Elavon, Inc. v. Northeast Advance Technologies Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Elavon, Inc.
Defendant: Northeast Advance Technologies Inc., Esteban Castillo, John Does and ABC Companies
Case Number: 7:2015cv07985
Filed: October 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: White Plains Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M. Karas
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 564 ORDER granting 563 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 8/9/22) (yv)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 547 NOTICE OF TELECONFERENCE INFORMATION: For the week of May 16, 2022, the Court will hold all civil conferences, hearings, and/or oral arguments in the above-captioned matter by telephone. Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time : Meeting Dial-In Number (USA toll-free): (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 7702195 Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign (#). Given that much of the Court is operating remotely and has limited mail capability, counsel involv ed in any pro se cases shall mail a copy of this Notice to or otherwise inform the pro se party of the above teleconference information. Counsel in any pro se inmate cases shall ensure that the pro se party is on the line before calling the above-re ferenced number.For initial conferences, counsel shall submit a proposed case management and discovery schedule via ECF by 5 p.m. on the evening before the initial conference. Any requests for adjournments should be filed as soon as possible and clearly explain why the conference should be adjourned. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 5/13/2022) (ama)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 544 ORDER denying 474 Motion to Stay re: 474 LETTER MOTION to Stay re: 473 Order,, addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Steven Y. Yurowitz dated 10/21/2021. Accordingly, the Friedman Defendants' motion is DENIED. The Clerk is respectfully directed to te1minate the motion (Dkt. 494). SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 4/20/2022) (ks)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER granting 481 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/1/21) (yv)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER: The Court has now reviewed the emails chains in camera, Plaintiffs motion to compel production of unredacted versions of the emails is GRANTED, substantially for the reasons set forth in this Court's Memorandum and Order dated Decembe r 20, 2020, which addressed related privilege claims advanced by the Friedman defendants. [Dkt. 408.] Transmedia shall produce the unredacted email chains within five business days of this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 10/14/2021) (ks)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORDER granting 464 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Granted. The 10/12/21 conference is moved to 12/20/21, at 10:00. This, however, is the lastextension of any kind. Not one more day will begranted. So Ordered. Status Conference set for 12/20/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/27/2021) (vfr)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 461 SCHEDULING ORDER granting 457 Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference. The Court has scheduled a conference to address the motion filed at doc #457 for 9/30/2021 at 10 am before Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison. Counsel will be provided with a Teams link for the video portion of the conference. In addition, on a separate phone line counsel should call 877-336-1839 and use access code 5999739. Members of the press and public may call the same number, but will not be permitted to speak during the conference. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 9/21/2021) Telephone Conference set for 9/30/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison. (ks)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 447 SCHEDULING ORDER granting 446 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The in person conference scheduled for July 22, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. before the Hon. Paul E. Davison, U.S.M.J., is changed to a video/telephone conference on the same date and time. All parties will call in to 877-336-1839 and use access code 5999739. In addition, a video link on the Teams platform will also be provided to counsel. Any other party wishing to join the video link should contact chambers at 914-390-4250. All parties who will not be speaking should mute their telephones. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 7/22/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 7/19/2021) (kv)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record at the Oral Argument on June 30, 2021, the Court overrules the Freidman Defendants objections and adopts Magistrate Judge Davison's Memorandum and Order dated December 10, 2020 in its entirety. (Dkt. No. 408.) The Court lifts the current stay so that discovery may proceed consistent with this Order. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 6/30/2021) (cf)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 441 ORDER: For the week of June 28, 2021, the Court will hold all civil conferences, hearings, and/or oral arguments by telephone. Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time: Meeting Dial-In Number (USA toll-free): (888) 363-4749 Acce ss Code: 7702195 Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign (#). Given that much of the Court is operating remotely and has limited mail capability, counsel involved in any pro se cases shall mail a copy of this Notice to or ot herwise inform the pro se party of the above teleconference information. Counsel in any pro se inmate cases shall ensure that the pro se party is on the line before calling the above-referenced number. For initial conferences, counsel shall submit a proposed case management and discovery schedule via ECF by 5 p.m. on the evening before the initial conference. Any requests for adjournments should be filed as soon as possible and clearly explain why the conference should be adjourned. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 6/25/2021) (nb)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER DIRECTING NON-PARTIES JERUSALEM SHROUDS LLC AND THE PILLARSTONE GROUP, INC. TO COMPLY WITH SUBPOENAS granting 439 Letter Motion to Compel. it is hereby ORDERED that Elavon's Application is GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that, w ithin 14 days of service of this Order together with a copy of the Subpoena served upon Jernsalem Shrouds earlier, Jernsalem Shrouds shall contact, or shall direct its counsel to confer with, Elavon's counsel concerning its compliance with the S ubpoena; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that, within 14 days of service of this Order together with a copy of the Subpoena served upon Pillarstone earlier, Pillarstone shall contact, or shall direct its counsel to confer with, Elavon's counsel concer ning its compliance with the Subpoena; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that service of this Order shall be made by personal service upon any principal, agent (other than the New York Secretary of State) or owner of Jerusalem Shrouds and Pillarstone. Clerk shall close Dkt. #439. IT IS SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 6/17/2021) (kv)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 438 CALENDAR NOTICE, Please take notice that the above captioned action has been scheduled for oral argument on the Objections to Magistrate Davison's MEMORANDUM AND ORDER before the Honorable Kenneth M. Karas, United States District Judge, on Wedn esday June 30, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. NOTICE OF TELECONFERENCE INFORMATION: Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time: Meeting Dial-In Number (USA toll-free): (888) 363-4749, Access Code: 7702195. Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign(#). So Ordered. ( Telephone Conference set for 6/30/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 6/9/21) (yv)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER granting 414 Letter Motion to Stay re: 414 LETTER MOTION to Stay re: 413 Brief in Support of Objections addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Meyer Y. Silber dated December 24, 2020. The Court grants the stay pending the determination of the Friedmans' Objections. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 4/22/21) (yv)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER denying 363 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. For the reasons stated on the record at the Oral Argument on February 9, 2021, the Court denies Plaintiff's Motion To Disqualify. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to terminate the pending Motion. (Dkt. No. 363.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 2/9/2021) (jca)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 422 NOTICE OF TELECONFERENCE INFORMATION: For the week of February 8, 2021, the Court will hold all civil conferences, hearings, and/or oral arguments by telephone. Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time: Meeting Dial-In Number (USA toll-free): (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 7702195 Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign (#). Given that much of the Court is operating remotely and has limited mail capability, counsel involved in any pro se cases shal l mail a copy of this Notice to or otherwise inform the pro se party of the above teleconference information. Counsel in any pro se inmate cases shall ensure that the pro se party is on the line before calling the above-referenced number. For init ial conferences, counsel shall submit a proposed case management and discovery schedule via ECF by 5 p.m. on the evening before the initial conference. Any requests for adjournments should be filed as soon as possible and clearly explain why the conference should be adjourned. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 2/5/2021) (jca)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER: For the week of January 18, 2021, the Court will hold all civil conferences, hearings, and/or oral arguments by telephone. Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time: Meeting Dial-In Number (USA toll-free): (888) 363-474 9 Access Code: 7702195 Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign (#). Given that much of the Court is operating remotely and has limited mail capability, counsel involved in any pro se cases shall mail a copy of this Notice to or otherwise inform the pro se party of the above teleconference information. Counsel in any pro se inmate cases shall ensure that the pro se party is on the line before calling the above-referenced number. For initial conferences, counsel shal l submit a proposed case management and discovery schedule via ECF by 5 p.m. on the evening before the initial conference. Any requests for adjournments should be filed as soon as possible and clearly explain why the conference should be adjourned. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 1/15/2021) (jca)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 408 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 393 Motion for Protective Order. ; granting in part and denying in part 393 Motion to Compel. The Friedmans' motions are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as set forth above. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at Docket No. 393. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 12/10/2020) (va)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 406 CALENDAR NOTICE: Please take notice that the above captioned action has been scheduled for oral argument on the pending Motion to Disqualify before the Honorable Kenneth M. Karas, United States District Judge, on Wednesday, January 20, 2021 at 2:0 0 p.m. NOTICE OF TELECONFERENCE INFORMATION: The Court will hold all civil conferences, hearings, and/or oral arguments by telephone. Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time: Meeting Dial-In Number (USA toll-free): (888) 36 3-4749 Access Code: 7702195 Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign(#). Given that much of the Court is operating remotely and has limited mail capability, counsel involved in any pro se cases shall mail a copy of this No tice to or otherwise inform the pro se party of the above teleconference information. Counsel in any pro se inmate cases shall ensure that the pro se party is on the line before calling the above-referenced number. Any requests for adjournments s hould be filed as soon as possible and clearly explain why the conference should be adjourned. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 1/20/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/7/2020) (jca)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER DIRECTING NON-PARTY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S SUBPOENA FOR DOCUMENTS AND TESTIMONY: it is hereby ORDERED that Elavon's Application is GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that, within 14 days of service of this Order, BANA shall direct its counsel to confer with Elavon's counsel concerning its response to the Subpoena or show cause, in writing, why Elavon's subpoena should not be so enforced; and it is FURTHERE ORDERED that service of this Order shall be made by mailing a copy hereof to BANA's registered agent and by hand delivery to any BANA brance office. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 7/16/2020) (ks)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER granting 349 Letter Motion to Seal. ECF Doc. No. 345-3 shall be sealed. Counsel should supply an unredacted copy to chambers. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 7/9/2020) (cf)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER: Beginning March 30, 2020, until further notice, all parties to civil conferences before Judge Davison shall attend by phone, using the following information: Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1839 Access Code: 5999739 The parties should call in f rom a landline and announce their names before speaking. For Settlement Conferences: Clients should NOT be on the conference call. Counsel must have ready telephonic access to clients. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 4/10/2020) (ks)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER denying 292 MOTION for Reargument re: 291 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document. Denied. Plaintiff raises nothing new in its Motion for Reargument, and Plaintiff's original motions for reconsideration and to amend have already been decided by the Court. Plaintiff must submit its Third Amended Complaint by no later than January 20, 2020 and must include all claims it intends to bring therein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/18/2019) (jca)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 OPINION & ORDER re: 123 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. filed by Hava Reichman, 129 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by D-Tech Management Company, Esteban Castillo, Joshua Brach, Northeast Advan ce Technologies Inc., Samuel Brach, 119 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Dovid Kaplan, Joseph Rubin, Joshua Weider, Moshe Kestenbaum, 114 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. filed by Cubitac Corp., Hindy Weiss, Menachem Weiss, Alex Lowy, 118 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Dovid Kaplan, Joseph Rubin, Joshua Weider, Moshe Kestenbaum, 125 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Joel Friedman, Rivky Friedman, Silverst one Wireless, LLC. For the foregoing reasons, Counts III, IV, V, VI, VII, VIII, and IX are hereby DISMISSED in their entirety, with prejudice.13 As such, all defendants other than Northeast and Castillo are TERMINATED as parties to this action. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions at ECF Nos. 114, 118, 119, 123, 125, and 129. A separate scheduling order will issue. SO ORDERED. (Samuel Brach, Cubitac Corp., D-Tech Management Company, Joel Friedlander, Joel Friedman, Rivky Friedm an, John Does (1-50), Dovid Kaplan, Moshe Kestenbaum, Eliezer Kohen, Alex Lowy, Hava Reichman, Joseph Rubin, Silverstone Wireless, LLC, Joshua Weider, Hindy Weiss, Menachem Weiss, ABC Companies (1-50) and Joshua Brach terminated.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 10/27/2017) (anc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elavon, Inc. v. Northeast Advance Technologies Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northeast Advance Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esteban Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elavon, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Ginzburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?