Hall v. Vataj
Plaintiff: Nancy Hall
Defendant: Sonny Vataj
Case Number: 1:2024cv02817
Filed: April 14, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 fr Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #15 Letter filed by Nancy Hall. ENDORSEMENT: By June 14, 2024, the parties shall file the Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, which is attached to this Order and also available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/forms/consent-proceed-us-magistrate-judge. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/10/2024) (tg)
June 7, 2024 Filing 15 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Plaintiff's Counsel dated June 7, 2024 re: Consent to Magistrate. Document filed by Nancy Hall..(Benjamin, Jeffrey)
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. See 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No additional parties may be joined after 30 days after party depositions without leave of Court. Amended pleadings may be filed without leave of Court until 30 days after party depositions. Any of the deadlines in paragraphs 8(b) through 8(f) may be extended by the written consent of all parties without application to the Court, provided that all fact discovery is completed by the date set forth in paragraph 8(a). This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is one (1) week. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter the dates under paragraphs 5, 6, 8(a), 9(b)-(c) and 13(a)-(c) into the Court's calendar. SO ORDERED. Deposition due by 8/14/2024. Fact Discovery due by 10/4/2024. Pre-Motion Conference set for 10/23/2024 at 04:00 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/5/2024) (vfr)
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. It is hereby ORDERED that the June 12, 2024, initial pretrial conference is CANCELED. If the parties believe that a conference would nevertheless be useful, they should inform the Court immediately so the conference can be reinstated. The case management plan and scheduling order will issue in a separate order. The parties' attention is particularly directed to the provisions for periodic status letters, and the need for a pre-motion letter to avoid cancellation of the final conference and setting of a trial date. It is further ORDERED that, by June 7, 2024, the parties shall file the joint letter required by the Dkt. 6 order and confirm whether they consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, as currently indicated in their proposed case management plan and scheduling order. It is further ORDERED that if Defendant seeks to file a motion to dismiss, he shall file a pre-motion letter pursuant to Individual Rules III.A.1 and III.C.2. It is further ORDERED, regarding settlement discussions, if and when the parties are ready to proceed with a settlement conference with the assigned Magistrate Judge or mediation in the Court's mediation program, they shall file a joint letter on ECF requesting a referral. The parties should be aware that the Court does not extend the deadlines for fact and expert discovery absent compelling circumstances. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Dkt. 12. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/5/2024) (vfr)
June 5, 2024 Filing 12 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Plaintiff's Counsel dated June 5, 2024. Document filed by Nancy Hall..(Benjamin, Jeffrey)
June 4, 2024 Filing 11 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Nancy Hall..(Benjamin, Jeffrey)
May 29, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Walter Francis Ciacci on behalf of Sonny Vataj..(Ciacci, Walter)
May 29, 2024 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sonny Vataj..(Ciacci, Walter)
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that, if Plaintiff is in communication with Defendant, the parties shall file the joint letter and proposed case management plan as soon as possible and no later than June 5, 2024. If Defendant refuses to cooperate in the preparation of these documents, Plaintiff shall prepare and file them. If Plaintiff is not in communication with Defendant, no later than June 5, 2024, Plaintiff shall file a status letter requesting further adjournment of the initial conference for up to 30 days. It is further ORDERED that the initial pretrial conference scheduled for May 29, 2024, is adjourned to June 12, 2024, at 4:00 P.M. Initial Conference set for 6/12/2024 at 04:00 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/23/2024) (mml)
May 20, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Sonny Vataj served on 5/13/2024, answer due 6/3/2024. Service was accepted by Violet Vataj. Document filed by Nancy Hall..(Benjamin, Jeffrey)
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 5/29/2024 at 04:00 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. The telephonic conference is public, and the time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/17/2024) (vfr)
April 15, 2024 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Benjamin, Jeffrey)
April 15, 2024 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sonny Vataj..(pc)
April 15, 2024 Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
April 15, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
April 15, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
April 15, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jeffrey Benjamin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
April 15, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jeffrey Benjamin to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; Jury demand was marked yes and no;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (pc)
April 14, 2024 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Benjamin, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/15/2024 (pc).
April 14, 2024 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sonny Vataj, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Nancy Hall..(Benjamin, Jeffrey)
April 14, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sonny Vataj. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number CNYSDC-29216024)Document filed by Nancy Hall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Op Agr).(Benjamin, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Vataj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Hall
Represented By: Jeffrey Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonny Vataj
Represented By: Walter Francis Ciacci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?