Zaccaria-Becker et al v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation d/b/a Amtrak et al
Plaintiff: Christina Zaccaria-Becker and Vivian Felipe-Perez
Defendant: Metropolitan Transportation Authority, New York City Transit Authority, Skanska Penn Station Construction A Joint Venture, National Railroad Passenger Corporation d/b/a Amtrak and The Long Island Railroad Company D/B/A MTA Long Island Railroad
Case Number: 1:2024cv03746
Filed: May 15, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 pi Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2024 CASE REMANDED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the State Court - Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York,. Sent certified copy of docket entries and remand order. Mailed via UPS Tracking Number 1Z E22 E53 021005 079 7 on 6/7/24. (yv)
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the matter is remanded to state court. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the case and to mail a certified copy of this Order to the Supreme Court of the State of New York, New York County pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/5/2024) (mml) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file any documents from the state court docket that were not attached to the May 15, 2024, notice of removal by June 3, 2024. It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall serve a copy of this Order and the May 23, 2024, Order on Plaintiffs and file proof of service by June 3, 2024. Plaintiff shall appear in this action by June 17, 2024, or this action will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/30/2024) (rro)
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file any documents from the state court docket that were not attached to the May 15, 2024, notice of removal by May 28, 2024. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/23/2024) (mml)
May 17, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Michael Armienti to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the corporate parent/other affiliate was not added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes or No radio button - If Yes - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
May 16, 2024 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Metropolitan Transportation Authority, National Railroad Passenger Corporation d/b/a Amtrak, New York City Transit Authority, Skanska Penn Station Construction A Joint Venture, The Long Island Railroad Company D/B/A MTA Long Island Railroad..(Armienti, Michael) Modified on 5/17/2024 (lb).
May 16, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Memorandum to Clerk re: Notice of Filing Removal filed in state court. Document filed by Metropolitan Transportation Authority, National Railroad Passenger Corporation d/b/a Amtrak, New York City Transit Authority, Skanska Penn Station Construction A Joint Venture, The Long Island Railroad Company D/B/A MTA Long Island Railroad..(Armienti, Michael)
May 16, 2024 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on Plaintiffs Attorney on 05/16/2024. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Metropolitan Transportation Authority, National Railroad Passenger Corporation d/b/a Amtrak, New York City Transit Authority, Skanska Penn Station Construction A Joint Venture, The Long Island Railroad Company D/B/A MTA Long Island Railroad..(Armienti, Michael)
May 16, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael Armienti. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Suffolk; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (vf)
May 16, 2024 Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
May 16, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
May 16, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
May 15, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Armienti on behalf of Metropolitan Transportation Authority, National Railroad Passenger Corporation d/b/a Amtrak, New York City Transit Authority, Skanska Penn Station Construction A Joint Venture, The Long Island Railroad Company D/B/A MTA Long Island Railroad..(Armienti, Michael)
May 15, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Armienti, Michael)
May 15, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 152740/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-29360859).Document filed by New York City Transit Authority, The Long Island Railroad Company D/B/A MTA Long Island Railroad, National Railroad Passenger Corporation d/b/a Amtrak, Skanska Penn Station Construction A Joint Venture, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-Answer).(Armienti, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zaccaria-Becker et al v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation d/b/a Amtrak et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Transportation Authority
Represented By: Michael Armienti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Transit Authority
Represented By: Michael Armienti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skanska Penn Station Construction A Joint Venture
Represented By: Michael Armienti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation d/b/a Amtrak
Represented By: Michael Armienti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Long Island Railroad Company D/B/A MTA Long Island Railroad
Represented By: Michael Armienti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Zaccaria-Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian Felipe-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?