Alta Partners, LLC v. BRC Inc.
Plaintiff: Alta Partners, LLC
Defendant: BRC Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv03741
Filed: May 15, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Robert W Lehrburger
Referring Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2024 Filing 23 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jason D. Sternberg dated 7/11/2024 re: Request for a briefing schedule. Document filed by BRC Inc...(Sternberg, Jason)
June 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #16 Motion for David Nabors to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (ks)
June 12, 2024 Filing 21 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Max Tanner and Jason Sternberg dated June 12, 2024 re: May 29, 2024 Order. Document filed by Alta Partners, LLC..(Tanner, Robert)
June 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #18 Motion for Nicholas Inns to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 6/7/2024) (mml)
June 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #15 Motion for Jason Sternberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 6/7/2024) (mml) Modified on 6/7/2024 (mml).
June 7, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #18 MOTION for Nicholas Inns to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29452713. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc)
June 6, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION for Nicholas Inns to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29452713. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by BRC Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit (Declaration) of Nicholas Inns in Support,, #2 Exhibit / Certificate of Good Standing with the Supreme Judicial Court of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts, #3 Exhibit / Certificate of Good Standing for the District of Columbia, #4 Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission).(Inns, Nicholas)
June 6, 2024 Filing 17 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Nicholas Inns to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29452713. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by BRC Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit (Declaration) of Nicholas Inns in Support, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing with the Supreme Judicial Court of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts, #3 Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission).(Inns, Nicholas) Modified on 6/6/2024 (rju).
June 6, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION for David Nabors to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29452575. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by BRC Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit (Declaration) of David Nabors in Support, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing with the Supreme Court of the State of Florida, #3 Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission).(Nabors, David)
June 6, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Jason Sternberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29452408. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by BRC Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit (Declaration) of Jason Sternberg in Support, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing with the Supreme Court of the State of Florida, #3 Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission).(Sternberg, Jason)
June 6, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #17 MOTION for Nicholas Inns to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29452713. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from District of Columbia; Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (rju)
June 6, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #15 MOTION for Jason Sternberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29452408. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION: THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant, that: (i) Defendant hereby accepts service of the Summons and Complaint filed in this action on May 15, 2024, subject to and without waiver of any defenses that Defendant may subsequently assert other than the absence of a summons or formal service; and (ii) Defendant shall file a pre-motion letter pursuant to Rule III.B.iii. of the Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action by July 11, 2024. SO ORDERED. BRC Inc. answer due 7/11/2024. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/5/2024) (vfr)
May 30, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. The conference will be held telephonically. The parties are instructed to call (888) 398-2342 and enter access code 9543348. Counsel shall jointly complete and file Judge Lehrburger's [Proposed] Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, which must be submitted in compliance with Judge Lehrburger's Individual Practices no later than one week before the initial case management conference. If suitable for the case, the parties are encouraged to use Judge Lehrburger's model Joint Electronic Discovery Submission and Proposed Order. These forms are available on the SDNY website at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Lehrburger. (rsh)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The parties sought a determination of relatedness between this action and Tang Capital Partners, L.P. v. BRC Inc., No. 22 Civ. 3476. ECF No. 3. The Court determined that the cases were related. Dkt. Entry 5/29/24. The parties in the earlier-filed case, Tang Capital, consented to the jurisdiction of the Honorable Robert W. Lehrburger. Tang, No. 22 Civ. 3476, ECF No. 22. The Court has referred the parties to Judge Lehrburger's supervision for general pretrial purposes. ECF No. 11. To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendant shall, by June 12, 2024, file a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, as further set forth herein. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by June 12, 2024, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/29/2024) (vfr)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/29/2024) (vfr)
May 29, 2024 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (tro)
May 29, 2024 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Analisa Torres. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(tro)
May 29, 2024 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:22-cv-03476-RWL. Notice of Assignment to follow. (tro)
May 28, 2024 Filing 10 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Alta Partners, LLC..(Tanner, Robert)
May 24, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Zane Muller on behalf of BRC Inc...(Muller, Zane)
May 24, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samuel Williamson on behalf of BRC Inc...(Williamson, Samuel)
May 16, 2024 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BRC Inc. (vf)
May 16, 2024 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Analisa Torres as possibly related to 1:22-cv-3476. (vf)
May 16, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
May 16, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(vf)
May 16, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Justin M. Sher. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State). (vf)
May 15, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Maxwell Tanner on behalf of Alta Partners, LLC..(Tanner, Robert)
May 15, 2024 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BRC Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Alta Partners, LLC..(Sher, Justin)
May 15, 2024 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Alta Partners, LLC..(Sher, Justin)
May 15, 2024 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:22-cv-3476. Document filed by Alta Partners, LLC..(Sher, Justin)
May 15, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sher, Justin)
May 15, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BRC Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29359831)Document filed by Alta Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Warrant Agreement).(Sher, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alta Partners, LLC v. BRC Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alta Partners, LLC
Represented By: Justin M. Sher
Represented By: Robert Maxwell Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRC Inc.
Represented By: Zane Muller
Represented By: Samuel Williamson
Represented By: Nicholas Inns
Represented By: Jason Sternberg
Represented By: David Nabors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?