Doe v. Kimmel et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Brett Kimmel and New York City Department of Education
Case Number: 1:2024cv03201
Filed: April 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alan Edward Sash on behalf of Brett Kimmel..(Sash, Alan)
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Jane Doe re: #11 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,, . Document filed by Jane Doe, Brett Kimmel, New York City Department of Education. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #11 .(Kuan, Julia)
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: By Order dated April 30, 2024, the Court directed Plaintiff to "promptly file, under seal, a declaration disclosing her identity to the Court" for purposes of ensuring that the Court has no conflicts that would require recusal. See ECF No. 11. To date, no such declaration has been filed. Plaintiff shall file her declaration no later than Wednesday, June 12, 2024. As a reminder, to ensure that her name does not appear on the public docket, Plaintiff's counsel should ensure that the declaration is titled "Declaration of Jane Doe." (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 6/5/2024) (rro)
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by New York City Department of Education..(Hagopian, Caleb)
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. New York City Department of Education served on 5/14/2024, answer due 6/4/2024. Service was accepted by A. Goebler, Clerk, NYC Law Department. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Kuan, Julia)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Brett Kimmel waiver sent on 5/6/2024, answer due 7/8/2024. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Kuan, Julia)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brett Kimmel, New York City Department of Education..(gp)
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER temporarily granting #7 Motion re: #7 MOTION Seeking Leave to Proceed Under the Pseudonym Jane Doe re: #6 Notice (Other) . On April 26, 2024, Plaintiff filed a motion seeking to proceed under the pseudonym "Jane Doe." See ECF Nos. 7 & 8. The motion is GRANTED temporarily. Defendants - and any non-party who seeks, and is granted, leave to intervene for purposes of being heard on the issue - shall file any opposition to the motion within two weeks of Defendant's entering a notice of appearance; any reply shall be filed within one week of any opposition. In the meantime, the Court reserves judgment on whether to grant the motion on a more permanent basis. To ensure that the Court has no conflicts that would require recusal, Plaintiff shall promptly file, under seal, a declaration disclosing her identity to the Court. To ensure that her name does not appear on the public docket, Plaintiff's counsel should ensure that the declaration is titled "Declaration of Jane Doe." The Clerk of Court is directed to issue a summons and terminate ECF No. 7. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/30/2024) (jca) Modified on 5/1/2024 (jca). Modified on 5/2/2024 (jca).
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The conference will be held remotely by telephone in accordance with Paragraph 3.B of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases. The parties should join the conference by calling the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749 and using access code 542-1540, followed by the pound (#) key. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 8/20/2024 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/1/2024) (jca)
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers). Transmitted re: #11 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,, to the Finance Unit (Cashiers) for case processing..(jca)
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BRETT KIMMEL and NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Kuan, Julia)
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (vf)
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Julia P. Kuan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DECLARATION of Jane Doe in Support re: #7 MOTION Seeking Leave to Proceed Under the Pseudonym Jane Doe re: #6 Notice (Other) .. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of James Spruill, LMSW).(Kuan, Julia)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION Seeking Leave to Proceed Under the Pseudonym Jane Doe re: #6 Notice (Other) . Document filed by Jane Doe..(Kuan, Julia)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion to Proceed Under a Pseudonym. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Kuan, Julia)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sydney Kathryn Zazzaro on behalf of Jane Doe..(Zazzaro, Sydney)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Julia P. Kuan on behalf of Jane Doe..(Kuan, Julia)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Kuan, Julia)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kuan, Julia)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brett Kimmel, New York City Department of Education. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29278539)Document filed by Jane Doe..(Kuan, Julia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Kimmel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Sydney Kathryn Zazzaro
Represented By: Julia P. Kuan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Kimmel
Represented By: Alan Edward Sash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Represented By: Caleb Charles Hagopian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?