C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC. v. MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A. et al
Plaintiff: C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC.
Defendant: MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company .S.A., Greenwich Terminals LLC, Gloucester Terminals LLC and Holt Logistics Corp.
Case Number: 1:2024cv02653
Filed: April 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Referring Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 1300 F.E.L.A. (DISCONTINUED AFTER 1/27/2014)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2024 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:24-cv-02643-VSB.. (jca)
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that pursuant to Rule 42(a), the five actions before me are consolidated for pre-trial purposes. All pre-trial filings and submissions shall be made under Case No. 24-CV-2643 only.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/30/2024) (jca)
May 15, 2024 Filing 46 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Edward P. Flood jointly on behalf of all parties dated 5/15/2024 re: consolidation of fifth action with other four actions. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company.S.A...(Flood, Edward)
May 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that the parties file a joint letter in each of the actions before me on or before May 17, 2024 stating their position as to whether the fifth action, Arcotrading, LTDA v. MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, S.A., et al., No. 24-CV-2672 (VSB), should also be consolidated with the four above-referenced actions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/10/2024) (ks)
May 9, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #44 MOTION for Matthew T. Gardella to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29330323. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
May 8, 2024 Filing 44 MOTION for Matthew T. Gardella to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29330323. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Gloucester Terminals LLC, Greenwich Terminals LLC, Holt Logistics Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit - Declaration of Matthew T. Gardella, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Gardella, Matthew)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #41 MOTION for Peter C. Hughes to Appear Pro Hac Vice ENDORSEMENT APPLICATION GRANTED SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/7/2024) (jca)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #40 MOTION for John J. Higson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ENDORSEMENT APPLICATION GRANTED SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/7/2024) (jca)
May 2, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #40 MOTION for John J. Higson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29299282. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc)
May 2, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #41 MOTION for Peter C. Hughes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29299615. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc)
May 1, 2024 Filing 41 MOTION for Peter C. Hughes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29299615. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Gloucester Terminals LLC, Greenwich Terminals LLC, Holt Logistics Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit - Declaration of Peter C. Hughes, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Hughes, Peter)
May 1, 2024 Filing 40 MOTION for John J. Higson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29299282. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Gloucester Terminals LLC, Greenwich Terminals LLC, Holt Logistics Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit - Declaration of John J. Higson, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Higson, John)
April 24, 2024 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ira N. Glauber on behalf of Gloucester Terminals LLC, Greenwich Terminals LLC, Holt Logistics Corp...(Glauber, Ira)
April 22, 2024 Filing 38 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Martin F Casey dated April 22, 2024. Document filed by C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC...(Casey, Martin)
April 17, 2024 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jon Werner on behalf of MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company.S.A...(Werner, Jon)
April 9, 2024 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:24-cv-02643-VSB. Notice of Assignment to follow. (tro)
April 9, 2024 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Judge Jesse M. Furman is no longer assigned to the case..(tro)
April 9, 2024 NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only..(tro)
April 8, 2024 Filing 36 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number: 2:23-cv-01384. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received.
April 8, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vba)
April 8, 2024 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
April 8, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (vba)
April 8, 2024 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (vba)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT (ECF NO. #13 ) AND THE BILLS OF LADING (ECF NO #15 -1), THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 03/29/2024. 03/29/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
March 29, 2024 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 03/29/2024. 03/29//2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
March 29, 2024 Case Transferred to the United States District Court - Southern District of New York via the court's electronic filing system. (nd) Modified on 3/29/2024 (nd). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC, AND HOLT LOGISTICS CORP.S MOTION TO DISMISS #5 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 3/20/24.3/20/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF EDWARD P. FLOOD, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 9/28/23. 9/28/23 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL; E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
September 27, 2023 Filing 31 SUR REPLY OF PLAINTIFF IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANTS GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC AND HOLT LOGISTICS CORP. (amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
September 27, 2023 Filing 30 REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC AND HOLT LOGISTICS CORP.S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(6) [ECF 15].(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC, AND HOLT LOGISTICS CORP.S UNCONTESTED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED, AND THE REPLY ATTACHED TO THE UNDERLYING MOTION AS EXHIBIT A SHALL BE DEEMED FILED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS UNCONTESTED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUR REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC, AND HOLT LOGISTICS CORP.S MOTION TO DISMISS THE PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED, AND THE SUR REPLY ATTACHED TO THE UNDERLYING MOTION AS EXHIBIT A SHALL BE DEEMED FILED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 9/27/23.9/28/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
September 26, 2023 Filing 28 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Edward P. Flood by MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A.. ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-16970514.). (MARTYN, JESSICA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
August 28, 2023 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC..Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
August 16, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief - Uncontested filed by GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS CORP..Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Counsel, and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Reply Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(HIGSON, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
August 10, 2023 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC.. (ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) Modified on 8/10/2023 (nd). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
August 8, 2023 Filing 24 ANSWER TO CROSS-CLAIM OF MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY, S.A. by GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS CORP. (HUGHES, PETER) Modified on 8/9/2023 (md). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
July 28, 2023 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE FILING FEE (RECEIPT NUMBER APAEDC-16812755) FILED ON 07/14/2023 REFUNDED DUE TO REJECTED APPLICATION WHICH WAS REFILED LATER IN THE DAY. (bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE PARTIES TO THE ABOVE-ENTITLED ACTION, THROUGH THEIR RESPECTIVE ATTORNEYS, AGREE THAT PLAINTIFF, C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC. HAS UNTIL AUGUST 10, 2023 TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS, GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC, AND HOLT LOGISTICS CORP.S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, FILED WITH THE COURT ON JULY 12, 2023. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 7/25/23. 7/25/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE #19 IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 7/24/23.7/24/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
July 20, 2023 Filing 21 STIPULATION for Extension of Time by C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC.. (ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
July 18, 2023 Filing 20 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS CORP. by MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MARTYN, JESSICA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-16814711.) filed by C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC...(ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF MARTIN F. CASEY, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT, IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 7/14/23.7/14/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-16812755.) filed by C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC...(ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
July 13, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE R. ZACHARKOW on behalf of C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
July 12, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re: Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS CORP..Memorandum of Law In Support and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-DECLARATION OF LISA KLINE, ESQUIRE, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(HUGHES, PETER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
June 30, 2023 Filing 14 STIPULATION re #13 Amended Complaint Time to File A Response Extended Until July 26, 2023 by GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS CORP.. (HUGHES, PETER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
June 28, 2023 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC..(GALATI, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
June 21, 2023 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) Notice of Plaintiffs of Intention to file Amended Complaint Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(c) filed by C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC.. (GALATI, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
June 16, 2023 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MARTYN, JESSICA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
June 16, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS CORP. by MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MARTYN, JESSICA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
June 9, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN J. HIGSON on behalf of GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS CORP. with Certificate of Service(HIGSON, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Terminal Holdings LP by GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HUGHES, PETER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Terminal Holdings LP by GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HUGHES, PETER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by HOLT LOGISTICS CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HUGHES, PETER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS CORP... (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Lisa Kline, Esquire, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(HUGHES, PETER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
April 12, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to GLOUCESTER TERMINALS LLC, GREENWICH TERMINALS LLC, HOLT LOGISTICS CORP., MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 4/12/23 (bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
April 12, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE by C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC. Designation Form (GALATI, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
April 12, 2023 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including CH Robinson Worldwide Inc. by C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC..(GALATI, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
April 12, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16621282.), filed by C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(GALATI, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]
April 12, 2023 Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. The Certification Statement in the Related Case section was not checked off. (sbt) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/8/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC. v. MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Stephen J. Galati
Represented By: GEORGE R. ZACHARKOW
Represented By: Martin F Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company .S.A.
Represented By: Edward P. Flood
Represented By: JESSICA LINK MARTYN
Represented By: Jon Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenwich Terminals LLC
Represented By: Peter C. Hughes
Represented By: John Joseph Higson
Represented By: Ira N. Glauber
Represented By: Matthew T. Gardella
Represented By: Peter Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloucester Terminals LLC
Represented By: Peter C. Hughes
Represented By: John Joseph Higson
Represented By: Ira N. Glauber
Represented By: Matthew T. Gardella
Represented By: Peter Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holt Logistics Corp.
Represented By: Peter C. Hughes
Represented By: John Joseph Higson
Represented By: Ira N. Glauber
Represented By: Matthew T. Gardella
Represented By: Peter Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?