Vera v. Prime Hydration LLC
Plaintiff: Lara Vera and Jemirria Thompson
Defendant: Prime Hydration LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv02657
Filed: April 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 fr Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document; granting #14 Letter Motion for Conference re: #14 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Stephen L. Saxl dated May 20, 2024. LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion, in alternative addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Stephen L. Saxl dated May 20, 2024. The Court is in receipt of Defendant's pre-motion letter requesting permission to file a motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action Complaint (Dkt. #12) for failure to state a claim under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and failure to plead with particularity under Fed. R. Civ. P. 9(b) (Dkt. #14), as well as Plaintiffs' above response (Dkt. #16), indicating Plaintiffs' non-opposition to Defendant's right to file a motion to dismiss. In view of the unique circumstances of this case, as outlined in Defendant's letter request, the Court will waive its pre-motion conference requirement in this instance and permit the parties to proceed directly to motion practice. Accordingly, Defendant is hereby ORDERED to file its motion to dismiss on or before June 21, 2024. Plaintiffs shall file any opposition on or before July 19, 2024, and Defendant shall file any further reply on or before August 9, 2024. Further, the initial pretrial conference currently scheduled for June 21, 2024, is hereby ADJOURNED sine die, pending the Court's determination of Defendant's motion to dismiss. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at docket entry 14. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/24/2024) (ks)
May 24, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 6/21/2024. Responses due by 7/19/2024 Replies due by 8/9/2024. (ks)
May 23, 2024 Filing 16 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Russell M. Busch dated May 23, 2024 re: #14 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Stephen L. Saxl dated May 20, 2024. LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion, in alternative addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Stephen L. Saxl dated May 20, 2024. . Document filed by Jemirria Thompson, Lara Vera..(Busch, Russell)
May 23, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Russell Busch on behalf of Jemirria Thompson, Lara Vera..(Busch, Russell)
May 20, 2024 Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Stephen L. Saxl dated May 20, 2024., LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion, in alternative addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Stephen L. Saxl dated May 20, 2024. Document filed by Prime Hydration LLC..(Saxl, Stephen)
May 20, 2024 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Drink Prime Holding Company LLC for Prime Hydration LLC. Document filed by Prime Hydration LLC..(Saxl, Stephen)
May 7, 2024 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #10 Amended Complaint, against Prime Hydration LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Lara Vera, Jemirria Thompson. Related document: #10 Amended Complaint,..(Barney, Mason)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on June 21, 2024, at 11:30 a.m. The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. Initial Conference set for 6/21/2024 at 11:30 AM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/7/2024) (rro)
May 7, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Mason Adams Barney to RE-FILE Document No. #10 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Signature Error. Pleading is not signed by an ECF Filing Attorney of Record. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
May 6, 2024 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Prime Hydration LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Lara Vera, Jemirria Thompson. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Barney, Mason) Modified on 5/7/2024 (vf).
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion to Consolidate Cases. Application GRANTED. This case has been transferred to the undersigned. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at docket entry 8. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/30/2024) (rro)
April 26, 2024 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Judge Lewis J. Liman is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
April 25, 2024 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION to Consolidate Cases 23-cv-08552-KPF addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Stephen L. Saxl dated April 25, 2024. Document filed by Prime Hydration LLC..(Saxl, Stephen)
April 25, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen L. Saxl on behalf of Prime Hydration LLC..(Saxl, Stephen)
April 24, 2024 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Prime Hydration LLC served on 4/19/2024, answer due 5/10/2024. Service was accepted by Amy Warforf who as Clerk at CT Corporation System is authorized by appointment or by law to receive service of process for Prime Hydration LLC. Document filed by Lara Vera..(Barney, Mason)
April 9, 2024 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Prime Hydration LLC..(pc)
April 9, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
April 9, 2024 Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
April 9, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
April 8, 2024 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Lara Vera..(Barney, Mason)
April 8, 2024 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Defendant Prime Hydration LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lara Vera..(Barney, Mason)
April 8, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Barney, Mason)
April 8, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Prime Hydration LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29190249)Document filed by Lara Vera..(Barney, Mason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vera v. Prime Hydration LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lara Vera
Represented By: Mason Adams Barney
Represented By: Russell Busch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jemirria Thompson
Represented By: Russell Busch
Represented By: Mason Adams Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Hydration LLC
Represented By: Stephen L. Saxl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?