Jones v. County of Westchester et al
Plaintiff: Latonia Jones
Defendant: County of Westchester, Rosa Hazoury, Elke Knudsen and Lisa Colin
Cross_claimant: Lisa Colin
Cross_defendant: County of Westchester, Rosa Hazoury and Elke Knudsen
Case Number: 7:2014cv07635
Filed: September 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: White Plains Office
County: Westchester
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 197 OPINION & ORDER re: 187 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Michael D. Meth dated March 11, 2020 filed by Latonia Jones, 189 CROSS MOTION to Dismiss the Propos ed Third Amended Complaint filed by County of Westchester, Elke Knudsen, Rosa Hazoury, 193 CROSS MOTION to Dismiss the Proposed Third Amended Complaint filed by Lisa Colin. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' motion to am end is GRANTED. The County Defendants' motion to dismiss is DENIED as to DJ's substantive due process claim for failure to provide an education against the individual County Defendants, DJ's ADA claim for failure to provide an educatio n against the County, and DJ's negligence claim for injuries arising from failure to provide an education against the County Defendants and GRANTED as to all other claims. Defendant Colin's motion to dismiss is GRANTED in its entirety. Pla intiffs are directed to file their PAC on or before April 7, 2021. The remaining defendants are directed to file an Answer to the PAC on or before May 7, 2021. The parties are directed to file a revised Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order on o r before May 14, 2021 (template attached). Alternatively, if the parties believe that further discovery is unnecessary, they shall inform the Court in writing by May 14, 2021. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate defendant Lisa Colin and terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 187, 189, and 193. SO ORDERED. (Amended Pleadings due by 4/7/2021.) Lisa Colin (Esq.) terminated. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 3/31/2021) (mml)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 182 OPINION AND ORDER. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file the proposed Third Amended Complaint is DENIED for failure to comply with Rule 8 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiffs are, however, granted permiss ion to seek leave to file a revised Third Amended Complaint that is consistent with this Opinion and Order. Given the Court's decision, Defendants' motions to dismiss the Third Amended Complaint are DENIED as moot. The Court will continue r eserve decision on the pending motions to dismiss targeting the Second Amended Complaint. Should Plaintiff seek leave to file an updated Third amended Complaint, their moving papers shall be served on February 26, 2020. Defendants are, in turn, grant ed leave to file cross-motions to dismiss, if deemed warranted. Defendants' opposition/cross-moving papers shall be served on March 27, 2020, Plaintiffs' reply/cross-opposition shall be served on April 13, 2020, and Defendants' cross-r eply shall be served on April 28, 2020. The parties are directed to file all motion documents on the cross-reply date of April 28, 2020 and to provide two copies of all documents to chambers as the documents are served. The Clerk of the Court is resp ectfully directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 169, 173, & 177. So ordered. re: 173 CROSS MOTION to Dismiss the Proposed Amended Complaint filed by County of Westchester, Elke Knudsen, Rosa Hazoury, 169 MOTION to Amend/C orrect 1 Complaint on behalf of D.J. filed by Latonia Jones, 177 CROSS MOTION to Dismiss the Proposed Amended Complaint filed by Lisa Colin. (Amended Pleadings due by 4/28/2020. Cross Motions due by 4/28/2020. Motions due by 4/28/2020. Responses due by 4/28/2020. Replies due by 4/28/2020.) (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 1/27/2020) (rjm)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 OPINION & ORDER. Upon a de novo review upon due consideration, the Court adopts the conclusion of MJ McCarthy. Accordingly, the Court appoints Megahey to serve as D.J.'s next of friend. Plaintiff is directed to amend their pleadings in accordance with this Opinion and Order. The clerk of the court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF Docket No. 98. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 4/27/17) (yv)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 135 OPINION & ORDER re: 125 FIRST MOTION for Reconsideration re; 121 Memorandum & Opinion filed by Latonia Jones. For the foregoing reasons, the Court DENIES Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully requested to terminate the motion at ECF No. 125. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 3/8/2016) (mml)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 121 OPINION & ORDER re: 34 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lisa Colin, 38 MOTION to Dismiss filed by County of Westchester, Elke Knuds en, Rosa Hazoury. For the foregoing reasons, the County Defendants' and Defendant Colin's motions to dismiss and for judgment on the pleadings are GRANTED to the extent of dismissing Plaintiff's civil RICO claim and DENIED in all oth er respects. The Court respectfully directs the Clerk to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 34 and 38. In accordance with the opinion and order, the Court's consideration of Plaintiff's federal due process and state law claims is stayed pending the outcome of the state court proceedings. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 12/14/2015) (mml)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. County of Westchester et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latonia Jones
Represented By: Jennielena Rubino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Westchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosa Hazoury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elke Knudsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Colin
Represented By: William Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Lisa Colin
Represented By: William Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: County of Westchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Rosa Hazoury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Elke Knudsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?