILED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 9/14/23.9/15/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
August 8, 2023 Filing 30 ANSWER TO CROSS-CLAIM OF MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY, S.A. by DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC., GLOUCESTER TERMINALS, LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS, LLC, HOLT CARGO SYSTEMS, LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS CORP. (HUGHES, PETER) Modified on 8/9/2023 (md). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
August 8, 2023 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur Reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint [ECF 22] filed by DOLE CHILE S.A... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proposed Sur-Reply of Plaintiff in Opposition of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(GALATI, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
August 3, 2023 Filing 28 REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC, DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC., HOLT CARGO SYSTEMS LLC AND HOLT LOGISTICS CORP.S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(6) #22 (bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION #26 FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT #22 IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 8/3/23.8/3/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) (Main Document 27 replaced on 8/3/2023) (bw). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
August 2, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint [ECF 22] filed by DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC., GLOUCESTER TERMINALS, LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS, LLC, HOLT CARGO SYSTEMS, LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS CORP..Memorandum, Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(HUGHES, PETER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
July 26, 2023 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re: Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by DOLE CHILE S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law of Plaintiff Dole Chile S.A. in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(GALATI, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
July 18, 2023 Filing 24 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC., GLOUCESTER TERMINALS, LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS, LLC, HOLT CARGO SYSTEMS, LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS CORP. by MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MARTYN, JESSICA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
July 18, 2023 Filing 23 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint,,,, by MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MARTYN, JESSICA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
July 12, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re: Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC., GLOUCESTER TERMINALS, LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS, LLC, HOLT CARGO SYSTEMS, LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS CORP..Memorandum of Law In Support and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-DECLARATION OF LISA KLINE, ESQUIRE, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(HUGHES, PETER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
July 12, 2023 Filing 21 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Terminal Holdings LP with Certificate of Service by HOLT CARGO SYSTEMS, LLC.(HIGSON, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
July 12, 2023 Filing 20 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC..(HIGSON, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
June 30, 2023 Filing 19 STIPULATION re #16 Amended Complaint,,,, Time to File A Response Extended Until July 26, 2023 by DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC., GLOUCESTER TERMINALS, LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS, LLC, HOLT CARGO SYSTEMS, LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS CORP.. (HUGHES, PETER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
June 30, 2023 Filing 18 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by John J. Higson, Esquire Re: accepted summons and complaint for DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC. on 6/28/2023, answer due 7/19/2023; HOLT CARGO SYSTEMS, LLC on 6/28/2023, answer due 7/19/2023. (HIGSON, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
June 30, 2023 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC., HOLT CARGO SYSTEMS, LLC, MSC SHIP MANAGEMENT LTD.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 6/30/23 (bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
June 28, 2023 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against GLOUCESTER TERMINALS, LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS, LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS CORP., JOHN DOE CARRIERS 1-9, JOHN DOE TERMINAL OPERATORS 1-9, M/V MSC AINO, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, M/V MSC CAROLE, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, M/V MSC CELINE, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, M/V MSC HARMONY III, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, M/V MSC JENONGMIN, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, M/V MSC OLIA, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, M/V MSC VITA, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, M/V POMERENIA SKY, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem,, MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC., MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A., MSC SHIP MANAGEMENT LTD., DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC., HOLT CARGO SYSTEMS, LLC, filed by DOLE CHILE S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, Part 1, #3 Exhibit B, Part 2)(GALATI, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
June 21, 2023 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) Plaintiff's Notice of Intent to File Amended Complaint Pursuant to Loal Court Rule 7.1(c) In Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by DOLE CHILE S.A.. (GALATI, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
June 16, 2023 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MARTYN, JESSICA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
June 16, 2023 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MARTYN, JESSICA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
June 16, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MARTYN, JESSICA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
June 16, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against GLOUCESTER TERMINALS, LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS, LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS CORP. by MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MARTYN, JESSICA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
June 9, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN J. HIGSON on behalf of GLOUCESTER TERMINALS, LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS, LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS CORP. with Certificate of Service(HIGSON, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Terminal Holdings LP by GREENWICH TERMINALS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HUGHES, PETER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Terminal Holdings LP by GLOUCESTER TERMINALS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HUGHES, PETER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by HOLT LOGISTICS CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HUGHES, PETER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by GLOUCESTER TERMINALS, LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS, LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS CORP... (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Lisa Kline, Esquire, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(HUGHES, PETER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 5 Documents - Summons and Complaint were sent by the Clerk's Office via Certified Mail to MSC Shipmanagement Ltd., MSC House 8, Spyrou Kyprianou Avenue, 3070 Limassol, Cyprus, Registered NO. RF 563 911 850 US. (ke) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 4 Request to Clerk to Serve Summons and Complaint via Registered Mail, Return Receipt Requested upon Mediterranean Shipmanagement Ltd. by DOLE CHILE S.A.. (GALATI, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
April 19, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CHOSEN PARTNER INVESTMENTS LTD.,, FPG SHIPHOLDING LIBERIA 17 SA, GLOUCESTER TERMINALS, LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS, LLC, HARMONY SHIPPING & TRADING LTD., HOLT LOGISTICS CORP., M/V MSC AINO, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, M/V MSC CAROLE, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, M/V MSC CELINE, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, M/V MSC HARMONY III, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, M/V MSC JENONGMIN, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, M/V MSC OLIA, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, M/V MSC VITA, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, M/V POMERENIA SKY, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem,, MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC., MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A., MSC SHIP MANAGEMENT LTD., POMERENIA SKY INC., RESOLUTE EXPORT & TRADING, LTD., SALTGATE PANAMA SHIPPING, INC., TAIPING & SINOPEC TJ7 SHIPPING LEASING CO., LTD., XINDA INTERNATIONAL SHIP LEASE. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 4/19/23 (bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
April 19, 2023 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Dole plc by DOLE CHILE S.A..(GALATI, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
April 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16637557.), filed by DOLE CHILE S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(GALATI, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOLE CHILE S.A. v. MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOLE CHILE S.A.
Represented By: Stephen J. Galati
Represented By: GEORGE R. ZACHARKOW
Represented By: Martin F Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company .S.A.
Represented By: JESSICA LINK MARTYN
Represented By: Jon Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Edward P. Flood
Represented By: JESSICA LINK MARTYN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSC SHIP MANAGEMENT LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenwich Terminals LLC
Represented By: Peter C. Hughes
Represented By: John Joseph Higson
Represented By: Ira N. Glauber
Represented By: Matthew T. Gardella
Represented By: Peter Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloucester Terminals LLC
Represented By: Peter C. Hughes
Represented By: John Joseph Higson
Represented By: Ira N. Glauber
Represented By: Matthew T. Gardella
Represented By: Peter Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holt Logistics Corp.
Represented By: Peter C. Hughes
Represented By: John Joseph Higson
Represented By: Ira N. Glauber
Represented By: Matthew T. Gardella
Represented By: Peter Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V MSC OLIA, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V MSC AINO, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V MSC JENONGMIN, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V MSC VITA, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V MSC HARMONY III, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V MSC CELINE, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V MSC CAROLE, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V POMERENIA SKY, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RESOLUTE EXPORT & TRADING, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FPG Shipholding Liberia 17 SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xinda International Ship Lease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHOSEN PARTNER INVESTMENTs LTD.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARMONY SHIPPING & TRADING LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALTGATE PANAMA SHIPPING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POMERENIA SKY INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAIPING & SINOPEC TJ7 SHIPPING LEASING CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Carriers 1-9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE TERMINAL OPERATORS 1-9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: John Joseph Higson
Represented By: Peter C. Hughes
Represented By: Ira N. Glauber
Represented By: Matthew T. Gardella
Represented By: Peter Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOLT CARGO SYSTEMS LLC
Represented By: John Joseph Higson
Represented By: Peter C. Hughes
Represented By: Ira N. Glauber
Represented By: Matthew T. Gardella
Represented By: Peter Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE TERMINAL OPERATORS 3-9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?