New York State Marine Highway Transportation, LLC v. Intercounty Paving Associates, LLC
Petitioner: New York State Marine Highway Transportation, LLC
Respondent: Intercounty Paving Associates, LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv03743
Filed: May 15, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Louis L Stanton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 12 Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Verified Petition, Verified Petition, Declaration, Rule 7.1 Statement and Memorandum of Law with exhibits served on Intercounty Paving Associates LLC on May 15, 2024. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by New York State Marine Highway Transportation, LLC..(Hollander, Larry)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION..Document filed by New York State Marine Highway Transportation, LLC..(Ahmed, Thanbir)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by New York State Marine Highway Transportation, LLC..(Ahmed, Thanbir)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ahmed, Thanbir)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Thanbir Ahmed to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The pleading was not signed by the ECF Filing Attorney User. Re-file the pleading using the event type Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Thanbir Ahmed. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 120 (Contract: Marine); Arbitration code v (Voluntary). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 896 (Other Statutes: Arbitration); the Arbitration code has been deleted. (vf)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (vf)
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29360724).Document filed by New York State Marine Highway Transportation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verified Petition, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Larry B Hollander, #3 Exhibit Memorandum of Law in Support of Verified Petition, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A - Partial Final Award Pages 1 -7, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A - Partial Final Award Pages 8 - 15, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B - Contract Pages 1 -5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B - Contract Pages 6 - 9, #8 Exhibit Exhibit B - Contract Pages 10 - 14, #9 Exhibit Exhibit B - Contract Pages 15 - 19, #10 Exhibit Exhibit B - Contract Pages 20 - 23, #11 Exhibit Exhibit B - Contract Pages 24 - 27, #12 Exhibit Exhibit B - Contract Pages 28 - 31, #13 Exhibit Exhibit B - Contract Pages 32 - 33, #14 Exhibit Exhibit C - Society of Maritime Rules, #15 Exhibit Statement of Claim with Exhibits, #16 Exhibit Exhibit E - Preliminary Statement of Defense and Counteclaim, #17 Exhibit Respondent's Application for Final Award, #18 Exhibit Exhibit G - Claimant's Application in Opposition, #19 Exhibit Exhibit H - Respondent's Reply, #20 Exhibit Exhibit I - Respondent's Counterclaim).(Ahmed, Thanbir) Modified on 5/16/2024 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New York State Marine Highway Transportation, LLC v. Intercounty Paving Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Intercounty Paving Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: New York State Marine Highway Transportation, LLC
Represented By: Thanbir Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?