inContact, Inc. v. Tactical Digital Corporation et al
Plaintiff: inContact, Inc.
Defendant: Tactical Digital Corporation, The Wish Group, Inc. and Wish Collaboration, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv02861
Filed: April 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file any amended complaint by June 25, 2024. If no amended complaint is filed, Plaintiff shall file any opposition to the motion to dismiss (as well as its response to Defendant Tactical's Counterclaims) by June 25, 2024. The Wish Defendants' reply, if any, shall be filed by July 2, 2024. Finally, only the notice of motion (not the accompanying memorandum of law and declaration) should be filed as a motion. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 18. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Amended Pleadings due by 6/25/2024., Replies due by 7/2/2024., Responses due by 6/25/2024), Motions terminated: #18 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by The Wish Group, Inc., Wish Collaboration, Inc.. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 6/5/2024) (jca)
June 4, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by The Wish Group, Inc., Wish Collaboration, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration in Support).(Sullivan, Nicole)
June 4, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by The Wish Group, Inc., Wish Collaboration, Inc...(Sullivan, Nicole)
June 4, 2024 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against inContact, Inc.. Document filed by Tactical Digital Corporation..(Sullivan, Nicole)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME granting #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time.. It is hereby ORDERED that: Defendants are granted an extension of time in which to file their answers or other responses to Plaintiff's Complaint through and including June 4, 2024. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 14. Tactical Digital Corporation answer due 6/4/2024; The Wish Group, Inc. answer due 6/4/2024; Wish Collaboration, Inc. answer due 6/4/2024. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/16/2024) (kgo)
May 15, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Document filed by Tactical Digital Corporation, The Wish Group, Inc., Wish Collaboration, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Sullivan, Nicole)
May 6, 2024 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Tactical Digital Corporation served on 4/30/2024, answer due 5/21/2024. Service was accepted by Bernard Logan, Clerk of State Corporation Commission. Document filed by inContact, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Attempted Service, #2 Exhibit Letter to Clerk for Service on Tactical Digital, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Compliance and Receipt).(Read, Nathaniel)
May 6, 2024 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Wish Collaboration, Inc. served on 4/25/2024, answer due 5/16/2024. Service was accepted by Kiran Kaur, Receptionist. Document filed by inContact, Inc...(Read, Nathaniel)
May 6, 2024 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The Wish Group, Inc. served on 4/25/2024, answer due 5/16/2024. Service was accepted by Kiran Kaur, Receptionist. Document filed by inContact, Inc...(Read, Nathaniel)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, counsel for all parties shall appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on July 16, 2024 at 9:00 a.m. The conference will be held remotely by telephone in accordance with Paragraph 3.B of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases. The parties should join the conference by calling the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749 and using access code 542-1540, followed by the pound (#) key. Initial Conference set for 7/16/2024 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/18/2024) (ate)
April 17, 2024 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wish Collaboration, Inc...(jgo)
April 17, 2024 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Wish Group, Inc...(jgo)
April 17, 2024 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tactical Digital Corporation..(jgo)
April 17, 2024 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
April 17, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
April 17, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
April 16, 2024 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Wish Collaboration, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by inContact, Inc...(Read, Nathaniel)
April 16, 2024 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Wish Group, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by inContact, Inc...(Read, Nathaniel)
April 16, 2024 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tactical Digital Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by inContact, Inc...(Read, Nathaniel)
April 16, 2024 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Read, Nathaniel)
April 16, 2024 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent NICE Ltd for inContact, Inc.. Document filed by inContact, Inc...(Read, Nathaniel)
April 16, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tactical Digital Corporation, The Wish Group, Inc., Wish Collaboration, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29225037)Document filed by inContact, Inc...(Read, Nathaniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: inContact, Inc. v. Tactical Digital Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: inContact, Inc.
Represented By: Nathaniel P. T. Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tactical Digital Corporation
Represented By: Nicole Ann Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wish Group, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole Ann Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wish Collaboration, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole Ann Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?