Metro Light and Power LLC v. Furnlite, Inc.
Plaintiff: Metro Light and Power LLC
Defendant: Furnlite, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv03713
Filed: May 14, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Arun Subramanian
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. § 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2024 Filing 31 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #22 MOTION to Dismiss Under the First-Filed Rule or to Transfer. . Document filed by Furnlite, Inc...(Davis, Anthony)
July 1, 2024 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #22 MOTION to Dismiss Under the First-Filed Rule or to Transfer. . Document filed by Metro Light and Power LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F).(Healey, Danielle)
June 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying #27 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Danielle J. Healey for Plaintiff dated 6/27/2024. Plaintiff's request is DENIED. However, the parties may notify the Court if they reach an agreement that the motion to dismiss should be denied without prejudice pending their settlement discussions. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 27. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 6/27/2024) (vfr)
June 28, 2024 Filing 28 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Counsel for Defendant Furnlite Inc. dated 06/28/2024 re: #27 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Danielle J. Healey for Plaintiff dated 6/27/2024. . Document filed by Furnlite, Inc...(Davis, Anthony)
June 27, 2024 Filing 27 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Danielle J. Healey for Plaintiff dated 6/27/2024. Document filed by Metro Light and Power LLC..(Healey, Danielle)
June 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying without prejudice #24 Motion to Expedite. For the reasons stated on the record at the June 26, 2024 hearing, Defendant's motion for expedited discovery is DENIED without prejudice. No later than July 17 2024, the parties should provide a joint update as to the status of the parties' discussions and the pending cases. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at Dkt. 24. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 6/27/2024) (vfr)
June 26, 2024 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Arun Subramanian: Telephone Conference held on 6/26/2024. Elisha Kobre, Danielle Healey, Anna Schuler, and Steven Moulton present for Plaintiff. Anthony Davis present for Defendant. Spencer Feighner and Charles Heiny, counsel from the action pending in the United States District Court, Northern District of Indiana, also present. (Court Reporter Rose Prater) (kh)
June 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Counsel for all parties shall appear for a conference on June 26, 2024 at 11 AM. The parties should dial in by calling (646) 453-4442 and entering the Phone Conference ID: 555 277 715, followed by the pound (#) sign. Absent leave of Court obtained by letter-motion filed before the conference, the hearing must be attended by the attorney who will serve as Lead Trial Counsel. All counsel must familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Practices, which are available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-arun-subramanian. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 6/26/2024 at 11:00 AM before Judge Arun Subramanian. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 6/21/2024) (vfr)
June 20, 2024 Filing 24 EMERGENCY MOTION to Expedite Discovery and Memorandum in Support. Document filed by Metro Light and Power LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ex. A - Declaration of Daniel Deutsch, #2 Exhibit B - C&D Letter to Dekko & Furnlite, #3 Exhibit C - Certif of Reg Copyright VAu1-523-017, #4 Exhibit D - Part 1 Certif of Reg Copyright VAu1-523-473, #5 Exhibit D - Part 2 Certif of Reg Copyright VAu1-523-473, #6 Exhibit E - Comparison Exhibits, #7 Exhibit F - LinkedIn Profile Daniel Deutsch).(Healey, Danielle)
June 17, 2024 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Under the First-Filed Rule. Document filed by Furnlite, Inc...(Davis, Anthony)
June 17, 2024 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Under the First-Filed Rule or to Transfer. Document filed by Furnlite, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Counsel Todd Taylor, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Todd Taylor, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Todd Taylor, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Todd Taylor, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Todd Taylor, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Todd Taylor, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Todd Taylor, #8 Exhibit F2 to Declaration of Todd Taylor, #9 Exhibit G to Declaration of Todd Taylor).(Davis, Anthony)
June 12, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony John Davis on behalf of Furnlite, Inc...(Davis, Anthony)
June 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #19 Letter Response denying #18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #18 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Move by Defendant addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Anthony J. Davis Counsel for Defendant dated June 8, 2024. ENDORSEMENT: For the reasons stated below, Defendant's request for a 30 day extension is DENIED. The Court will grant Defendant an extension until June 17, 2024 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 18. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 6/11/2024) (vfr) Modified on 6/11/2024 (vfr).
June 11, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: Furnlite, Inc. answer due 6/17/2024. (vfr)
June 10, 2024 Filing 19 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Danielle J. Healey for Plaintiff dated 06-10-2024 re: #18 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Move by Defendant addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Anthony J. Davis Counsel for Defendant dated June 8, 2024. . Document filed by Metro Light and Power LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Healey, Danielle)
June 8, 2024 Filing 18 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Move by Defendant addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Anthony J. Davis Counsel for Defendant dated June 8, 2024. Document filed by Furnlite, Inc...(Davis, Anthony)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF DANIELLE J. HEALEY granting #13 Motion for Danielle Healey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 5/29/2024) (vfr)
May 29, 2024 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Furnlite, Inc. served on 5/20/2024, answer due 6/10/2024. Service was accepted by Heather Hughes, Admin Asst (Registered Agent Corp Service Co.). Document filed by Metro Light and Power LLC..(Healey, Danielle)
May 17, 2024 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Furnlite, Inc.. (sj)
May 16, 2024 Filing 14 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(pc)
May 16, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Danielle J. Healey to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Metro Light and Power LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Affidavit of Danielle Healey In Support Of of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #3 Proposed Order to Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice).(Healey, Danielle)
May 16, 2024 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Furnlite, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Metro Light and Power LLC..(Kobre, Elisha)
May 16, 2024 Filing 11 AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Metro Light and Power LLC..(Kobre, Elisha)
May 16, 2024 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Metro Light and Power LLC..(Kobre, Elisha)
May 16, 2024 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Metro Light and Power LLC.(Kobre, Elisha)
May 16, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #8 MOTION for Danielle J. Healey to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29359987. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Affidavit Not Notarized. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (sgz)
May 16, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for Danielle J. Healey to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
May 15, 2024 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Danielle J. Healey to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29359987. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Metro Light and Power LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Danielle Healey in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Healey, Danielle) Modified on 5/16/2024 (sgz).
May 15, 2024 Filing 7 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Kobre, Elisha)
May 15, 2024 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Metro Light and Power LLC..(jgo)
May 15, 2024 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kobre, Elisha)
May 15, 2024 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Kobre, Elisha) Modified on 5/15/2024 (jgo).
May 15, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
May 15, 2024 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
May 15, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Arun Subramanian. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
May 15, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Elisha Jonathan Kobre. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code n (None); County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
May 15, 2024 Civil Case Opening Fee Payment: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 405.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29357259..(Kobre, Elisha)
May 15, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT COPYRIGHT FORM. Notice to Attorney Elisha Jonathan Kobre to RE-FILE re: Document No. #4 AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s):. the PDF attached to the docket entry for the AO 121 Copyright form is not correct; the Docket Number field on the AO 121 Copyright form was not completed by the attorney; the Date Filed field on the AO 121 Copyright form is incorrect. Re-file the document using the event type AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct AO 121 Copyright PDF form. (jgo)
May 14, 2024 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kobre, Elisha) Modified on 5/15/2024 (jgo).
May 14, 2024 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Furnlite Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Metro Light & Power LLC..(Kobre, Elisha)
May 14, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Furnlite Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00.)Document filed by Metro Light & Power LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 part 1, #2 Exhibit 1 part 2, #3 Exhibit 1 part 3, #4 Exhibit 2).(Kobre, Elisha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metro Light and Power LLC v. Furnlite, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metro Light and Power LLC
Represented By: Elisha Jonathan Kobre
Represented By: Danielle J Healey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Furnlite, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony John Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?