March 3, 2009 |
Filing 39
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 28 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Mark D. Papermaster USCA Case Number 08-5618-cv. Ordered that the appeal is DISMISSED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Certified: 3/2/2009. (rj)
|
March 3, 2009 |
Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re: 39 USCA Mandate. (rj)
|
January 27, 2009 |
Filing 38
CONSENT ORDER AND STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON OCTOBER 24, 2009....So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 1/27/09) (fk)
|
December 8, 2008 |
Filing 37
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey S. Klein on behalf of Mark D. Papermaster (Klein, Jeffrey)
|
December 8, 2008 |
Filing 36
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce S. Meyer on behalf of Mark D. Papermaster (Meyer, Bruce)
|
December 8, 2008 |
Filing 35
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James W. Quinn on behalf of Mark D. Papermaster (Quinn, James)
|
December 4, 2008 |
Filing 34
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on NOVEMBER 6, 2008 before Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Court Reporter: Angela A. O'Donnell, RPR. (ll)
|
December 3, 2008 |
Filing 33
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED that pursuant to the instructions of the defendant... Attorney James W. Quinn for Mark D. Papermaster, Jeffrey S. Klein for Mark D. Papermaster, Bruce S. Meyer for Mark D. Papermaster added. Attorney Blair G. Connelly terminated. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/02/2008) (gco)
|
December 1, 2008 |
Filing 32
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Honorable Kenneth M. Karas from Stephen S. Madsen dated 11/21/2008 re: schedule. ENDORSEMENT: The Court sees nothing wrong with Mr. Papermaster's decision to expeditiously appeal the preliminary injunction and to try this case. Accordingly, the Court has adopted, with minor changes, the schedule agreed to by the parties.. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/25/2008) (gco)
|
December 1, 2008 |
Filing 31
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/13/2009. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/23/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Trial Ready Hearing set for 2/24/2009 at 09:30 AM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/25/2008) (gco)
|
November 24, 2008 |
Filing 29
ORDER:...it is Ordered that the Court's November 14 Opinion, in its entirety, remain docketed with the Court under seal; and it is further Ordered that copies of the Amended Opinion and Order and a redacted transcript from the November 6, 2008 preliminary injunction hearing be publicly filed. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to file the Amended Opinion and Order and a redacted November 6, 2008 preliminary injunction hearing transcript, so as to place these documents in the public record. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/21/08) (fk)
|
November 24, 2008 |
Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: 28 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (fk)
|
November 24, 2008 |
Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for 12 Declaration filed by Mark D. Papermaster, 11 Declaration filed by Mark D. Papermaster, 7 Declaration in Support filed by International Business Machines Corporation, 3 Order to Show Cause, Preliminary Injunction,, filed by International Business Machines Corporation, 15 Affidavit of Service Other filed by Mark D. Papermaster, 14 Declaration filed by Mark D. Papermaster, 10 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Mark D. Papermaster, 9 MOTION for Timothy B. Hardwicke to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Mark D. Papermaster, 17 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 13 Declaration filed by Mark D. Papermaster, 25 Bond filed by International Business Machines Corporation, 8 Endorsed Letter, 1 Complaint filed by International Business Machines Corporation, 20 Declaration in Support, filed by International Business Machines Corporation, 4 Memorandum of Law in Support filed by International Business Machines Corporation, 19 Memorandum of Law in Support, filed by International Business Machines Corporation, 29 Order,, 2 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by International Business Machines Corporation, 28 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Mark D. Papermaster, 5 Declaration in Support, filed by International Business Machines Corporation, 6 Declaration filed by International Business Machines Corporation, 16 Notice of Appearance filed by Mark D. Papermaster, 22 Order, 23 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Mark D. Papermaster, 21 Declaration in Support,,, filed by International Business Machines Corporation, 30 Memorandum & Opinion, 18 Order, Set Deadlines, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, 26 Answer to Counterclaim filed by International Business Machines Corporation were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (Tychyn, John)
|
November 21, 2008 |
Filing 30
AMENDED OPINION AND ORDER... So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/21/08) (fk)
|
November 21, 2008 |
Filing 26
ANSWER to Counterclaim. Document filed by International Business Machines Corporation.(Madsen, Stephen)
|
November 20, 2008 |
Filing 28
NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL from 18 Order. Document filed by Mark D. Papermaster. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number 670348. (fk)
|
November 14, 2008 |
Filing 25
Undertaking on Injunction BOND # 015028200 in the amount of $ 3,000,000.00 posted by International Business Machines Corporation. (Liberty Mutual) (ll)
|
November 13, 2008 |
Filing 23
ANSWER to Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against International Business Machines Corporation. Document filed by Mark D. Papermaster.(Connelly, Blair)
|
November 13, 2008 |
Filing 22
ORDER:...Ordered, that a bond be filed by Plaintiff on or before November 14, 2008 at 5:00 pm, in the sum of $3,000,000 and that Defendant may recover from Plaintiff under said bond all costs and damages, if any, suffered by him in the event that Plaintiff does not succeed in this action. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/12/08) (fk)
|
November 7, 2008 |
Filing 21
DECLARATION of Stephen S. Madsen ("Supplemental Declaration") in Support re: 3 Order to Show Cause, Preliminary Injunction,,. Document filed by International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Supplemental Declaration of Stephen S. Madsen, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Supplemental Declaration of Stephen S. Madsen, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Supplemental Declaration of Stephen S. Madsen, # 4 Exhibit 4 to Supplemental Declaration of Stephen S. Madsen, # 5 Exhibit 5 to Supplemental Declaration of Stephen S. Madsen, # 6 Exhibit 6 to Supplemental Declaration of Stephen S. Madsen, # 7 Exhibit 7 to Supplemental Declaration of Stephen S. Madsen, # 8 Exhibit 8 to Supplemental Declaration of Stephen S. Madsen)(Madsen, Stephen)
|
November 7, 2008 |
Filing 20
DECLARATION of Rodney C. Adkins ("Supplemental Declaration") in Support re: 3 Order to Show Cause, Preliminary Injunction,,. Document filed by International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Supplemental Declaration of Rodney C. Adkins, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Supplemental Declaration of Rodney C. Adkins, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Supplemental Declaration of Rodney C. Adkins)(Madsen, Stephen)
|
November 7, 2008 |
Filing 19
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3 Order to Show Cause, Preliminary Injunction,, (Reply Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction). Document filed by International Business Machines Corporation. (Madsen, Stephen)
|
November 7, 2008 |
Filing 18
ORDER: For the reasons that will be stated in a forthcoming Opinion, Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant, Mark D. Papermaster, will immediately cease his employment with Apple, Inc. until further Order of this Court; and it is further ORDERED, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(c), that Plaintiff is required to propose a reasonable bond, after consultation with Defendant, to the Court by 4:00 pm on November 10, 2008. If Defendant objects, he shall submit his opposition by 4:00 pm on November 11, 2008; and it is further ORDERED that the Court will hold a status conference on November 18, 2008, at 10:00 am, at which it will discuss, and encourages the Parties to discuss beforehand, an expedited schedule for discovery and trial. re: 7 Declaration in Support filed by International Business Machines Corporation, 3 Order to Show Cause, Preliminary Injunction,, filed by International Business Machines Corporation, 4 Memorandum of Law in Support filed by International Business Machines Corporation, 5 Declaration in Support, filed by International Business Machines Corporation, 6 Declaration filed by International Business Machines Corporation, ( Reasonable Bond due by 11/10/2008 4pm., Opposition due by 11/11/2008 4pm),, ( Status Conference set for 11/18/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/07/2008) (gco)
|
November 7, 2008 |
Filing 17
ORDER granting 9 Motion for Timothy B. Hardwicke to Appear Pro Hac Vice So Ordered.. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/06/2008) (rj)
|
November 6, 2008 |
Filing 16
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Blair G. Connelly on behalf of Mark D. Papermaster (Connelly, Blair)
|
November 6, 2008 |
Filing 15
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by Mark D. Papermaster. (Connelly, Blair)
|
November 6, 2008 |
Filing 14
DECLARATION of Blair G. Connelly. Document filed by Mark D. Papermaster. (Connelly, Blair)
|
November 6, 2008 |
Filing 13
DECLARATION of Danielle Lambert. Document filed by Mark D. Papermaster. (Connelly, Blair)
|
November 6, 2008 |
Filing 12
DECLARATION of Mark D. Papermaster. Document filed by Mark D. Papermaster. (Connelly, Blair)
|
November 6, 2008 |
Filing 11
DECLARATION of Robert Mansfield. Document filed by Mark D. Papermaster. (Connelly, Blair)
|
November 6, 2008 |
Filing 10
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: 3 Order to Show Cause, Preliminary Injunction,,. Document filed by Mark D. Papermaster. (Connelly, Blair)
|
November 6, 2008 |
Filing 9
MOTION for Timothy B. Hardwicke to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Mark D. Papermaster.(ll) Modified on 11/6/2008 (ll). Paid $25.00 fee receipt #660838
|
November 5, 2008 |
Filing 8
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Blair G. Connelly dated 10/31/2008 re: Permission to file Opposition to Plaintiff's Preliminary Injunction motion under seal. ENDORSEMENT: Mr. Papermaster may file his opposition to Plaintiff's Preliminary Injunction motion under seal, provided that a redacted version will be filed within 30 days of the date of this memo endorsement.. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/03/2008) (rj)
|
October 28, 2008 |
Filing 7
DECLARATION of Stephen S. Madsen in Support re: 3 Order to Show Cause, Preliminary Injunction,,. Document filed by International Business Machines Corporation. (Madsen, Stephen)
|
October 28, 2008 |
Filing 6
DECLARATION of Rodney C. Adkins re: 3 Order to Show Cause, Preliminary Injunction,,. Document filed by International Business Machines Corporation. (Madsen, Stephen)
|
October 28, 2008 |
Filing 5
DECLARATION of J. Randall MacDonald in Support re: 3 Order to Show Cause, Preliminary Injunction,,. Document filed by International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of J. Randall MacDonald)(Madsen, Stephen)
|
October 28, 2008 |
Filing 4
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3 Order to Show Cause, Preliminary Injunction,,. Document filed by International Business Machines Corporation. (Madsen, Stephen)
|
October 24, 2008 |
Filing 3
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by International Business Machines Corporation. Defendant shall show cause as to why why an Order should not be made and entered in this action.( Show Cause Hearing set for 11/6/2008 at 10:30 AM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.), SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/24/2008) (gco)
|
October 22, 2008 |
Filing 2
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by International Business Machines Corporation.(gco)
|
October 22, 2008 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT against Mark D. Papermaster. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 666995)Document filed by International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(gco)
|
October 22, 2008 |
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mark D. Papermaster. (gco)
|
October 22, 2008 |
Magistrate Judge LISA MARGARET SMITH is so designated. (gco)
|
October 22, 2008 |
Case Designated ECF. (gco)
|