Shem Tov v. Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: ALON SHEM TOV
Defendant: Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas, Director, USCIS Ur M. Jaddou, Merrick B. Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas and Ur M. Jaddou
Case Number: 1:2024cv03208
Filed: April 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: WHEREAS on April 26, 2024, the Complaint for a Writ of Mandamus was filed. It is hereby ORDERED that the Government shall, by July 12, 2024, file a memorandum in opposition to the request for a writ of mandamus. The memorandum shall not exceed fifteen pages. Plaintiff shall, by July 26, 2024, file a reply memorandum that shall not exceed ten pages. The memoranda and other materials shall otherwise comply with the Court's Individual Rules. Merrick B. Garland answer due 7/12/2024; Ur M. Jaddou answer due 7/12/2024; Alejandro Mayorkas answer due 7/12/2024. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/5/2024) (vfr)
June 4, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leslie A. Ramirez-Fisher on behalf of Merrick B. Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas..(Ramirez-Fisher, Leslie)
May 13, 2024 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ur M. Jaddou, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General..(gp)
May 13, 2024 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General..(gp)
May 13, 2024 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Merrick B. Garland, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General..(gp)
May 13, 2024 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ur M. Jaddou..(pc)
May 13, 2024 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Merrick B. Garland..(pc)
May 13, 2024 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alejandro Mayorkas..(pc)
May 13, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Sadaf F Ahmed to RE-FILE Document No. #10 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): list the party's name as they appear on the docket entry. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
May 10, 2024 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Attorney, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alon Shem Tov..(Ahmed, Sadaf) Modified on 5/13/2024 (pc).
May 10, 2024 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ur M. Jaddou, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alon Shem Tov..(Ahmed, Sadaf)
May 10, 2024 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alejandro Mayorkas, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alon Shem Tov..(Ahmed, Sadaf)
May 10, 2024 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Attorney General, Merrick B. Garland, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alon Shem Tov..(Ahmed, Sadaf)
May 10, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Sadaf F Ahmed to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party name is not a party of record (U.S. Attorney's Office); each summons request must be filed separately;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
May 9, 2024 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Attorney; Alejandro Mayorkas; Ur M. Jaddou; Merrick B. Garland, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alon Shem Tov. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons for Att. General Merrick B. Garland, #2 Supplement Summons for Alejandro Mayorkas, #3 Supplement Summons for Ur M. Jaddou).(Ahmed, Sadaf) Modified on 5/10/2024 (jgo).
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Sadaf F. Ahmed to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (jcs)
May 3, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Sadaf F. Ahmed to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alon Shem Tov. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notarized Declaration of Counsel Requesting Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Ahmed, Sadaf)
May 3, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4 MOTION for Sadaf F. Ahmed to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc)
May 1, 2024 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ahmed, Sadaf)
April 29, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
April 29, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #2 MOTION for Sadaf F. Ahmed to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29279374. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Indiana; Must provide a Declaration or a signed and notarized affidavit; Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (rju)
April 29, 2024 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
April 29, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Sadaf F Ahmed to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet; Jurisdiction was not selected. Do not select citizenship of principal parties if Jurisdiction is not Diversity;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (pc)
April 29, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
April 29, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Sadaf F Ahmed. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: ALON SHEM TOV. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc)
April 26, 2024 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Sadaf F. Ahmed to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29279374. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by ALON SHEM TOV. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER).(Ahmed, Sadaf) Modified on 4/29/2024 (rju).
April 26, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Merrick B. Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29279331)Document filed by ALON SHEM TOV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET).(Ahmed, Sadaf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shem Tov v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALON SHEM TOV
Represented By: Sadaf F Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, USCIS Ur M. Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick B. Garland
Represented By: Leslie A. Ramirez-Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Leslie A. Ramirez-Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur M. Jaddou
Represented By: Leslie A. Ramirez-Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?