Taramore Square, LLC v. Mt. Hawley Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Taramore Square, LLC
Defendant: MT Hawley Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2024cv03131
Filed: April 24, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 in Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: On April 26, 2024, the Court ordered the parties to submit a joint letter and proposed case management plan to the Court no later than May 31, 2024. See Dkt. 27. The parties did not do so, and on June 4, 2024, the Court ordered the parties to submit their joint letter and proposed case management plan by June 5, 2024. See Dkt. 28. On June 6, 2024, the Court further ordered the parties to submit their joint letter and proposed case management plan by June 14, 2024. See Dkt. 29. To date, no letter or case management plan has been filed. The initial status conference scheduled for June 21, 2024 is thus hereby adjourned to July 19, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. (Dial-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508#). The parties shall submit their joint letter and proposed case management plan no later than July 12, 2024. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this action pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Initial Conference set for 7/19/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 6/20/2024) (rro)
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: On April 26, 2024, the Court ordered the parties to submit a joint letter and proposed case management plan to the Court no later than May 31, 2024. See Dkt. 27. The parties did not do so, and on June 4, 2024, the Court ordered the parties to submit their joint letter and proposed case management plan by June 5, 2024. See Dkt. 28. To date, no letter or case management plan has been filed. The initial status conference scheduled for June 7, 2024 is thus hereby adjourned to June 21, 2024 at 10:30 a.m. (Dial-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508#). The parties shall submit their joint letter and proposed case management plan no later than June 14, 2024. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this action pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 6/21/2024 at 10:30 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 6/6/2024) (tg)
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: On April 26, 2024, the Court ordered the parties to submit a joint letter and proposed case management plan to the Court no later than May 31, 2024. See Dkt. 27. To date, no letter or case management plan has been filed. The parties shall submit their joint letter and proposed case management plan no later than tomorrow, June 5, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 6/4/2024) (vfr)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that, by May 31, 2024, the parties submit a joint letter, not to exceed five (5) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs: As further set forth by this Order. Unless the parties request otherwise, the Court will hold this conference by telephone. The parties shall use the following dial-in information to call in to the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. This conference line is open to the public. If the parties seek to adjourn the conference, they shall notify the Court by no later than May 31, 2024. If the parties are available to proceed with an initial status conference prior to June 7, 2024, the parties shall notify the Court and propose an earlier date for the conference, as well as for submission of the status letter and proposed case management plan. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 6/7/2024 at 11:00 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/26/2024) (tg)
April 24, 2024 Filing 26 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number: 3:23-cv-01278. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received.
April 24, 2024 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (vba)
April 24, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vba)
April 24, 2024 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
April 24, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (vba)
April 15, 2024 Filing 25 JUDGMENT OF TRANSFER: Transferring Case to the Southern District of New York. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 04/15/2024. (ELW) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 4/24/2024.]
April 15, 2024 Filing 24 RULING: Defendant's #9 Motion to Transfer Venue is hereby GRANTED. This matter is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 04/12/2024. (ELW) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 4/24/2024.]
March 7, 2024 Filing 23 MOTION to Stay Case Management Order Deadlines Pending Outcome of Motion to Transfer Venue by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay Case Management Order Deadlines Pending Outcome of Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Proposed Order - Motion to Stay Case Management Order Deadlines Pending Outcome of Motion to Transfer Venue)(Schmeeckle, Seth) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 4/24/2024.]
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No. 1: The Court hereby approves this Case Management Order to set forth procedures to facilitate efficient resolution of these matters through the establishment of a streamlined settlement conference and mediation protocol (the SSP). Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 02/27/2024. (Litchfield, Michael) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 4/24/2024.]
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Substitute Hannah Quicksell for Mt. Hawley Insurance Company replacing Julie S. Meaders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/7/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 4/24/2024.]
February 6, 2024 Filing 20 Ex Parte Motion to Withdraw and Enroll Co-Counsel of Record by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Ex Parte Motion to Withdraw and Enroll Co-Counsel of Record)(Schmeeckle, Seth) Modified to edit text on 2/7/2024 (BLR). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 4/24/2024.]
February 6, 2024 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #20 Ex Parte MOTION for Julie S. Meaders to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Enroll Hannah L. R. Quicksell as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 4/24/2024.]
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #18 Ex Parte Motion to Withdraw and Enroll Co-Counsel for Record for failure to comply with Local Rule 83(b)(13). Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/5/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 4/24/2024.]
February 2, 2024 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #18 MOTION for Julie S. Meaders to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Enroll Hannah L. R. Quicksell as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 4/24/2024.]
February 1, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION for Julie S. Meaders to Withdraw as Attorney , MOTION to Enroll Hannah L. R. Quicksell as Attorney by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Ex Parte Motion to Withdraw and Enroll Co-Counsel of Record)(Schmeeckle, Seth) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 4/24/2024.]
October 20, 2023 Filing 17 REPLY Memorandum in Support of #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of New York filed by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Chad Harrington, #2 Exhibit A-1 Policy GPK0010202, #3 Exhibit A- 2 Quote Letter delivery email, #4 Exhibit A-3 Bind Request email, #5 Exhibit A- 4 Policy binder delivery email, #6 Exhibit B - Louisiana Department of Insurance).(LLH) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 4/24/2024.]
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 MOTION for Leave to File Reply memorandum in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/20/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 4/24/2024.]
October 19, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Reply memorandum in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Reply in support of Motion to Transfer Venue, #3 Exhibit A - Declaration of Chad Harrington, #4 Exhibit A-1 Policy GPK0010202, #5 Exhibit A- 2 Quote Letter delivery email, #6 Exhibit A-3 Bind Request email, #7 Exhibit A- 4 Policy binder delivery email, #8 Exhibit B - Louisiana Department of Insurance)(Meaders, Julie) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 4/24/2024.]
October 5, 2023 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of New York filed by Taramore Square, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-La. Dept. of Ins. Bulletin No. 2011-01)(Sunseri, Joseph) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 4/24/2024.]
September 25, 2023 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Judge John W. deGravelles no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (NLT) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 4/24/2024.]
September 18, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of New York : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 25 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 10 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 4/24/2024.]
September 15, 2023 Filing 12 Exhibit(s) to #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of New York by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Certified Policy, #2 Exhibit B. Mt. Hawley, #3 Exhibit C. Burk Holding, #4 Exhibit D. Brooks, #5 Exhibit E. William B. Coleman, #6 Exhibit F. UMMID, #7 Exhibit G. Storm Damage Sols, #8 Exhibit H. Summerwind W. Condo, #9 Exhibit I. La Porte Hospitality, #10 Exhibit J. Recovery Performance, #11 Exhibit K. Murray Hill, #12 Exhibit L. Nusi Amusam, #13 Exhibit M. New Hope, #14 Exhibit N. SR Hospitality)(Meaders, Julie) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 4/24/2024.]
September 15, 2023 Filing 11 Notice of Deficiency with Administrative Procedure III(A)(1) as to #9 Motion to Transfer Case,,. Pursuant to Administrative Procedure III(A)(1), Each exhibit should be submitted individually in CM/ECF with an exhibit number and short description (e.g., Ex.1 Plaintiff Depo). REQUIRED CORRECTION: The filer is directed to refile the exhibits in the proper format using the event Exhibit located under Other Documents in the CM/ECF system and link the exhibits to the previously filed document. The main document for this event shall be an exhibit list of the exhibits being attached. Each exhibit MUST include a description (e.g., Ex.1 Plaintiff Depo). (ELW) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 4/24/2024.]
September 15, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement #1 Notice of Removal, by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company (Meaders, Julie) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 4/24/2024.]
September 15, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of New York by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Certified Policy, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N)(Meaders, Julie) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 4/24/2024.]
September 15, 2023 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses Subject to Motion to Transfer Venue by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company.(Meaders, Julie) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 4/24/2024.]
September 13, 2023 Filing 7 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL, filed by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover, #2 Exhibit Certified Copy of State Court Record, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Estimate, #4 Exhibit Notice to State Court of Removal, #5 Exhibit Listing)(LLH) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 4/24/2024.]
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The #5 Motion for Leave to File Amended Notice of Removal, filed by Defendant Mt. Hawley Insurance Company, is GRANTED. The Motion was filed in response to the Court's 4 Notice and Order to correct the citizenship allegations as to Plaintiff Taramore Square, LLC. The proposed amended Notice of Removal now alleges that Plaintiff is a limited liability company whose sole member is domiciled in Louisiana. As the parties are diverse and as the amount in controversy appears to be met, the Clerk of Court is instructed to docket the [5-3] Notice of Removal, which will become the operative notice of removal in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/13/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 4/24/2024.]
September 13, 2023 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Notice of Removal . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 4/24/2024.]
September 12, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Notice of Removal by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Pleading; Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit Certified Copy of State Court Record, #5 Exhibit Plaintiff's Estimate, #6 Exhibit Notice to State Court of Removal, #7 Exhibit Listing)(Meaders, Julie) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 4/24/2024.]
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER: Defendant Mt. Hawley Insurance Company removed this case to this Court on September 8, 2023, alleging federal subject matter jurisdiction based on diversity of citizenship under 28 U.S.C. 1332. The Notice of Removal adequately alleges that the amount in controversy exceeds $75,000, exclusive of interest and costs, as Plaintiffs seek insurance benefits for wind damage to four of its buildings as supported by a repair estimate that appears to be for one building (2), which alleges approximately $37,482 in outstanding amounts owed (less prior payments) for that building, plus penalties and attorney's fees. R. Doc. 1-2, pp. 1-9. Mt. Hawley is properly alleged to be an Illinois corporation with its principal place of business in Illinois. R. Doc. 1, para. 4. However, the citizenship of Plaintiff is not properly alleged. While Plaintiff's only member is identified as an individual, the citizenship of an individual is determined by the individual's domicile, not residency. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that by no later than September 19, 2023, Defendant Mt. Hawley Insurance Company shall file a motion for leave to file an amended Notice of Removal that properly alleges the citizenship of all parties, and which includes all Mt. Hawleys numbered allegations, as revised, supplemented, and/or amended. If the motion for leave to amend is granted, the amended Notice of Removal will become the operative removal in this matter without reference to any other document in the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/12/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 4/24/2024.]
September 8, 2023 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company identifying Affiliate/Interested Person Mt. Hawley Insurance Company, Affiliate/Interested Person Taramore Square, LLC for Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (Meaders, Julie) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 4/24/2024.]
September 8, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent RLI Corp., Corporate Parent The Vanguard Group, Inc., Corporate Parent State Street Corporation, Corporate Parent Black Rock, Inc., Corporate Parent RLI Insurance Company for Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (Meaders, Julie) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 4/24/2024.]
September 8, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC East Baton Rouge, Case Number 735527. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2634039), filed by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Copy of State Court Record, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Estimate, #3 Exhibit Notice to State Court of Removal, #4 Exhibit Listing, #5 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Meaders, Julie) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 4/24/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taramore Square, LLC v. Mt. Hawley Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taramore Square, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Douglas Sunseri
Represented By: Kathryn A. E. Sunseri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MT Hawley Insurance Company
Represented By: Seth A Schmeeckle
Represented By: Hannah Quicksell
Represented By: Julie Schwartzwald Meaders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?