On the Revel, Inc. v. Revel Brand Group
Plaintiff: On the Revel, Inc.
Defendant: Revel Brand Group, LLC, d/b/a Revel Media and Revel Brand Group doing business as Revel Media
Case Number: 1:2024cv02954
Filed: April 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis A Kaplan
Referring Judge: Katharine H Parker
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. APPLICATION GRANTED: The Initial Conference set for 7/23/2024 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 is hereby rescheduled to Thursday, August 22, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. Initial Conference set for 8/22/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 6/3/2024) (vfr) Modified on 6/3/2024 (vfr).
June 3, 2024 Filing 21 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Initial Case Management addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Karen J. Bernstein dated June 3, 2024. Document filed by On the Revel, Inc...(Bernstein, Karen)
May 23, 2024 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Revel Brand Group, LLC, d/b/a Revel Media waiver sent on 5/17/2024, answer due 7/16/2024. Document filed by On the Revel, Inc...(Bernstein, Karen)
April 30, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David A. Boag on behalf of On the Revel, Inc...(Boag, David)
April 29, 2024 Filing 18 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(jgo)
April 29, 2024 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Revel Brand Group, LLC, d/b/a Revel Media..(pc)
April 29, 2024 Filing 16 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Bernstein, Karen)
April 26, 2024 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Revel Brand Group, LLC, d/b/a Revel Media, re: #14 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by On the Revel, Inc...(Bernstein, Karen)
April 26, 2024 Filing 14 CORRECTED COMPLAINT against Revel Brand Group, LLC, d/b/a Revel Media. Document filed by On the Revel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Screenshot of Plaintiff's website, #2 Exhibit Screenshot of Defendant's website, #3 Exhibit Screenshots of Defendant's social media pages, #4 Exhibit Def's Nov 13, 2023 and Dec 5, 2023 emails, #5 Exhibit Def's Jan 22, 2024 cease and desist letter, #6 Exhibit Pltf's Mar 8, 2024 response letter, #7 Exhibit Def's Mar 11, 2024 email, #8 Exhibit Plts' Mar 12, 2024 response email, #9 Exhibit Def's March 28, 2024 email, #10 Exhibit Screenshot of https://revelproductions.com/services/, #11 Exhibit Cert of Reg for RED RIVER REVEL ARTS FESTIVAL (& Design), #12 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.revelglobalevents.com/, #13 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.revelspace.com/, #14 Exhibit Screenshot of https://revelmidwest.com/our-story/, #15 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.runrevel.com, #16 Exhibit Cert of Reg for SOCIAL REVELRY, #17 Exhibit Cert of Reg for REVEL MOMENTS, #18 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.revelart.io/ourwork, #19 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.welcometorevel.com/, #20 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.reveleventsagency.com/, #21 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.revelabq.com/, #22 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.reveleventcenter.com/, #23 Exhibit Screenshot of https://revelpgh.com/events/, #24 Exhibit Screenshot of https://revelrevelsd.com/san-diego-gaslamp-revel-revel-parties, #25 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.facebook.com/profile.php?id=100065009161646&mibextid=WC7FNe, #26 Exhibit Screenshot of https://reveleventsco.com, #27 Exhibit Screenshot of https://revelcateringandevents.com/events.html, #28 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.revelotr.com/private-events, #29 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.revel-republic.com/what-we-do, #30 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.reveleventsmt.com/about-us, #31 Exhibit Screenshot of https://reveleventservices.com/services, #32 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.dancerevel.com/, #33 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.ran.org/revel/, #34 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.pvriverfront.org/revelry, #35 Exhibit Screenshot of https://revelryeventproductions.com/, #36 Exhibit Screenshot of https://revelryeventdesigners.com/, #37 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.rainandrevelryevents.com/events, #38 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.angus.org/Foundation/GetInvolved/Events/RanchersRevelry, #39 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.lasvegasrevelry.com/, #40 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.therevelrycooperative.com/, #41 Exhibit Court's Order granting Pltf leave to file Corrected Complaint).(Bernstein, Karen) Modified on 4/29/2024 (pc).
April 26, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT TRADEMARK FORM. Notice to Attorney Karen Jill Bernstein to RE-FILE Document No. #12 AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the AO 120 Patent/Trademark form is not correct; the Date Filed field on the AO 120 Patent/Trademark form is incorrect.. Re-file the document using the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct AO 120 Patent/Trademark PDF form. (jgo)
April 25, 2024 Filing 13 COMPLAINT against Revel Brand Group. Document filed by On the Revel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Screenshot of Plaintiff's website, #2 Exhibit Screenshot of Defendant's website, #3 Exhibit Screenshots of Defendant's social media pages, #4 Exhibit Def's Nov 13, 2023 and Dec 5, 2023 emails, #5 Exhibit Def's Jan 22, 2024 cease and desist letter, #6 Exhibit Pltf's Mar 8, 2024 response letter, #7 Exhibit Def's Mar 11, 2024 email, #8 Exhibit Plts' Mar 12, 2024 response email, #9 Exhibit Def's March 28, 2024 email, #10 Exhibit Screenshot of https://revelproductions.com/services/, #11 Exhibit Cert of Reg for RED RIVER REVEL ARTS FESTIVAL (& Design), #12 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.revelglobalevents.com/, #13 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.revelspace.com/, #14 Exhibit Screenshot of https://revelmidwest.com/our-story/, #15 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.runrevel.com, #16 Exhibit Cert of Reg for SOCIAL REVELRY, #17 Exhibit Cert of Reg for REVEL MOMENTS, #18 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.revelart.io/ourwork, #19 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.welcometorevel.com/, #20 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.reveleventsagency.com/, #21 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.revelabq.com/, #22 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.reveleventcenter.com/, #23 Exhibit Screenshot of https://revelpgh.com/events/, #24 Exhibit Screenshot of https://revelrevelsd.com/san-diego-gaslamp-revel-revel-parties, #25 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.facebook.com/profile.php?id=100065009161646&mibextid=WC7FNe, #26 Exhibit Screenshot of https://reveleventsco.com, #27 Exhibit Screenshot of https://revelcateringandevents.com/events.html, #28 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.revelotr.com/private-events, #29 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.revel-republic.com/what-we-do, #30 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.reveleventsmt.com/about-us, #31 Exhibit Screenshot of https://reveleventservices.com/services, #32 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.dancerevel.com/, #33 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.ran.org/revel/, #34 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.pvriverfront.org/revelry, #35 Exhibit Screenshot of https://revelryeventproductions.com/, #36 Exhibit Screenshot of https://revelryeventdesigners.com/, #37 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.rainandrevelryevents.com/events, #38 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.angus.org/Foundation/GetInvolved/Events/RanchersRevelry, #39 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.lasvegasrevelry.com/, #40 Exhibit Screenshot of therevelrycooperative.com).(Bernstein, Karen)
April 25, 2024 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Bernstein, Karen) Modified on 4/26/2024 (jgo).
April 25, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT TRADEMARK FORM. Notice to Attorney Karen Jill Bernstein to RE-FILE Document No. #11 AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the AO 120 Patent/Trademark form is not correct; the form used is not the official A.O. Patent/Trademark form. Re-file the document using the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct AO 120 Patent/Trademark PDF form. (vf)
April 25, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Karen Jill Bernstein to RE-FILE re: Document No. #9 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; the initial pleading deficiency must be cured. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
April 25, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Karen Jill Bernstein to RE-FILE Document No. #10 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): summons request was not processed due to deficient pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
April 24, 2024 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Bernstein, Karen) Modified on 4/25/2024 (vf).
April 24, 2024 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Revel Brand Group, LLC, d/b/a Revel Media, re: #9 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by On the Revel, Inc...(Bernstein, Karen)
April 24, 2024 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against On the Revel, Inc.. Document filed by On the Revel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Screenshot of Plaintiff's website, #2 Exhibit Screenshot of Defendant's website, #3 Exhibit Screenshots of Defendant's social media pages, #4 Exhibit Def's Nov 13, 2023 and Dec 5, 2023 emails, #5 Exhibit Def's Jan 22, 2024 cease and desist letter, #6 Exhibit Pltf's Mar 8, 2024 response letter, #7 Exhibit Def's Mar 11, 2024 email, #8 Exhibit Plts' Mar 12, 2024 response email, #9 Exhibit Def's March 28, 2024 email, #10 Exhibit Screenshot of https://revelproductions.com/services/, #11 Exhibit Cert of Reg for RED RIVER REVEL ARTS FESTIVAL (& Design), #12 Exhibit Screenshot ofz https://www.revelglobalevents.com/, #13 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.revelspace.com/, #14 Exhibit Screenshot of https://revelmidwest.com/our-story/, #15 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.runrevel.com, #16 Exhibit Cert of Reg for SOCIAL REVELRY, #17 Exhibit Cert of Reg for REVEL MOMENTS, #18 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.revelart.io/ourwork, #19 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.welcometorevel.com/, #20 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.reveleventsagency.com/, #21 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.revelabq.com/, #22 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.reveleventcenter.com/, #23 Exhibit Screenshot of https://revelpgh.com/events/, #24 Exhibit Screenshot of https://revelrevelsd.com/san-diego-gaslamp-revel-revel-parties, #25 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.facebook.com/profile.php?id=100065009161646&mibextid=WC7FNe, #26 Exhibit Screenshot of https://reveleventsco.com, #27 Exhibit Screenshot of https://revelcateringandevents.com/events.html, #28 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.revelotr.com/private-events, #29 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.revel-republic.com/what-we-do, #30 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.reveleventsmt.com/about-us, #31 Exhibit Screenshot of https://reveleventservices.com/services, #32 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.dancerevel.com/, #33 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.ran.org/revel/, #34 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.pvriverfront.org/revelry, #35 Exhibit Screenshot of https://revelryeventproductions.com/, #36 Exhibit Screenshot of https://revelryeventdesigners.com/, #37 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.rainandrevelryevents.com/events, #38 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.angus.org/Foundation/GetInvolved/Events/RanchersRevelry, #39 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.lasvegasrevelry.com/, #40 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.therevelrycooperative.com/).(Bernstein, Karen) Modified on 4/25/2024 (jgo).
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 7/23/2024 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 4/23/2024) (vfr)
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/23/24) (yv)
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/23/24) (yv)
April 22, 2024 Filing 5 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Complaint addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Karen J. Bernstein dated April 22, 2024. Document filed by On the Revel, Inc...(Bernstein, Karen)
April 19, 2024 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Revel Brand Group, LLC, d/b/a Revel Media, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by On the Revel, Inc...(Bernstein, Karen) Modified on 4/19/2024 (pc).
April 19, 2024 Filing 3 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by On the Revel, Inc...(Bernstein, Karen)
April 19, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bernstein, Karen)
April 19, 2024 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against On the Revel, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29240440)Document filed by On the Revel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Screenshot of Plaintiff's website, #2 Exhibit Screenshot of Defendant's website, #3 Exhibit Screenshots of Defendant's social media pages, #4 Exhibit Def's Nov 13, 2023 and Dec 5, 2023 emails, #5 Exhibit Def's Jan 22, 2024 cease and desist letter, #6 Exhibit Pltf's Mar 8, 2024 response letter, #7 Exhibit Def's Mar 11, 2024 email, #8 Exhibit Plts' Mar 12, 2024 response email, #9 Exhibit Def's March 28, 2024 email, #10 Exhibit Screenshot of https://revelproductions.com/services/, #11 Exhibit Cert of Reg for RED RIVER REVEL ARTS FESTIVAL (& Design), #12 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.revelglobalevents.com/, #13 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.revelspace.com/, #14 Exhibit Screenshot of https://revelmidwest.com/our-story/, #15 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.runrevel.com, #16 Exhibit Cert of Reg for SOCIAL REVELRY, #17 Exhibit Cert of Reg for REVEL MOMENTS, #18 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.revelart.io/ourwork, #19 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.welcometorevel.com/, #20 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.welcometorevel.com/, #21 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.revelabq.com/, #22 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.reveleventcenter.com/, #23 Exhibit Screenshot of https://revelpgh.com/events/, #24 Exhibit Screenshot of https://revelrevelsd.com/san-diego-gaslamp-revel-revel-parties, #25 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.facebook.com/profile.php?id=100065009161646&mibextid=WC7FNe, #26 Exhibit Screenshot of https://reveleventsco.com, #27 Exhibit Screenshot of https://revelcateringandevents.com/events.html, #28 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.revelotr.com/private-events, #29 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.revel-republic.com/what-we-do, #30 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.reveleventsmt.com/about-us, #31 Exhibit Screenshot of https://reveleventservices.com/services, #32 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.dancerevel.com/, #33 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.ran.org/revel/, #34 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.pvriverfront.org/revelry, #35 Exhibit Screenshot of https://revelryeventproductions.com/, #36 Exhibit Screenshot of https://revelryeventdesigners.com/, #37 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.rainandrevelryevents.com/events, #38 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.angus.org/Foundation/GetInvolved/Events/RanchersRevelry, #39 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.lasvegasrevelry.com/, #40 Exhibit Screenshot of https://camp.nc/event-space/the-revelry-north-end/, #41 Exhibit Screenshot of https://www.therevelrycooperative.com/).(Bernstein, Karen) Modified on 4/19/2024 (pc).
April 19, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
April 19, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Karen Jill Bernstein to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 4/24/2024. (pc)
April 19, 2024 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
April 19, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Karen Jill Bernstein. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
April 19, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Karen Jill Bernstein to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
April 19, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Karen Jill Bernstein to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
April 19, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Karen Jill Bernstein to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
April 19, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Karen Jill Bernstein. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Revel Brand Group, LLC, d/b/a Revel Media. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
April 19, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Karen Jill Bernstein. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
April 19, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (pc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: On the Revel, Inc. v. Revel Brand Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: On the Revel, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Jill Bernstein
Represented By: David A. Boag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revel Brand Group, LLC, d/b/a Revel Media
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revel Brand Group doing business as Revel Media
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?