Lemus v. Pezzementi et al
Plaintiff: Ramiro Lemus
Defendant: Todd Pezzementi, Shawn Pezzementi and Northern Tree Service
Case Number: 7:2015cv05592
Filed: July 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: White Plains Office
County: Rockland
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER: Accordingly, the Court hereby schedules an in-person inquest hearing for Monday, February 6, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 250 at the United States Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, New York 10601. Plaintiff must be prepa red to offer testimony to support his FLSA and NYLL claims at a minimum, and may offer testimony regarding any of his other claims for damages as well. In addition, Plaintiff may provide admissible documentary evidence, if any, to substantiate h is claims for damages. Defendants will also be permitted to appear and offer testimony and admissible documentary evidence, if any, regarding the amount of damages to which Plaintiff is entitled. The Court will hold a telephonic status conference on January 25, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. to discuss the parameters of the inquest hearing and any other logistical matters that may be relevant for the hearing. To access the teleconference, please follow these directions: (1) dial the meeting number: (877) 336-1831; (2) enter the access code: 2751700; and (3) press pound (#) to enter the teleconference as a guest. Should counsel experience any technical issues with the teleconferencing system, please contact Chambers at (914) 390-4070. SO ORDERE D. ( Inquest Hearing set for 2/6/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 250, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause., Telephone Conference set for 1/25/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 1/11/2023) (tg)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER: Both parties have filed documents containing personally identifying information that must be placed under seal. Accordingly, the Court respectfully directs that the Clerk of Court place the following documents under seal, viewable only by the Court and the parties to the case: ECF Nos. 91-2, 102-1, 102-3, 113-1, and 113-2. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 12/6/2022) (tg)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER: Accordingly, if Defendants seek to have the Court consider any of these documents, they must provide properly authenticated copies, as well as a sworn statement explaining the information reflected in Defendants payroll records for Plaintiff. The parties must serve and file their supplemental inquest submissions by no later than Friday, July 1, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 6/2/2022) (tg)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER re: 91 Statement of Relatedness filed by Ramiro Lemus. On August 21, 2020, Plaintiff filed his inquest submission. Docket # 91. If Defendants wish to file an opposition, they shall serve and file their opposition by no later than September 18, 2020. Plaintiff shall serve and file his reply, if any, by no later than September 25, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith on 9/3/2020) (kv)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER: Accordingly, Plaintiff is once again ordered to show cause by no later than May 19, 2020, why the undersigned should not issue a Report and Recommendation recommending that Judge Roman deny Plaintiff's request for the entry of a default j udgment awarding him money damages in the above-referenced action. Plaintiff shall provide in any response to this Order an explanation for his inability to meet with his clinical neuropsychologist either in person or remotely within 30 days from the date hereof. Plaintiff's failure to provide such an explanation shall likewise result in the issuance of a Report and Recommendation recommending that Judge Roman deny Plaintiff's request for the entry of a default judgment awarding him mo ney damages in the above-referenced action. There will be no further extensions of time beyond that included herein. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED., ( Show Cause Response due by 5/19/2020.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith on 5/12/2020) (ama)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 CANCELLATION NOTICE: The status conference scheduled for Tuesday, May 19, 2020, at 2:00 PM, before the Honorable Lisa Margaret Smith, United States Magistrate Judge, in the matter of Lemus v. Pezzementi, et al., 15-cv-5592 (NSR) (LMS), has been cancelled. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith on 5/6/2020) (rj)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER: Under the circumstances, the Court grants Plaintiff's request but hereby orders that Plaintiff shall provide the Court with an update 30 days from the date hereof, informing the Court as to Plaintiff's ability to meet with his cl inical neuropsychologist and when such appointment will be scheduled to occur. Although the Court understands that in-person, non-essential medical appointments have been cancelled for the time being, Plaintiff must provide the Court with an explanation as to why he is unable to meet with his clinical neuropsychologist remotely, even though he needs a translator, who may participate remotely as well. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith on 4/9/2020) (rj)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for 58 Report and Recommendations: Ramiro Lemus ("Plaintiff" or "Lemus"), on behalf of himself and those similarly situated, commenced this action against Todd Pezzementi ("Todd&qu ot;), Shawn Pezzementi and Northern Tree Service ("Northern") (collectively referred to as "Defendants") asserting claims under the Fair Labor and Standards Act ("FLSA") and New York Labor Law ("NYLL"). Followi ng Defendants' appearance and answer, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b), this case was referred to Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith ("Judge Smith"). During the pendency of discovery, Plaintiff moved for an order striking Defendants' pleadings. On August 11, 2017, Judge Smith issued a Report and Recommendation ("R&R"), recommending that Plaintiff's motion be granted (ECF No. 58). For the reasons stated above, this Court adopts Judge Smith's R&R in its entirety. Plaintiff's motion to strike Defendants' answer is GRANTED. Defendants are directed to pay the cost associated with the unjustified cancellation of depositions, and reasonable attorneys' f ees (pursuant to Fed. R. Civ 37(b)(2)(C)) consistent with the R&R. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter defaults against Defendants Todd and Northern pursuant to Rule 55(a). Plaintiff shall be permitted to apply for a default judgment against said Defendants on his claims for assault and battery. Any application for the entry of a default judgment on Plaintiff's claims for violation of the FLSA, NYLL and for unpaid wages is held in abeyance. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion (Doc. No. 56). This constitutes the Court's Order. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 9/19/2017) (jwh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lemus v. Pezzementi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Pezzementi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Pezzementi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Tree Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramiro Lemus
Represented By: Michael Louis Braunstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?