aerogen, llc et al v. Tapjets Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: aerogen, llc and Starship 1, LLC
Defendant: Eugene Kesselman, Maria Tsenaeva-Kesselman, Tapjets Holdings, Inc., Tapjets Technologies, Inc. and Tapjets, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv03840
Filed: May 17, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2024 CASE REMANDED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the State Court - Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Sent certified copy of docket entries and remand order. Mailed via UPS Tracking Number 1ZE22E530210050591 on 5/29/2024..(ks)
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the matter is remanded to state court. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the case and to mail a certified copy of this Order to the Supreme Court of the State of New York, New York County pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/28/2024) (ks) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
May 20, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Moskovitz, Stuart)
May 20, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Stuart Jeffrey Moskovitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
May 20, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Stuart Jeffrey Moskovitz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
May 20, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
May 20, 2024 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
May 20, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 17, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 652472/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29369476).Document filed by Eugene Kesselman, Tapjets, Inc., Tapjets Holdings, Inc., Maria Tsenaeva-Kesselman, Tapjets Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit state court complaint, #2 Exhibit from state court complaint, #3 Exhibit from state court complaint, #4 Exhibit from state court complaint, #5 Exhibit from state court complaint, #6 Exhibit from state court complaint, #7 Exhibit from state court complaint, #8 Exhibit from state court complaint, #9 Exhibit from state court complaint, #10 Exhibit from state court complaint, #11 Exhibit Proposed Order to Show Cause, #12 Affidavit from state court OSC, #13 Exhibit from state court OSC, #14 Exhibit from state court OSC, #15 Exhibit from state court OSC, #16 Exhibit from state court OSC, #17 Exhibit from state court OSC, #18 Exhibit from state court OSC, #19 Exhibit from state court OSC, #20 Exhibit from state court OSC, #21 Exhibit from state court OSC, #22 Affidavit from state court OSC, #23 Affidavit from state court OSC, #24 Exhibit from state court OSC, #25 Exhibit from state court OSC, #26 Exhibit from state court OSC).(Moskovitz, Stuart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: aerogen, llc et al v. Tapjets Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: aerogen, llc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starship 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Kesselman
Represented By: Stuart Jeffrey Moskovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Tsenaeva-Kesselman
Represented By: Stuart Jeffrey Moskovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tapjets Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Stuart Jeffrey Moskovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tapjets Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Stuart Jeffrey Moskovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tapjets, Inc.
Represented By: Stuart Jeffrey Moskovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?