Doe v. Ludwigsen et al
Plaintiff: A. Doe
Defendant: Kurt Ludwigsen, Kirsten Lambertson, Michael G Scales, Keith Davie, Amanda Aikens, Nyack College, Michael G. Scales, David C. Jennings, Taylor Brown, Does 1-10 and Karen Davie
Case Number: 7:2015cv07827
Filed: October 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: White Plains Office
County: Rockland
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 156 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the understanding that the above-referenced action is dismissed with prejudice against all defendants, and without costs to any party. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 7/29/2020) (kv)
July 29, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Carla Varriale. RE-FILE Document No. #155 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Your document needs to match the docket entry. When re-filing your document, do not select that the dismissal is pursuant to Rule 41(a), your document does not state that it is. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (km)
July 28, 2020 Filing 155 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Parties and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Kurt Ludwigsen(In His Individual Capacity ), Nyack College, Amanda Aikens, Karen Davie(As Director of Human Resources and Title IX Coordinator for Nyack College), David C. Jennings (As Executive Vice President of Nyack College ), Keith Davie, Michael G. Scales, Keith Davie, Does, Kirsten Lambertson, Karen Davie(Individually ), Taylor Brown, Michael G Scales, Taylor Brown, Amanda Aikens, David C. Jennings(Individually ). Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Varriale, Carla) Modified on 7/29/2020 (km).
June 25, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Seibel: Status Conference held on 6/25/2020. Plaintiff's counsel Todd Krouner, Esq. along with Julia Gallo (Legal Assistant) and Rhys Johnson (Law Clerk) appear telephonically. Defendant Kurt Ludwigsen's counsel Michael Burke, Esq. appears telephonically. Defendant Nyack College's counsel Carla Varriale, Esq. appears telephonically. Law Clerk Julia MacAllister appears telephonically. The Court refers this case to the Magistrate Judge for settlement purposes. All expert discovery to be completed by September 30, 2020. The parties inform the Court that this case would take two (2) weeks to try. The Court sets a trial schedule: Jury selection and trial scheduled for January 11, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for January 6, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. Joint Pre-Trial Order to be submitted by November 12, 2020. Motion(s) in Limine to be submitted by November 25, 2020; opposition due December 9, 2020. Proposed voir dire questions and jury charge to be submitted by December 16, 2020. See transcript. (Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel, Jury Selection set for 1/11/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel, Jury Trial set for 1/11/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel). (Court Reporter Christina Arends-Dieck) Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS et al.(wc)
June 24, 2020 Filing 154 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: A Status Conference is scheduled for June 25, 2020 at 11:45 a.m. (via telephone) before the Honorable Cathy Seibel at the Charles L. Brieant United States District Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, New York 10601 in Courtroom 621. Person(s) appearing via telephone are reminded of the general prohibition against any forms of recording and rebroadcasting of Court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Pursuant to Judge Seibel's Emergency Individual Rules and Practices in light of COVID-19, last revised on March 19, 2020, the parties are directed to attend by phone using the following information: Toll-Free Tele-conference number: (877) 336 1839 to call in and enter access code: 1047966#. Telephone Conference set for 6/25/2020 at 11:45 AM before Judge Cathy Seibel. (mml)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER: Beginning March 16, 2020, all parties to civil conferences may attend by phone, using the following information: Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1839; Access Code: 1047966. The parties should call in from a landline and announce their names before speaking. This Order is subject to revocation at any time. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 3/12/2020) (jwh)
February 21, 2020 Filing 152 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERNECE: A Bench Ruling on the pending motion(s) is scheduled for March 23, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. before the Honorable Cathy Seibel at the Charles L. Brieant United States District Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, New York 10601 in Courtroom 621. Status Conference set for 3/23/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel. (ama)
May 3, 2019 Filing 151 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (215 in 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED, 135 in 7:15-cv-07867-CS, 148 in 7:15-cv-07827-CS, 127 in 7:15-cv-09581-CS, 139 in 7:15-cv-08059-CS, 137 in 7:15-cv-07825-CS) MOTION to Preclude Nyack Defendants' Notice of Motion to Preclude the Testmony and Report of Merrily Dean Baker. . Document filed by Amanda Aikens (Individually), Taylor Brown, David C. Jennings (As Executive Vice President of Nyack College ), Karen Davie(Individually ), Keith Davie, Kirsten Lambertson, Michael G. Scales(As President of Nyack College ), Nyack College. Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Bochner, Michelle)
May 3, 2019 Filing 150 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (215 in 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED, 135 in 7:15-cv-07867-CS, 148 in 7:15-cv-07827-CS, 127 in 7:15-cv-09581-CS, 139 in 7:15-cv-08059-CS, 137 in 7:15-cv-07825-CS) MOTION to Preclude Nyack Defendants' Notice of Motion to Preclude the Testmony and Report of Merrily Dean Baker. . Document filed by Amanda Aikens (Individually), Taylor Brown, David C. Jennings (As Executive Vice President of Nyack College ), Karen Davie(Individually ), Keith Davie, Kirsten Lambertson, Michael G. Scales(As President of Nyack College ), Nyack College. Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Bochner, Michelle)
May 3, 2019 Filing 149 DECLARATION of Michelle Bochner, Esq. in Support re: (135 in 7:15-cv-07867-CS, 148 in 7:15-cv-07827-CS, 215 in 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED, 127 in 7:15-cv-09581-CS, 139 in 7:15-cv-08059-CS, 137 in 7:15-cv-07825-CS) MOTION to Preclude Nyack Defendants' Notice of Motion to Preclude the Testmony and Report of Merrily Dean Baker.. Document filed by Amanda Aikens (Individually), Taylor Brown, David C. Jennings (As Executive Vice President of Nyack College ), Karen Davie(Individually ), Keith Davie, Kirsten Lambertson, Michael G. Scales(As President of Nyack College ), Nyack College. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Submitted Under Seal, #2 Exhibit B - EBT of Merrily Dean Baker, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiff M. Doe's Expert Disclosure Pursuant to FED. R. Civ. P, 26(a)(2))Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Bochner, Michelle)
May 3, 2019 Filing 148 MOTION to Preclude Nyack Defendants' Notice of Motion to Preclude the Testmony and Report of Merrily Dean Baker. Document filed by Amanda Aikens (Individually), Taylor Brown, David C. Jennings (As Executive Vice President of Nyack College ), Karen Davie(Individually ), Keith Davie, Kirsten Lambertson, Michael G. Scales(As President of Nyack College ), Nyack College.Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Bochner, Michelle)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Todd J. Krouner dated 4/17/2019 re: Pursuant to Your Honors Order, dated April 16, 2019, attached is a copy of Plaintiffs Amended Objections and Responses to Nyack College Defendants Local Rule 56.1 Statement of Material Facts, dated April 15, 2019. ENDORSEMENT: Having reviewed the Local Rule 56.1 counter-statement, it is not as short and concise as it could have been, but given the number and complexity of the disputed issues, and the extent to which it is tied to disputes of fact, it is not so burdensome that a motion to strike would be a good use of the parties' (or the Court's) time and resources. Defendants need not respond to it, but if they wish to, they may do so with their reply papers, the date for which is extended to 5/17/19. (This does not preclude Defendants from making arguments in reply as to why the Court should disregard or discount any portions of the counter-statement.) The Clerk shall docket this endorsement in 15-CV-7822 and the related cases. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 4/17/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al. (mml)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER deferring ruling on (210) Motion for Extension of Time in case 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED: Plaintiffs' counsel should email a copy of the amended counterstatement to my chambers in-box by 4/17/19. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al. (Seibel, Cathy)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting #144 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: I have not seen the document, but if it is 54 pages it almost certainly does not comply with Local Rule 56.1, which provides that the opposing party may submit a counterstatement consisting of "additional paragraphs containing a separate, short and concise statement of additional material facts as to which it is contended that there exists a genuine issue to be tried." Opposing parties frequently try to use the counterstatement as an opportunity to lay out their narrative, but that is not the function of the counterstatement. If Plaintiffs' counterstatement consists of more than a short statement of disputed facts Plaintiffs believe require resolution at trial, Plaintiffs should re-do it. Plaintiffs' counsel should confer with Defendants' counsel about a schedule for the amended counterstatement and Defendants' reply papers. The parties should submit a proposed schedule by 8/16/19. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
January 25, 2019 Filing 144 AMENDED LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Daubert Motions addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from M. Bochner dated January 24, 2019. Document filed by Amanda Aikens (Individually), Amanda Aikens (As Assistant Athletic Director for Nyack College ), Taylor Brown, David C. Jennings (As Executive Vice President of Nyack College ), David C. Jennings (Individually ), Karen Davie(Individually ), Karen Davie(As Director of Human Resources and Title IX Coordinator for Nyack College), Keith Davie, Keith Davie, Kirsten Lambertson, Michael G. Scales(As President of Nyack College ), Michael G. Scales(Individually), Nyack College, Taylor Brown, Amanda Aikens, David C. Jennings (Individually), Karen Davie(as Director of Human Resources and Title IX Coordinator for Nyack College), Kirsten Lambertson, Amanda Aikens, Taylor Brown, Karen Davie(Individually), Keith Davie, David C Jennings, David C Jennings, Kirsten Lambertson, Michael G Scales, Michael G Scales, Amanda Aikens (As Assistant Atheletic Director for Nyack College ), Michael G. Scales ( Individually ), Michael G Scales, Michael G. Scales(Individually ).Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Bochner, Michelle)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER deferring ruling on (206) Letter Motion for Discovery; deferring ruling on (206) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED: I'm a bit confused because I thought at the conference we agreed that Daubert motions would be briefed on the same schedule as the summary judgment motion(s). Ms. Bochner does not explain why extra time is needed, nor does she say whether Plaintiff consents to her application. She should follow up on both those matters and state specifically what dates she wants for opening, opposition and reply briefs on the Daubert motion if it is going to be de-coupled from the summary judgment schedule. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al. (Seibel, Cathy)
January 24, 2019 Filing 142 LETTER MOTION for Discovery Extension of Time to Serve Daubert Motions addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from M. Bochner dated January 24, 2019., LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Daubert Motions addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from M. Bochner dated January 24, 2019. Document filed by Amanda Aikens (Individually), Amanda Aikens (As Assistant Athletic Director for Nyack College ), Taylor Brown, David C. Jennings (As Executive Vice President of Nyack College ), David C. Jennings (Individually ), Karen Davie(Individually ), Karen Davie(As Director of Human Resources and Title IX Coordinator for Nyack College), Keith Davie, Keith Davie, Kirsten Lambertson, Michael G. Scales(As President of Nyack College ), Michael G. Scales(Individually), Nyack College, Taylor Brown, Amanda Aikens, David C. Jennings (Individually), Karen Davie(as Director of Human Resources and Title IX Coordinator for Nyack College), Kirsten Lambertson, Amanda Aikens, Taylor Brown, Karen Davie(Individually), Keith Davie, David C Jennings, David C Jennings, Kirsten Lambertson, Michael G Scales, Michael G Scales, Amanda Aikens (As Assistant Atheletic Director for Nyack College ), Michael G. Scales ( Individually ), Michael G Scales, Michael G. Scales(Individually ).Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Bochner, Michelle)
October 29, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Seibel: Pre-Motion Conference held on 10/29/2018. Defendant (Nyack College and respective defendants) Consolidated Motion for Summary Judgment to be submitted by January 31, 2019 (The Court grants opening brief extension up to 35 pages); Plaintiff's opposition due April 1, 2019 (The Court grants main opposition brief extension up to 35 pages); Defendant's reply due May 1, 2019 (The Court grants reply brief extension up to 15 pages). Defendant (Nyack College and respective defendants) to submit Daubert motion (if necessary) also by January 31, 2019 following the same schedule as Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Consolidated Motion for Summary Judgment against Defendant (Ludwigsen) to be submitted by January 31, 2019; Defendant (Ludwigsen) opposition due April 1, 2019; Plaintiffs' reply due May 1, 2019. See transcript. (Court Reporter Angela O'Donnell) Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(wc)
October 12, 2018 Filing 141 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: A pre-motion conference is scheduled for October 29, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. before the Hon. Cathy Seibel at the Charles L. Brieant United States Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601, Courtroom 621. Pre-Motion Conference set for 10/29/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel. Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(mro)
September 13, 2018 Filing 140 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Michael Kennedy Burke on behalf of Kurt Ludwigsen(In His Individual Capacity ). New Address: Hodges Walsh Messemer & Burke, LLP, 55 Church Street, Suite 211, White Plains, NY, 10601, 914-385-6000. (Burke, Michael)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting (196) FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Jessica Yanefski, Esq. dated September 5, 2018. Document filed by K. Doe. Filed in case 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED; granting (128) FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Jessica Yanefski, Esq. dated September 5, 2018. Document filed by K. Doe. Filed in case 7:15-cv-07825-CS; granting (138) FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Jessica Yanefski, Esq. dated September 5, 2018. Document filed by K. Doe. Filed in case 7:15-cv-07827-CS; granting (126) FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Jessica Yanefski, Esq. dated September 5, 2018. Document filed by K. Doe. Filed in case 7:15-cv-07867-CS; granting (128) FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Jessica Yanefski, Esq. dated September 5, 2018. Document filed by K. Doe. Filed in case 7:15-cv-08059-CS; granting (118) FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Jessica Yanefski, Esq. dated September 5, 2018. Document filed by K. Doe. Filed in case 7:15-cv-09581-CS. The 9/13/18 conference is adjourned to 10/11/18 at 3:30 pm. Best of luck to Mr. Krouner's daughter. So ordered. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 10/11/2018 at 03:30 PM before Judge Cathy Seibel). (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 9/5/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al, as per Chambers. (rjm)
September 5, 2018 Filing 138 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Jessica Yanefski, Esq. dated September 5, 2018. Document filed by K. Doe.Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Krouner, Todd)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting in part and denying in part (192) Letter Motion for Leave to File Document in case 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED: The pre-motion conference will be held on 9/13/18 at 10:30 am. We will discuss at that conference whether there is a need to keep the names and other information confidential. In the meantime the parties should continue to do so. But I do not want the parties to attach exhibits to the pre-motion letters unless they truly cannot make their points without them, and in that case they should attach only the bare minimum. They will have a full opportunity to provide all relevant material when the motions are actually briefed. So the best idea would be to refrain from attaching exhibits to the pre-motion letters, but if that really cannot be avoided, the parties should file redacted versions on ECF and provide unredacted hard copies to chambers. Pre-motion letters are due 8/31/18, and responsive letters are due 9/7/18. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al. (Seibel, Cathy)
August 23, 2018 Filing 136 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal In Connection With Plaintiffs' Pre-Motion Letter Seeking Leave To Move For Partial Summary Judgment addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Jessica Yanefski, Esq. dated August 23, 2018. Document filed by K. Doe.Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Krouner, Todd)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER striking (131) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED Issues resolved at subsequent hearing. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al. (Davison, Paul)
August 21, 2018 Filing 134 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Ashley N. Torre dated 8/21/2018 re: withdrawal as attorney of record. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk shall terminate Ms. Torre as counsel in the matters listed below. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 8/21/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(rro)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER denying (182) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED, This motion is denied on the basis of plaintiff's counsel's representations set forth in the responsive letter dated August 16, 2018 [Dkt. 185 in the lead case.] The Court finds good case for treating the depositions of the five (5)expert witnesses designated confidential by plaintiff's counsel as confidential. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al. (Davison, Paul)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting (187) Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED: Pre-motion letters and responses may be up to 5 pages, but the parties are encouraged to keep them to 3 pages if possible. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al. (Seibel, Cathy)
August 16, 2018 Filing 131 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison from Jessica Yanefski, Esq. dated August 16, 2018 re: (182 in 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED) LETTER MOTION for Discovery (Confidential designation of Expert Transcripts) addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison from Michelle Bochner dated 7/31/2018. . Document filed by K. Doe. Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Krouner, Todd)
August 1, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison: Telephone Conference held on 8/1/2018. Plaintiffs shall respond to the Nyack Defendants' Letter Motion for Discovery (Dkt. #182) by August 9, 2018. Counsel shall submit pre-motion letters to Judge Seibel by August 31, 2018, in accordance with her individual practices. Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(ld)
July 9, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison: Telephone Conference held on 7/9/2018. Telephone conference scheduled for August 1, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(ld)
July 6, 2018 Filing 130 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alec Richard Gladd on behalf of Kurt Ludwigsen. Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Gladd, Alec)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER. Before the Court are Plaintiffs' objections, (Docs. 176-77), to Magistrate Judge Paul Davison's April 23, 2018 Decision and Order, (Doc. 171 (the "Order")), denying Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint, (Doc. 137). Familiarity with the proceedings before the Magistrate Judge is presumed, and as further specified and set forth in this Order. Accordingly, Judge Davison's ruling was neither clearly erroneous nor contrary to law, and it is hereby AFFIRMED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 6/12/2018). Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al. (rjm)
May 24, 2018 Filing 128 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (176 in 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED) Objection (non-motion) to Magistrate Judge Paul Davison's April 23, 2018 Decision and Order. Document filed by K. Doe. Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Krouner, Todd)
May 17, 2018 Filing 127 AFFIDAVIT of Michelle Bochner in Opposition re: (177 in 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED) Affirmation in Support, (176 in 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED) Objection (non-motion). Document filed by Amanda Aikens (Individually), Amanda Aikens (As Assistant Athletic Director for Nyack College ), Taylor Brown, David C. Jennings (As Executive Vice President of Nyack College ), David C. Jennings (Individually ), Karen Davie(Individually ), Karen Davie(As Director of Human Resources and Title IX Coordinator for Nyack College), Keith Davie, Keith Davie, Kirsten Lambertson, Michael G. Scales(As President of Nyack College ), Michael G. Scales(Individually), Nyack College, Taylor Brown, Amanda Aikens, David C. Jennings (Individually), Karen Davie(as Director of Human Resources and Title IX Coordinator for Nyack College), Kirsten Lambertson, Amanda Aikens, Taylor Brown, Karen Davie(Individually), Keith Davie, David C Jennings, David C Jennings, Kirsten Lambertson, Michael G Scales, Michael G Scales, Amanda Aikens (As Assistant Atheletic Director for Nyack College ), Michael G. Scales ( Individually ), Michael G Scales, Michael G. Scales(Individually ). Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Bochner, Michelle)
May 9, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison: Telephone Conference held on 5/9/2018. Telephone conference scheduled for July 9, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(ld)
May 8, 2018 Filing 126 AFFIRMATION of Todd J. Krouner in Support re: (176 in 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED) Objection (non-motion). Document filed by K. Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Krouner, Todd)
May 8, 2018 Filing 125 Objection re: (171 in 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED) Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,,,,, . Document filed by K. Doe. Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Krouner, Todd)
May 8, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR/EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Todd Jay Krouner to RE-FILE Document (103 in 7:15-cv-09581-CS) MOTION to Set Aside (171 in 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED) Order on Motion for Leave to File Document (Plaintiffs' Rule 72(a) Objections). (1) ERROR(S): Incomplete Document (i.e., No Court Type, No Parties, No Case Number, No Document Type). (2) Use Event - Objection (non-motion) found under the Event Type - Other Answers. Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(db)
May 7, 2018 Filing 124 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Todd J. Krouner in Support re: (103 in 7:15-cv-09581-CS) MOTION to Set Aside (171 in 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED) Order on Motion for Leave to File Document (Plaintiffs' Rule 72(a) Objections).. Document filed by K. Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Krouner, Todd) Modified on 5/8/2018 (db).
May 7, 2018 Filing 123 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY/WRONG EVENT TYPE - MOTION to Set Aside (171 in 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED) Order on Motion for Leave to File Document (Plaintiffs' Rule 72(a) Objections). Document filed by K. Doe.Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Krouner, Todd) Modified on 5/8/2018 (db).
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER: This matter having come before the Court, and after hearing argument, and after due deliberation and sufficient cause appearing therefore, it is hereby Ordered and Adjudged that: I. Plaintiffs' designated experts, Alexander S. Bardey, M.D. and Kate Termini, Psy.D., shall produce the following documents and materials in connection with their independent psychiatric and psychological evaluations of plaintiffs A. Doe, E. Doe, M. Doe, S. Doe, and Y. Doe: i. Copies of all test forms, questionnaires, answer sheets and/or any other documents that were filled out, written and/or signed by plaintiffs; ii. Copies of all test questions for the tests administered to plaintiffs; iii. Copies of the interpretative reports, if any, for the tests administered to plaintiffs; and, iv. Copies of the extra scoring sheets, if any, for the tests administered to plaintiffs, and as further set forth in this order. (Docketed in 15cv7827, 15cv7825, 15cv7822, 15cv9581, 15cv7862, 15cv8059) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 4/25/2018) (ap)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 DECISION AND ORDER. Plaintiffs' proposed claims against the Nyack Defendants for negligent hiring, supervision and retention of defendant Kirsten Lambertson would not survive a motion to dismiss and are, therefore, futile. "Ordinarily, leave to amend may be denied on the basis of futility if the proposed claim would not withstand a Rule 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss." Summit Health, Inc. v. APS Healthcare Bethesda, Inc, 993 F. Supp.2d 379, 403 (S.D.N.Y. 2014), aff'd sub nom. APEX Employee Wellness Servs., Inc. v. APS Healthcare Bethesda, Inc., No. 14-3191, 2018 WL 672419 (2d Cir. Feb. 1, 2018). Accordingly, plaintiffs' motions for leave to file Third Amended Complaints are DENIED. So ordered. Denying (137) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED; Denying (93) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 7:15-cv-07825-CS; Denying (98) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 7:15-cv-07827-CS; Denying (91) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 7:15-cv-07867-CS; Denying (93) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 7:15-cv-08059-CS; Denying (83) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 7:15-cv-09581-CS. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 4/23/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al. (rjm)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER. Ludwigsen's "request[] that Plaintiffs be ordered to provide all of Plaintiffs' Facebook messages pursuant to the representations made at the January 10, 2018 court conference" [Dkt. 159, p.3.] is DENIED. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 4/19/18) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(yv)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER. It is hereby Ordered and Adjudged that: 1. Defendants' designated expert, Barbara Baer, Ph.D., ABPP-CN, shall produce the following documents and materials in connection with the independent psychological evaluations of plaintiffs A. Doe, E. Doe, K. Doe, M. Doe, S. Doe, and Y. Doe: i. Copies of the test questions given at the time of the evaluations; ii. Copies of the interpretative reports for the tests given at the time of the evaluations; and, iii. Copies of the extra scoring sheets for the tests given at the time of the evaluations. 2. The documents that are produced pursuant to this Order are to be used solely for the purposes of the above-captioned litigation, and shall not be shared, disclosed, or used for any purpose outside of the ordinary course of this litigation. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 4/6/18) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(yv)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER. The Court therefore declines to ratify Nyack College's belated disclosure of the 20,000 emails, and instead grants plaintiffs' request to preclude this evidence as untimely. See Rule 37(c)(1), Fed. R. Civ. P. This ruling encompasses the 190 email subset comprising emails with counsel. Having determined that the entire category of emails disclosed by Nyack College on or about January 30, 2018 is inadmissible, the Court sees no reason to address Nyack College's argument that plaintiffs have waived attorney-client and work-product privileges with respect the 190 emails. There is, however, a basis for separate consideration of the emails pertaining to the non-party witness identified by the parties as "K.L." Having reviewed the portions of that witness's December 21, 2017 deposition supplied by counsel, the Court concludes that plaintiffs' counsel essentially invited Nyack College counsel to obtain the witness's emails directly from the server. [Dkt. 156, Ex. H, transcript pp. 93-94.] Accordingly, plaintiffs cannot claim surprise concerning Nyack's subsequent acquisition of the witness's emails, and there is no basis for a claim that the disclosure of those emails a few weeks later was not timely. The emails disclosed by Nyack College in January, 2018 are PRECLUDED, except as set forth above. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 3/20/18) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(yv)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER. It is hereby Ordered and Adjudged that: 1. Defendants' designated expert, Barbara Baer, Ph.D., ABPP-CN, shall produce the tests, questionnaires or any other documents that were filled out, written or signed by plaintiffs, A. Doe, E. Doe, K. Doe, M. Doe, S, Doe, and Y. Doe, in relation to Dr. Baer's independent medical examinations; and 2. The documents that are produced pursuant to this Order are to be used solely for the purposes of the above-captioned litigation, and shall not be shared, disclosed, or used for any purpose outside of the ordinary course of this litigation. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 3/19/18) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(yv) Modified on 5/16/2018 (yv).
March 13, 2018 Filing 116 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison from Todd J. Krouner dated March 13, 2018 re: In Response to the March 2, 2018 Letter to the Court by Michael K. Burke, Esq.. Document filed by K. Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Krouner, Todd)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER in case 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED; denying without prejudice (112) Motion to Compel in case 7:15-cv-07827-CS. Because this Court lacks jurisdiction under FRCP 45 to enforce the Subpoena (absent transfer of the motion to this Court from the District Court of Nevada pursuant to Rule 45(f)), plaintiffs' motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 3/8/18) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED, 7:15-cv-07827-CS (yv)
March 8, 2018 Filing 114 DECLARATION of Todd J. Krouner in Support re: #112 FIRST MOTION to Compel Brittany Sturtevant to appear for the deposition and produce documents .. Document filed by A. Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit Letter, #4 Exhibit Emails, #5 Exhibit Transcript)(Krouner, Todd)
March 8, 2018 Filing 113 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #112 FIRST MOTION to Compel Brittany Sturtevant to appear for the deposition and produce documents . . Document filed by A. Doe. (Krouner, Todd)
March 8, 2018 Filing 112 FIRST MOTION to Compel Brittany Sturtevant to appear for the deposition and produce documents . Document filed by A. Doe. Return Date set for 3/22/2018 at 09:00 AM.(Krouner, Todd)
March 2, 2018 Filing 111 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison from Michael K. Burke dated 3/2/2018 re: Court's request for a chronological accounting of Defendant Ludwigsen's discovery demands. Document filed by Kurt Ludwigsen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Burke, Michael)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER striking (107) Letter Motion to Compel in case 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED. Matters have been addressed. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al. (Davison, Paul)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER denying as moot (100) Letter Motion to Compel in case 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED. Matter addressed by Order dated 8/23/17. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al. (Davison, Paul)
February 28, 2018 Filing 108 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison from Todd J. Krouner dated February 28, 2018 re: Further Briefing Regarding the Nyack College Defendants' Email Production. Document filed by K. Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Krouner, Todd)
February 8, 2018 Filing 107 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison from Todd J. Krouner dated February 8, 2018 re: In Response to the February 5, 2018 Letter to the Court from Michelle Bochner, Esq.. Document filed by K. Doe.Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Krouner, Todd)
January 31, 2018 Filing 106 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (137 in 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED, 93 in 7:15-cv-07825-CS, 98 in 7:15-cv-07827-CS, 91 in 7:15-cv-07867-CS, 83 in 7:15-cv-09581-CS, 93 in 7:15-cv-08059-CS) FIRST MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint . in Reply to Opposition of Defendant Kurt Ludwigsen. Document filed by K. Doe. Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Krouner, Todd)
January 31, 2018 Filing 105 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (137 in 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED, 93 in 7:15-cv-07825-CS, 98 in 7:15-cv-07827-CS, 91 in 7:15-cv-07867-CS, 83 in 7:15-cv-09581-CS, 93 in 7:15-cv-08059-CS) FIRST MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint . In Reply to Opposition of Defendants Nyack College, Michael G. Scales, David C. Jennings, Keith Davie, Karen Davie, Amanda Aikens, Taylor Brown and Kirsten Lambertson. Document filed by K. Doe. Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Krouner, Todd)
January 31, 2018 Filing 104 REPLY AFFIRMATION of Todd J. Krouner in Support re: (137 in 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED, 93 in 7:15-cv-07825-CS, 98 in 7:15-cv-07827-CS, 91 in 7:15-cv-07867-CS, 83 in 7:15-cv-09581-CS, 93 in 7:15-cv-08059-CS) FIRST MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint .. Document filed by K. Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Krouner, Todd)
January 26, 2018 Filing 103 AFFIRMATION of Michael K. Burke in Opposition re: (83 in 7:15-cv-09581-CS) FIRST MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Kurt Ludwigsen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Burke, Michael)
January 26, 2018 Filing 102 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (83 in 7:15-cv-09581-CS) FIRST MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint . . Document filed by Kurt Ludwigsen. Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Burke, Michael)
January 26, 2018 Filing 101 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #98 FIRST MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint . . Document filed by Amanda Aikens, Amanda Aikens, Taylor Brown, David C. Jennings(Individually ), David C. Jennings (As Executive Vice President of Nyack College ), Karen Davie(As Director of Human Resources and Title IX Coordinator for Nyack College), Karen Davie(Individually ), Keith Davie, Keith Davie, Kirsten Lambertson, Michael G. Scales, Nyack College, Michael G Scales, Taylor Brown. (Bochner, Michelle)
January 23, 2018 Filing 100 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (137 in 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED, 93 in 7:15-cv-07825-CS, 98 in 7:15-cv-07827-CS, 91 in 7:15-cv-07867-CS, 83 in 7:15-cv-09581-CS, 93 in 7:15-cv-08059-CS) FIRST MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint . . Document filed by K. Doe. Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Krouner, Todd)
January 23, 2018 Filing 99 DECLARATION of Todd J. Krouner in Support re: (137 in 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED, 93 in 7:15-cv-07825-CS, 98 in 7:15-cv-07827-CS, 91 in 7:15-cv-07867-CS, 83 in 7:15-cv-09581-CS, 93 in 7:15-cv-08059-CS) FIRST MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint .. Document filed by K. Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit Exhibit R)Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Krouner, Todd)
January 23, 2018 Filing 98 FIRST MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint . Document filed by K. Doe.Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Krouner, Todd)
January 23, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Todd Jay Krouner to RE-FILE Document (81 in 7:15-cv-09581-CS) FIRST MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint . (1) Use the event type Declaration in Support of Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (2) Memorandum in Support of Motion is also found under the Event Type - Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (3) First Refile Motion, then file and link any supporting documents. Refile 3 separate documents. Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(db)
January 19, 2018 Filing 97 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison from Todd J. Krouner dated January 19, 2018 re: Discovery Status Update. Document filed by K. Doe.Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Krouner, Todd)
January 19, 2018 Filing 96 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - FIRST MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint . Document filed by K. Doe. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice of Motions, #2 Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motions for Leave to File Their Third Amended Complaints, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R)Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Krouner, Todd) Modified on 1/23/2018 (db).
January 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Todd Jay Krouner to RE-FILE Document (80 in 7:15-cv-09581-CS, 95 in 7:15-cv-07827-CS, 134 in 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED, 90 in 7:15-cv-07825-CS, 88 in 7:15-cv-07867-CS, 90 in 7:15-cv-08059-CS) FIRST MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint .. ERROR(S): Supporting Documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #'s. Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(db)
January 17, 2018 Filing 95 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint . Document filed by K. Doe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Todd J. Krouner in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaints, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit Exhibit R)Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Krouner, Todd) Modified on 1/19/2018 (db).
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 THIRD AMENDED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C, 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Deposition due by 1/31/2018. Fact Discovery due by 1/31/2018 w/ exception of depo of Brittney Sturtevent. Expert Discovery due by 5/30/2018. Telephone Conference set for 2/9/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is ten days, and as further set forth in this Third Amended Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. So ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 1/10/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al. (rjm).
November 16, 2017 Filing 93 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ashley Nicole Torre on behalf of Kurt Ludwigsen. Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Torre, Ashley)
October 27, 2017 Filing 92 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Farng-Yeong Bruthina Foo on behalf of Amanda Aikens, Taylor Brown, David C. Jennings(Individually ), Keith Davie, Kirsten Lambertson, Michael G. Scales, Nyack College. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Foo, Farng-Yeong)
October 16, 2017 Filing 91 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carla Varriale on behalf of Amanda Aikens, Taylor Brown, David C. Jennings (As Executive Vice President of Nyack College ), Karen Davie(As Director of Human Resources and Title IX Coordinator for Nyack College), Keith Davie, Kirsten Lambertson, Michael G. Scales, Nyack College. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Varriale, Carla)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 SECOND AMENDED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Deposition due by 3/31/2018. Fact Discovery due by 12/31/2017. Expert Discovery due by 3/31/2018. Telephone Conference set for 11/17/2017 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 9/25/2017) (kgo)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER terminating (80) Letter Motion to Compel in case 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al. (Davison, Paul)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER re: (119 in 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Discovery in Reply to Defendant Nyack Defendants Opposition Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison from Todd J. Krouner dated 07/28/2017. filed by K. Doe, (113 in 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Discovery Concerning Nyack Colleges Confidentiality Designations addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison from Todd J. Krouner dated 07/12/2017. filed by K. Doe, (117 in 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED) Response to Motion,, filed by Karen Davie, Amanda Aikens, Taylor Brown, David C. Jennings, Keith Davie, Michael G. Scales, Kirsten Lambertson, Nyack College. Having reviewed the documents and considered the arguments of counsel, the Court rules The following documents shall not be treated as "Confidential" under the terms of Dkt. 50: Nyack-00316 through Nyack-00379, Nyack-00380 through Nyack-00389, Nyack-00669 through Nyack-00695. The following document shall continue to be treated as "Confidential" under the terms of Dkt. 50: Nyack-00696. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 8/23/17) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(yv)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER terminating (119) Motion for Discovery in case 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al. (Davison, Paul)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER terminating (113) Motion for Discovery in case 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al. (Davison, Paul)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting (120) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application Granted. Discovery hearing previously scheduled for August 9th is adjourned to Friday, August 18, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 420. (Discovery Hearing set for 8/18/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 420, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison.) in case 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 8/3/17) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al. (yv) Modified on 8/24/2017 (yv).
July 20, 2017 Filing 84 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison from Michael K. Burke dated 7/20/2017 re: Discovery disputes. Document filed by Kurt Ludwigsen.Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Burke, Michael)
July 12, 2017 Filing 83 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison from Michael K. Burke dated 7/12/2017 re: Discovery dispute. Document filed by Kurt Ludwigsen.Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Burke, Michael)
June 29, 2017 Filing 82 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison from M. Bochner dated June 29, 2017 re: (107 in 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED) FIRST LETTER MOTION to Compel Defendant Nyack College and Defendant Ludwigsen addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison from Todd J. Krouner dated 06/27/2017. . Document filed by Michael G. Scales(Individually), Michael G. Scales(As President of Nyack College ), Nyack College, Taylor Brown, Amanda Aikens, Amanda Aikens, Taylor Brown, Taylor Brown, Karen Davie(Individually), Karen Davie(as Director of Human Resources and Title IX Coordinator for Nyack College), Keith Davie, Keith Davie, David C Jennings, David C Jennings, Kirsten Lambertson, Michael G Scales, Michael G Scales, Amanda Aikens (As Assistant Atheletic Director for Nyack College ), David C. Jennings (Individually), David C. Jennings (As Executive Vice President of Nyack College ), Karen Davie(As Director of Human Resources and Title IX Coordinator for Nyack College), Karen Davie(Individually ), Keith Davie, Kirsten Lambertson, Michael G. Scales ( Individually ), Amanda Aikens (As Assistant Athletic Director for Nyack College ), David C. Jennings(Individually ), Kirsten Lambertson, Michael G Scales, Michael G. Scales(Individually ). Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Bochner, Michelle)
June 28, 2017 Filing 81 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison from Michael K. Burke dated 6/28/2017 re: Response to Plaintiffs' letter seeking a pre-motion conference to compel discovery responses. Document filed by Kurt Ludwigsen.Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Burke, Michael)
June 20, 2017 Filing 80 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison from Michael K. Burke dated 6/19/17 re: Response to Plaintiff's Letter re: Protective Order. Document filed by Kurt Ludwigsen.Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Burke, Michael)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER deferring ruling on (100) Letter Motion to Compel in case 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED. Nyack College defendants shall reply to this letter no later than 5/12/17. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al. (Davison, Paul)
March 24, 2017 Filing 78 LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Michael K. Burke dated 3/24/2017 re: Response to Plaintiff's letter dated March 10, 2017 (docket entry no. 74). Document filed by Kurt Ludwigsen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Burke, Michael)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 AMENDED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge including motions and trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Deposition due by 1/31/2018. Fact Discovery due by 10/31/2017. Expert Discovery due by 1/31/2018. No further extensions absent extraordinary circumstances. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 3/16/2017) (mml)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #74 Letter Request a stay of the March 8, 2017 Order of Magistrate Judge Davison, filed by A. Doe. ENDORSEMENT: Magistrate Judge Davison's order is stayed pending the appeal. The parties should attempt to agree on dates for opposition by Defendants and reply, if any, by Plaintiffs. They should advise the Court by March 20, 2017 as to the schedule to which they have agreed, or if they cannot agree, what the dueling proposals are. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 3/13/17) (yv)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison from Todd J. Krouner dated 3/10/17 re: request an order directing the Clerk of the Court to permit plaintiffs to substitute Exhibit A to the February 7, 2017 letter that I had filed with the Court (Doc. No. 67). ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Clerk shall strike Exhibit A to Dkt. 67 and accept a further redacted substitute for filing. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 3/10/17) (yv)
March 10, 2017 Filing 74 LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Todd J. Krouner, Esq. dated March 3, 2017 re: Request a stay of the March 8, 2017 Order of Magistrate Judge Davison. Document filed by A. Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Krouner, Todd)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER: Defendant Ludwigsen's application is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' request for reconsideration is DENIED. Plaintiffs shall produce the Frank reports and the victim impact statements - which may be deemed confidential, to the extent appropriate, in accordance with the existing protective order -- within five days. The Clerk shall close Dkt. 84. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 3/8/2017) (mml)
March 7, 2017 Filing 72 AMENDED LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Todd J. Krouner dated 03/06/2017 re: Rule 72 Letter Objecting to Order of Magistrate Judge Pursuant to Rule 72. Document filed by A. Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Minute Entry, #2 Exhibit B - 02/27/17 Letter, #3 Exhibit C - 03/03/17 Letter)(Krouner, Todd)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (86 in 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED) Letter request for a pre-motion conference to quash subpoenas, filed by K. Doe. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will schedule a conference during the previously - scheduled telephone conference on 3/8/17. Subpoenas to Verizon are STAYED in the interim. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 3/6/17) (yv)
March 3, 2017 Filing 70 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison from Michael K. Burke dated 03/03/2017 re: Response to Plaintiffs' letter dated February 27, 2017. Document filed by Kurt Ludwigsen.Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Burke, Michael)
February 21, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison: Discovery Hearing held on 2/21/2017. Plaintiffs' depositions are extended to ten (10) hours each; M. Doe's deposition shall be continued for up to three (3) additional hours. Ruling issued on record re: defendant Ludwigsen's discovery demand for certain documents provided to the criminal court. Court RESERVED on Ludwigsen's demand for Phyllis Frank's informal report, pending additional briefing: Plaintiffs' responsive letter due 2/27/17; defendant Ludwigsen's reply due 3/3/17. The telephone conference previously scheduled for February 27, 2017 at 11:00 am is ADJOURNED to March 8, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Courtflow) Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(ld)
February 8, 2017 Filing 69 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (67 in 7:15-cv-07827-CS) Letter filed by A. Doe. ENDORSEMENT: Counsel shall appear for a conference on February 21, 2017, at 2:30 p.m., in Courtroom 420, for the purpose of establishing ground rules for depositions. Any written reply to Mr. Krouner's letter is due by February 16, 2017. In the event of any further disputes which arise during a deposition and which cannot be resolved among counsel, counsel are directed to telephone chambers to seek a ruling so the deposition can proceed. (Conference set for 2/21/2017 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 2/8/2017) (mml)
February 8, 2017 Filing 68 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison from Michael K. Burke dated 2/8/2017 re: Response to Plaintiff's letter dated 2/8/2017. Document filed by Kurt Ludwigsen. (Attachments: #1 Supplement 2nd Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff, #2 Supplement 2nd Request for Documents to Plaintiff)Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Burke, Michael)
February 8, 2017 Filing 67 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison from Todd J. Krouner, Esq. dated February 8, 2017 re: seek a Protective Order. Document filed by A. Doe.(Krouner, Todd)
December 16, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison: Telephone Conference held on 12/16/2016. Telephone conference scheduled for January 13, 2017 at 4:00 p.m. Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(ld)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER: 1. Defendants withdraw their objections to plaintiffs having filed their complaints using pseudonyms, and consent to the filing of such complaints using pseudonyms, nunc pro tunc, effective as of the dates of the initial filing of the respective complaints. 2. Except as otherwise provided herein, Defendants consent to the use of pseudonyms for plaintiffs' true names, throughout discovery, up to the time of trial. At time of trial the true identities of the plaintiffs will be revealed and any captions, pleadings and related documents that will be presented to the jury will identify each individual plaintiff. ENDORSEMENT: ADDENDUM ORDER: This Addendum Order is an integral part of the STIPULATION AND ORDER entered today in the captioned cases. Notwithstanding any other provision of the STIPULATION AND ORDER, no document may be filed under seal with the Clerk of the Court without a further Order of this Court entered upon an application addressed to the specific document(s) sought to be sealed. Any such application must include a showing that the standards for sealing have been met. See Lugosch v. Pvramid Co. of Onondaga, 435 F.3d 110, 119-20 (2d Cir. 2006). Any party that wishes to file a motion or other pleading containing information deemed confidential under the terms of the STIPULATION AND ORDER shall file a redacted pleading with the Clerk and submit the unredacted pleading directly to the Court along with the sealing application described in the preceding paragraph. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 11/17/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al. (See STIPULATION AND ORDER AS SET FORTH) (lnl)
October 27, 2016 Filing 65 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (76 in 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED) FIRST LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison from Todd J. Krouner dated 10/27/2016 re: Request for a two week extension of the briefing schedule. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 10/27/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al. (lnl)
September 29, 2016 Filing 64 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (73 in 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED) Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison from Todd J. Krouner, Esq. dated September 29, 2016 re: Request for an Adjournment. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 9/29/2016) (mml)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (59 in 7:15-cv-07867-CS, 71 in 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED, 52 in 7:15-cv-09581-CS, 62 in 7:15-cv-07827-CS, 62 in 7:15-cv-07825-CS, 62 in 7:15-cv-08059-CS) LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison from Michael K. Burke and Michelle L. Bochner dated 9/21/2016 re: Joint request for pre-motion conference. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff's counsel shall reply to this letter by October 3, 2016. Counsel shall appear for a case management conference on October 18, 2016 at 2:30 p.m. and should be prepared to discuss this issue at that time. SO ORDERED. (Case Management Conference set for 10/18/2016 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 9/25/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al. (lnl)
September 21, 2016 Filing 62 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison from Michael K. Burke and Michelle L. Bochner dated 9/21/2016 re: Joint request for pre-motion conference. Document filed by Amanda Aikens (Individually), Taylor Brown, David C. Jennings (As Executive Vice President of Nyack College ), Karen Davie(Individually ), Keith Davie, Kirsten Lambertson, Kurt Ludwigsen, Michael G. Scales(As President of Nyack College ), Nyack College.Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS-PED et al.(Burke, Michael)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. The parties must complete their initial disclosures under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) by 9/30/2016. Plaintiffs must produce HIPAA authorizations for mental health records, to the extent that they exist, by 9/30/2016. Deposition due by 3/31/2017. Fact Discovery due by 3/31/2017. Plaintiffs' mental health independent medical examinations must be completed by 5/1/2017. Plaintiffs' expert disclosure must be made by 4/14/2017. Defendants' expert disclosure must be made by 5/15/2017. Expert Discovery due by 6/30/2017. Defendants anticipate expert testimony concerning the followingissue(s): liability and damages. Next Pretrial Conference set for 7/12/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Cathy Seibel. Pre-motion letters due 6/28/2017. Opposition letters due 7/7/2017. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 8/31/16) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS et al.(yv)
August 19, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison: Settlement Conference held on 8/19/2016. Case did not settle. Reference concluded. (Court Reporter Courtflow) Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS et al.(ld)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison from Michael K. Burke dated 8/16/2016 re: I am requesting an Order from the Court that Mr. Krouner provide me with the memorandum and exhibits that he has served co-defendants' counsel so that I can be adequately prepared for the settlement conference and respond to any questions the Court may have. ENDORSEMENT: Denied. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 8/16/2016) (rj)
July 1, 2016 Filing 59 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison from Jessica Yanefski, dated 6/30/2016, re: Counsel writes to request an adjournment of the settlement conference before this Court, which is currently scheduled for Wednesday, July 6, 2016, at 2:30 p.m., to a date during the week of August 15, 2016. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. 8/19/16 at 2:30 p.m. (Settlement Conference set for 8/19/2016 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 6/30/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS et al.(lnl)
June 23, 2016 Filing 58 ANSWER to #56 Crossclaim. Document filed by Amanda Aikens, Taylor Brown, David C. Jennings(Individually ), Karen Davie(As Director of Human Resources and Title IX Coordinator for Nyack College), Keith Davie, Kirsten Lambertson, Michael G. Scales, Nyack College. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bochner, Michelle)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY PARTIAL DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Defendant Kurt Ludwigsen, by his attorneys, Burke, Miele & Golden, LLP, hereby gives notice that (i) the two counterclaims in the above-captioned action are voluntarily dismissed against Plaintiff A. Doe and (ii) the first crossclaim in the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed against Defendant Nyack College. The second crossclaim against Nyack College remains in above-captioned action. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 6/17/16) (yv)
June 17, 2016 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney Michael Burke to E-MAIL Document No. #55 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal to wpclerk@nysd.uscourts.gov with handwritten signatures. This document is not filed via ECF. (jk)
June 16, 2016 Filing 56 ANSWER to #42 Amended Complaint,,., CROSSCLAIM against Nyack College. Document filed by Kurt Ludwigsen.(Burke, Michael)
June 16, 2016 Filing 55 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) A. Doe, Nyack College. Document filed by Kurt Ludwigsen. (Burke, Michael) Modified on 6/17/2016 (jk).
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison from Michael K. Burke dated 5/31/2016 re: Counsel request an adjournment of the settlement conference currently scheduled for June 27, 2016 until July 6, 2016 at 2:30 pm. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. ( Settlement Conference set for 7/6/2016 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 5/31/2016) (rj)
May 27, 2016 Filing 53 ANSWER to #43 Amended Complaint,,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Amanda Aikens, Taylor Brown, David C. Jennings(Individually ), Karen Davie(As Director of Human Resources and Title IX Coordinator for Nyack College), Keith Davie, Kirsten Lambertson, Michael G. Scales, Nyack College. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bochner, Michelle)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 5/24/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS et al. (lnl)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF CONFIDENTIALITY....regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 5/18/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS et al. (See STIPULATION AND ORDER as set forth) (lnl)
May 18, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Seibel: Pre-Motion Conference held on 5/18/2016. Case is referred to Magistrate Judge Davison for settlement. Amend or withdraw counterclaims by 6/17/16. Motion(s) to dismiss counterclaims and cross-claims 7/15/16; opposition 8/19/16; reply 9/2/16. College to Answer complaint, but not cross-claim. College motion to dismiss plaintiff's claims on schedule set earlier. See transcript. (Court Reporter Albi Gorn) Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS et al.(aca)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned parties, thatthe time for defendants, KIRSTEN LAMBERTSON, MICHAEL G. SCALES, DAVID C. JENNINGS, KEITH DAVIE, KAREN DAVIE, AMANDA AIKENS, TAYLOR BROWN AND NYACK COLLEGE, to appear and answer, move or otherwise act with regard to the Plaintiff's Second amended complaint, is extended up to and including May 27, 2016. SO ORDERED. Amanda Aikens answer due 5/27/2016; David C. Jennings (Individually) answer due 5/27/2016; David C. Jennings (As Executive Vice President of Nyack College) answer due 5/27/2016; Karen Davie (As Director of Human Resources and Title IX Coordinator for Nyack College) answer due 5/27/2016; Karen Davie (Individually) answer due 5/27/2016; Keith Davie answer due 5/27/2016; Kirsten Lambertson answer due 5/27/2016; Michael G. Scales answer due 5/27/2016; Nyack College answer due 5/27/2016; Taylor Brown answer due 5/27/2016. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 5/13/2016) (mml)
May 11, 2016 Filing 49 LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Michael K. Burke dated 05/11/2016 re: Opposition to Defendant Nyack College's proposed motion to dismiss. Document filed by Kurt Ludwigsen.Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS et al.(Burke, Michael)
April 29, 2016 Filing 48 LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Michael K. Burke dated 04/29/2016 re: Opposition to Plaintiffs' proposed motion to dismiss. Document filed by Kurt Ludwigsen.Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS et al.(Burke, Michael)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting (45) Letter Motion for Conference: This matter will be discussed at the already scheduled pre-motion conference on 5/18/16 at 2:45 pm. Defendant Ludwigsen shall state his position, by letter of no more than three pages, by 5/11/16.All counsel in these consolidated cases are reminded that all documents must be filed in the lead case (15-CV-7822) and may be simultaneously filed in some or all of the member cases by using the "Spread Text and Effects" function. See ECF Rule 13.19. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS et al. (Seibel, Cathy)
April 28, 2016 Filing 46 ANSWER to #43 Amended Complaint,,,., CROSSCLAIM against Nyack College., COUNTERCLAIM against A. Doe. Document filed by Kurt Ludwigsen.(Burke, Michael)
April 26, 2016 Filing 45 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference currently scheduled for May 6, 2016, addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Jessica Yanefski dated April 26, 2016. Document filed by K. Doe, Y. Doe, M Doe, E. Doe, A. Doe, S. Doe.Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS et al.(Yanefski, Jessica)
April 20, 2016 Filing 44 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion Conference) addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Todd J. Krouner dated April 20, 2016. Document filed by K. Doe, Y. Doe, M Doe, E. Doe, A. Doe, S. Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Uniform Sentencing and Commitment Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - October 3, 2015 Daily News Article)Filed In Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS et al.(Krouner, Todd)
April 14, 2016 Filing 43 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #42 Amended Complaint,, against Amanda Aikens (Individually), Amanda Aikens (As Assistant Athletic Director for Nyack College), Taylor Brown (Individually), David C. Jennings(Individually ), David C. Jennings (As Executive Vice President of Nyack College ), Keith Davie (Individually), Does, Keith Davie (As Athletic Director for Nyack College), Kirsten Lambertson, Kurt Ludwigsen, Michael G. Scales(Individually), Nyack College, Michael G Scales(As President of Nyack College), Taylor Brown (As Assistant Softball Coach for Nyack College), Karen Davie (Individually), Karen Davie (As Director of Human Resources and Title IX Coordinator for Nyack College) with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by A. Doe. Related document: #42 Amended Complaint,, filed by A. Doe.(Yanefski, Jessica) Modified on 4/15/2016 (vf).
April 13, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jessica Yanefski to RE-FILE re: Document No. #42 Second Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading (Karen Davie) were not entered on CM ECF; not all the party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. Re-file the pleading using the event type Second Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
April 13, 2016 Filing 42 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #14 Amended Complaint, against Amanda Aikens, Amanda Aikens, Taylor Brown, David C. Jennings(Individually ), David C. Jennings (As Executive Vice President of Nyack College ), Keith Davie, Does, Keith Davie, Kirsten Lambertson, Kurt Ludwigsen, Michael G. Scales, Nyack College, Michael G Scales, Taylor Brown with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by A. Doe. Related document: #14 Amended Complaint, filed by A. Doe.(Yanefski, Jessica) Modified on 4/14/2016 (vf).
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION, (A. Doe answer due 4/25/2016). IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED as follows: 1. Defendant hereby withdraws his Second Affirmative Defense and his Third Affirmative Defense in each of the above-captioned actions; and 2. Plaintiffs' deadline to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Counterclaims is extended through and including April 25, 2016. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 3/25/16) (yv) Modified on 4/21/2016 (yv).
March 4, 2016 Filing 40 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint,., CROSSCLAIM against Nyack College., COUNTERCLAIM against A. Doe. Document filed by Kurt Ludwigsen.(Burke, Michael)
March 4, 2016 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Kennedy Burke on behalf of Kurt Ludwigsen. (Burke, Michael)
February 3, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Seibel: CASE ASSOCIATED: Create association to 7:15-cv-07822-CS... (Court Reporter Angela O'Donnell) (aca)
February 3, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Seibel: Pre-Motion Conference held on 2/3/2016. The Court consolidates this lead case (15-cv-7822 (CS)) with 15-cv-7827 (CS), 15-cv-7825 (CS), 15-cv-7867 (CS), 15-cv-9581 (CS), and 15-cv-8059 (CS) for discovery. Defendant Ludwigsen's time to Answer is extended to 3/4/2016. File amended complaints by 4/15/16. Motions to dismiss to be served by 6/1/16; opposition 7/15/16; reply 8/1/16. See transcript. (Court Reporter Angela O'Donnell) Associated Cases: 7:15-cv-07822-CS et al.(aca)
January 28, 2016 Filing 38 FIRST PRE-CONFERENCE STATEMENT in advance of February 3, 2016 conference. Document filed by A. Doe.(Krouner, Todd)
January 28, 2016 Filing 37 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,. Kurt Ludwigsen served on 1/6/2016, answer due 1/27/2016. Service was accepted by "JOHN DOE" (Defendant's Father). Document filed by A. Doe. (Yanefski, Jessica)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #35 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File motion to dismiss addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Michelle Bochner dated January 21, 2016. filed by Amanda Aikens, Michael G. Scales, David C. Jennings, Taylor Brown, Keith Davie, Kirsten Lambertson, Nyack College. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiffs shall state their positions, by letter of no more than three pages, by 1/28/16. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to docket this endorsement in all six (6) cases in the caption below. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 1/21/16) (yv)
January 21, 2016 Filing 35 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File motion to dismiss addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Michelle Bochner dated January 21, 2016. Document filed by Amanda Aikens, David C. Jennings(Individually ), Keith Davie, Kirsten Lambertson, Michael G. Scales, Nyack College, Taylor Brown.(Bochner, Michelle)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #32 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference (Pre-Motion Conference set for 2/3/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Cathy Seibel.) ENDORSEMENT: 1/28/16 conference adjourned to 2/3/16 at 10 AM. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to docket this order in each of the six (6) cases listed above. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 1/20/16) (yv)
January 20, 2016 Filing 32 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Jessica Yanefski dated January 20, 2016. Document filed by A. Doe.(Yanefski, Jessica)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #30 Letter Motion for Conference (Pre-Motion Conference set for 1/28/2016 at 03:45 PM before Judge Cathy Seibel.) ENDORSEMENT: Pre-motion conference to be held on 1/28/16 at 3:45 pm. Opposing parties are to state their position, by letter of no more than three pages, one week in advance. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to docket this endorsement in each of the six cases in the caption. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 1/15/16) (yv)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #30 LETTER MOTION for Conference pre-motion conference addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Michelle Bochner dated January 13, 2016. filed by Amanda Aikens, Michael G. Scales, Taylor Brown, David C. Jennings, Keith Davie, Kirsten Lambertson, Nyack College, (Pre-Motion Conference set for 1/28/2016 at 03:45 PM before Judge Cathy Seibel.) ENDORSEMENT: Pre-Motion Conference to be held on: 1/28/2016 at 03:45 PM. Opposing counsel to state position (by letter not to exceed 3 pages) in writing one week in advance. Under Section 2A of my Individual Practices, the request for pre-motion conference stops the time to move or answer. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to docket this endorsement, and terminate the corresponding motion in each of the 6 captioned cases. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 1/13/16) (yv)
January 13, 2016 Filing 30 LETTER MOTION for Conference pre-motion conference addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Michelle Bochner dated January 13, 2016. Document filed by Amanda Aikens, Taylor Brown, David C. Jennings (As Executive Vice President of Nyack College ), Keith Davie, Kirsten Lambertson, Michael G. Scales, Nyack College.(Bochner, Michelle)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned parties, that the time for defendants, to appear and answer, move or otherwise act with regard to the plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, is extended up to and including January 21, 2016. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED, that the defendants agree to waive the affirmative defense of personal jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that a facsimile copy of this Stipulation may be accepted by the Court as if it were an original, and may be filed with the Court without further notice. So Ordered. (Amanda Aikens answer due 1/21/2016; Amanda Aikens answer due 1/21/2016; Taylor Brown answer due 1/21/2016; David C. Jennings(Individually) answer due 1/21/2016; David C. Jennings (As Executive Vice President of Nyack College) answer due 1/21/2016; Keith Davie answer due 1/21/2016; Does answer due 1/21/2016; Keith Davie answer due 1/21/2016; Kirsten Lambertson answer due 1/21/2016; Kurt Ludwigsen answer due 1/21/2016; Michael G. Scales answer due 1/21/2016; Nyack College answer due 1/21/2016; Michael G Scales answer due 1/21/2016; Taylor Brown answer due 1/21/2016.) (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 12/30/15) (yv)
December 23, 2015 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kurt Ludwigsen. (vf)
December 23, 2015 Filing 27 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kurt Ludwigsen, re: #14 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by A. Doe. (Yanefski, Jessica)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned parties, that the time for defendants, to appear and answer, move or otherwise act with regard to the plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, is extended up to and including January 4, 2016. So Ordered. As further set forth in this Sitpulation. (Amanda Aikens answer due 1/4/2016; Amanda Aikens answer due 1/4/2016; Taylor Brown answer due 1/4/2016; David C. Jennings (Individually) answer due 1/4/2016; David C. Jennings (As Executive Vice President of Nyack College) answer due 1/4/2016; Keith Davie answer due 1/4/2016; Keith Davie answer due 1/4/2016; Kirsten Lambertson answer due 1/4/2016; Kurt Ludwigsen answer due 1/4/2016; Michael G. Scales answer due 1/4/2016; Nyack College answer due 1/4/2016; Michael G Scales answer due 1/4/2016; Taylor Brown answer due 1/4/2016.) (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 11/25/15) (yv) Modified on 11/25/2015 (yv).
November 24, 2015 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Todd Jay Krouner on behalf of A. Doe. (Krouner, Todd)
November 24, 2015 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michelle L Bochner on behalf of Amanda Aikens, David C. Jennings(Individually ), Keith Davie, Kirsten Lambertson, Michael G. Scales, Nyack College, Taylor Brown. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bochner, Michelle)
November 17, 2015 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Amanda Aikens served on 10/29/2015, answer due 11/19/2015; Amanda Aikens served on 10/29/2015, answer due 11/19/2015; Taylor Brown served on 10/29/2015, answer due 11/19/2015; David C. Jennings(Individually ) served on 10/29/2015, answer due 11/19/2015; David C. Jennings (As Executive Vice President of Nyack College ) served on 10/29/2015, answer due 11/19/2015; Keith Davie served on 10/29/2015, answer due 11/19/2015; Keith Davie served on 10/29/2015, answer due 11/19/2015; Kirsten Lambertson served on 10/29/2015, answer due 11/19/2015; Michael G. Scales served on 10/29/2015, answer due 11/19/2015; Nyack College served on 10/29/2015, answer due 11/19/2015; Michael G Scales served on 10/29/2015, answer due 11/19/2015; Taylor Brown served on 10/29/2015, answer due 11/19/2015. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by A. Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Amended Complaint upon Amanda Aikens, #2 Exhibit Summons and Amended Complaint upon Taylor Brown, #3 Exhibit Summons and Amended Complaint Upon Keith Davie, #4 Exhibit Summons and Amended Complaint Upon David C. Jennings, #5 Exhibit Summons and Amended Complaint Upon Kirsten Lambertson, #6 Exhibit Summons and Amended Complaint Upon Nyack College, #7 Exhibit Summons and Amended Complaint Upon Michael G. Scales)(Yanefski, Jessica)
October 27, 2015 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Taylor Brown. (vf)
October 27, 2015 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney to RE-FILE Document No. #17 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons, #16 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons, #18 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons, #19 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons, #15 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons, #20 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Summons previously issued. (vf)
October 27, 2015 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Taylor Brown, re: #14 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by A. Doe. (Yanefski, Jessica)
October 27, 2015 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Michael Scales, re: #14 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by A. Doe. (Yanefski, Jessica)
October 27, 2015 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Nyack College, re: #14 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by A. Doe. (Yanefski, Jessica)
October 27, 2015 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Kirsten Lambertson, re: #14 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by A. Doe. (Yanefski, Jessica)
October 27, 2015 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to David Jennings, re: #14 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by A. Doe. (Yanefski, Jessica)
October 27, 2015 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Keith Davie, re: #14 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by A. Doe. (Yanefski, Jessica)
October 27, 2015 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Amanda Aikens, re: #14 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by A. Doe. (Yanefski, Jessica)
October 27, 2015 Filing 14 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #4 Complaint, against Amanda Aikens, Amanda Aikens, David C. Jennings(Individually ), David C. Jennings (As Executive Vice President of Nyack College ), Keith Davie, Keith Davie, Kirsten Lambertson, Kurt Ludwigsen, Michael G. Scales, Nyack College, Michael G Scales, Taylor Brown, Does 1-10 with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by A. Doe. Related document: #4 Complaint, filed by A. Doe.(Yanefski, Jessica)
October 20, 2015 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Scales, re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by A. Doe. (Yanefski, Jessica)
October 20, 2015 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nyack College, re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by A. Doe. (Yanefski, Jessica)
October 20, 2015 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kirsten Lambertson, re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by A. Doe. (Yanefski, Jessica)
October 20, 2015 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Jennings, re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by A. Doe. (Yanefski, Jessica)
October 20, 2015 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Keith Davie, re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by A. Doe. (Yanefski, Jessica)
October 20, 2015 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amanda Aikens, re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by A. Doe. (Yanefski, Jessica)
October 6, 2015 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Cathy Seibel. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
October 6, 2015 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. (wb)
October 6, 2015 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 7:15-cv-07822-CS. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
October 5, 2015 Filing 6 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 7:15-cv-07822. Document filed by A. Doe.(Yanefski, Jessica)
October 5, 2015 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Yanefski, Jessica)
October 5, 2015 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Amanda Aikens, Amanda Aikens, David C. Jennings(Individually ), David C. Jennings (As Executive Vice President of Nyack College ), Keith Davie, Keith Davie, Kirsten Lambertson, Kurt Ludwigsen, Michael G. Scales, Nyack College, Michael G Scales. Document filed by A. Doe.(Yanefski, Jessica)
October 2, 2015 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amanda Aikens, Amanda Aikens, David C. Jennings(Individually ), David C. Jennings (As Executive Vice President of Nyack College ), Keith Davie, Keith Davie, Kirsten Lambertson, Michael G. Scales, Nyack College, Michael G Scales. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(sj)
October 2, 2015 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jessica Yanefski. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Kurt Ludwigsen, Kirsten Lambertson, Michael G. Scales Keith Davie, Amanda Aikens, David C. Jennings. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf)
October 2, 2015 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jessica Yanefski to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the civil cover sheet was not signed by the filing user. (vf)
October 2, 2015 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jessica Yanefski to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by the filing user. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
October 2, 2015 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (vf)
October 2, 2015 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
October 2, 2015 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Cathy Seibel as possibly related to 15-cv-7822. (vf)
October 2, 2015 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Jessica Yanefski to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the related case statement was not signed by the filing user. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
October 2, 2015 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 7:15-cv-07822. Document filed by A Doe.(Yanefski, Jessica) Modified on 10/5/2015 (vf).
October 2, 2015 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Yanefski, Jessica) Modified on 10/5/2015 (vf).
October 2, 2015 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against Amanda Aikens, Keith Davie, David C Jennings, Kirsten Lambertson, Kurt Ludwigsen, Nyack College, Michael G Scales. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-11464824)Document filed by A Doe.(Yanefski, Jessica) Modified on 10/5/2015 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Ludwigsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. Doe
Represented By: Todd Jay Krouner
Represented By: Jessica Yanefski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Ludwigsen
Represented By: Michael Kennedy Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirsten Lambertson
Represented By: Carla M. Varriale-Barker
Represented By: Farng-Yeong Bruthina Foo
Represented By: Michelle L Bochner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael G Scales
Represented By: Michelle L Bochner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Davie
Represented By: Carla M. Varriale-Barker
Represented By: Farng-Yeong Bruthina Foo
Represented By: Michelle L Bochner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Aikens
Represented By: Farng-Yeong Bruthina Foo
Represented By: Michelle L Bochner
Represented By: Carla M. Varriale-Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nyack College
Represented By: Michelle L Bochner
Represented By: Carla M. Varriale-Barker
Represented By: Farng-Yeong Bruthina Foo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael G. Scales
Represented By: Carla M. Varriale-Barker
Represented By: Farng-Yeong Bruthina Foo
Represented By: Michelle L Bochner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David C. Jennings
Represented By: Carla M. Varriale-Barker
Represented By: Michelle L Bochner
Represented By: Farng-Yeong Bruthina Foo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Brown
Represented By: Carla M. Varriale-Barker
Represented By: Farng-Yeong Bruthina Foo
Represented By: Michelle L Bochner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Davie
Represented By: Carla M. Varriale-Barker
Represented By: Michelle L Bochner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?