December 18, 2023 |
Filing
611
OPINION & ORDER. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff's Motion is denied. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the pending Motion. (Dkt. No. 508.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/18/23) (yv) Modified on 12/18/2023 (yv).
|
November 30, 2023 |
Filing
610
ORDER granting 609 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Granted. The conference is adjourned to 12/18/2023 at 10:00 via teleconference. So Ordered. (Telephone Conference set for 12/18/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/30/23) (yv)
|
May 5, 2023 |
Filing
601
NOTICE OF TELECONFERENCE INFORMATION. For the week of May 8, 2023, the Court will hold all civil conferences, hearings, and/or oral arguments in the above-numbered Action by telephone. Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time: Meeting Dial-In Number (USA toll-free): (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 7702195. Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign (#). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 5/5/23) (yv)
|
April 4, 2023 |
Filing
597
ORDER granting 596 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 4/4/23) (yv)
|
August 9, 2022 |
Filing
564
ORDER granting 563 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 8/9/22) (yv)
|
May 13, 2022 |
Filing
547
NOTICE OF TELECONFERENCE INFORMATION: For the week of May 16, 2022, the Court will hold all civil conferences, hearings, and/or oral arguments in the above-captioned matter by telephone. Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time : Meeting Dial-In Number (USA toll-free): (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 7702195 Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign (#). Given that much of the Court is operating remotely and has limited mail capability, counsel involv ed in any pro se cases shall mail a copy of this Notice to or otherwise inform the pro se party of the above teleconference information. Counsel in any pro se inmate cases shall ensure that the pro se party is on the line before calling the above-re ferenced number.For initial conferences, counsel shall submit a proposed case management and discovery schedule via ECF by 5 p.m. on the evening before the initial conference. Any requests for adjournments should be filed as soon as possible and clearly explain why the conference should be adjourned. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 5/13/2022) (ama)
|
April 20, 2022 |
Filing
544
ORDER denying 474 Motion to Stay re: 474 LETTER MOTION to Stay re: 473 Order,, addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Steven Y. Yurowitz dated 10/21/2021. Accordingly, the Friedman Defendants' motion is DENIED. The Clerk is respectfully directed to te1minate the motion (Dkt. 494). SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 4/20/2022) (ks)
|
November 1, 2021 |
Filing
482
ORDER granting 481 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/1/21) (yv)
|
October 14, 2021 |
Filing
473
ORDER: The Court has now reviewed the emails chains in camera, Plaintiffs motion to compel production of unredacted versions of the emails is GRANTED, substantially for the reasons set forth in this Court's Memorandum and Order dated Decembe r 20, 2020, which addressed related privilege claims advanced by the Friedman defendants. [Dkt. 408.] Transmedia shall produce the unredacted email chains within five business days of this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 10/14/2021) (ks)
|
September 27, 2021 |
Filing
465
ORDER granting 464 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Granted. The 10/12/21 conference is moved to 12/20/21, at 10:00. This, however, is the lastextension of any kind. Not one more day will begranted. So Ordered. Status Conference set for 12/20/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/27/2021) (vfr)
|
September 21, 2021 |
Filing
461
SCHEDULING ORDER granting 457 Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference. The Court has scheduled a conference to address the motion filed at doc #457 for 9/30/2021 at 10 am before Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison. Counsel will be provided with a Teams link for the video portion of the conference. In addition, on a separate phone line counsel should call 877-336-1839 and use access code 5999739. Members of the press and public may call the same number, but will not be permitted to speak during the conference. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 9/21/2021) Telephone Conference set for 9/30/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison. (ks)
|
July 19, 2021 |
Filing
447
SCHEDULING ORDER granting 446 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The in person conference scheduled for July 22, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. before the Hon. Paul E. Davison, U.S.M.J., is changed to a video/telephone conference on the same date and time. All parties will call in to 877-336-1839 and use access code 5999739. In addition, a video link on the Teams platform will also be provided to counsel. Any other party wishing to join the video link should contact chambers at 914-390-4250. All parties who will not be speaking should mute their telephones. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 7/22/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 7/19/2021) (kv)
|
June 30, 2021 |
Filing
442
ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record at the Oral Argument on June 30, 2021, the Court overrules the Freidman Defendants objections and adopts Magistrate Judge Davison's Memorandum and Order dated December 10, 2020 in its entirety. (Dkt. No. 408.) The Court lifts the current stay so that discovery may proceed consistent with this Order. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 6/30/2021) (cf)
|
June 25, 2021 |
Filing
441
ORDER: For the week of June 28, 2021, the Court will hold all civil conferences, hearings, and/or oral arguments by telephone. Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time: Meeting Dial-In Number (USA toll-free): (888) 363-4749 Acce ss Code: 7702195 Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign (#). Given that much of the Court is operating remotely and has limited mail capability, counsel involved in any pro se cases shall mail a copy of this Notice to or ot herwise inform the pro se party of the above teleconference information. Counsel in any pro se inmate cases shall ensure that the pro se party is on the line before calling the above-referenced number. For initial conferences, counsel shall submit a proposed case management and discovery schedule via ECF by 5 p.m. on the evening before the initial conference. Any requests for adjournments should be filed as soon as possible and clearly explain why the conference should be adjourned. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 6/25/2021) (nb)
|
June 17, 2021 |
Filing
440
ORDER DIRECTING NON-PARTIES JERUSALEM SHROUDS LLC AND THE PILLARSTONE GROUP, INC. TO COMPLY WITH SUBPOENAS granting 439 Letter Motion to Compel. it is hereby ORDERED that Elavon's Application is GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that, w ithin 14 days of service of this Order together with a copy of the Subpoena served upon Jernsalem Shrouds earlier, Jernsalem Shrouds shall contact, or shall direct its counsel to confer with, Elavon's counsel concerning its compliance with the S ubpoena; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that, within 14 days of service of this Order together with a copy of the Subpoena served upon Pillarstone earlier, Pillarstone shall contact, or shall direct its counsel to confer with, Elavon's counsel concer ning its compliance with the Subpoena; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that service of this Order shall be made by personal service upon any principal, agent (other than the New York Secretary of State) or owner of Jerusalem Shrouds and Pillarstone. Clerk shall close Dkt. #439. IT IS SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 6/17/2021) (kv)
|
June 9, 2021 |
Filing
438
CALENDAR NOTICE, Please take notice that the above captioned action has been scheduled for oral argument on the Objections to Magistrate Davison's MEMORANDUM AND ORDER before the Honorable Kenneth M. Karas, United States District Judge, on Wedn esday June 30, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. NOTICE OF TELECONFERENCE INFORMATION: Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time: Meeting Dial-In Number (USA toll-free): (888) 363-4749, Access Code: 7702195. Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign(#). So Ordered. ( Telephone Conference set for 6/30/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 6/9/21) (yv)
|
April 22, 2021 |
Filing
436
ORDER granting 414 Letter Motion to Stay re: 414 LETTER MOTION to Stay re: 413 Brief in Support of Objections addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Meyer Y. Silber dated December 24, 2020. The Court grants the stay pending the determination of the Friedmans' Objections. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 4/22/21) (yv)
|
February 9, 2021 |
Filing
425
ORDER denying 363 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. For the reasons stated on the record at the Oral Argument on February 9, 2021, the Court denies Plaintiff's Motion To Disqualify. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to terminate the pending Motion. (Dkt. No. 363.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 2/9/2021) (jca)
|
February 5, 2021 |
Filing
422
NOTICE OF TELECONFERENCE INFORMATION: For the week of February 8, 2021, the Court will hold all civil conferences, hearings, and/or oral arguments by telephone. Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time: Meeting Dial-In Number (USA toll-free): (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 7702195 Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign (#). Given that much of the Court is operating remotely and has limited mail capability, counsel involved in any pro se cases shal l mail a copy of this Notice to or otherwise inform the pro se party of the above teleconference information. Counsel in any pro se inmate cases shall ensure that the pro se party is on the line before calling the above-referenced number. For init ial conferences, counsel shall submit a proposed case management and discovery schedule via ECF by 5 p.m. on the evening before the initial conference. Any requests for adjournments should be filed as soon as possible and clearly explain why the conference should be adjourned. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 2/5/2021) (jca)
|
January 15, 2021 |
Filing
418
ORDER: For the week of January 18, 2021, the Court will hold all civil conferences, hearings, and/or oral arguments by telephone. Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time: Meeting Dial-In Number (USA toll-free): (888) 363-474 9 Access Code: 7702195 Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign (#). Given that much of the Court is operating remotely and has limited mail capability, counsel involved in any pro se cases shall mail a copy of this Notice to or otherwise inform the pro se party of the above teleconference information. Counsel in any pro se inmate cases shall ensure that the pro se party is on the line before calling the above-referenced number. For initial conferences, counsel shal l submit a proposed case management and discovery schedule via ECF by 5 p.m. on the evening before the initial conference. Any requests for adjournments should be filed as soon as possible and clearly explain why the conference should be adjourned. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 1/15/2021) (jca)
|
December 10, 2020 |
Filing
408
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 393 Motion for Protective Order. ; granting in part and denying in part 393 Motion to Compel. The Friedmans' motions are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as set forth above. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at Docket No. 393. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 12/10/2020) (va)
|
December 9, 2020 |
Filing
406
CALENDAR NOTICE: Please take notice that the above captioned action has been scheduled for oral argument on the pending Motion to Disqualify before the Honorable Kenneth M. Karas, United States District Judge, on Wednesday, January 20, 2021 at 2:0 0 p.m. NOTICE OF TELECONFERENCE INFORMATION: The Court will hold all civil conferences, hearings, and/or oral arguments by telephone. Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time: Meeting Dial-In Number (USA toll-free): (888) 36 3-4749 Access Code: 7702195 Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign(#). Given that much of the Court is operating remotely and has limited mail capability, counsel involved in any pro se cases shall mail a copy of this No tice to or otherwise inform the pro se party of the above teleconference information. Counsel in any pro se inmate cases shall ensure that the pro se party is on the line before calling the above-referenced number. Any requests for adjournments s hould be filed as soon as possible and clearly explain why the conference should be adjourned. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 1/20/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/7/2020) (jca)
|
July 16, 2020 |
Filing
359
ORDER DIRECTING NON-PARTY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S SUBPOENA FOR DOCUMENTS AND TESTIMONY: it is hereby ORDERED that Elavon's Application is GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that, within 14 days of service of this Order, BANA shall direct its counsel to confer with Elavon's counsel concerning its response to the Subpoena or show cause, in writing, why Elavon's subpoena should not be so enforced; and it is FURTHERE ORDERED that service of this Order shall be made by mailing a copy hereof to BANA's registered agent and by hand delivery to any BANA brance office. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 7/16/2020) (ks)
|
July 9, 2020 |
Filing
350
ORDER granting 349 Letter Motion to Seal. ECF Doc. No. 345-3 shall be sealed. Counsel should supply an unredacted copy to chambers. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 7/9/2020) (cf)
|
April 10, 2020 |
Filing
318
ORDER: Beginning March 30, 2020, until further notice, all parties to civil conferences before Judge Davison shall attend by phone, using the following information: Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1839 Access Code: 5999739 The parties should call in f rom a landline and announce their names before speaking. For Settlement Conferences: Clients should NOT be on the conference call. Counsel must have ready telephonic access to clients. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 4/10/2020) (ks)
|
December 18, 2019 |
Filing
297
ORDER denying 292 MOTION for Reargument re: 291 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document. Denied. Plaintiff raises nothing new in its Motion for Reargument, and Plaintiff's original motions for reconsideration and to amend have already been decided by the Court. Plaintiff must submit its Third Amended Complaint by no later than January 20, 2020 and must include all claims it intends to bring therein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/18/2019) (jca)
|
October 27, 2017 |
Filing
159
OPINION & ORDER re: 123 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. filed by Hava Reichman, 129 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by D-Tech Management Company, Esteban Castillo, Joshua Brach, Northeast Advan ce Technologies Inc., Samuel Brach, 119 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Dovid Kaplan, Joseph Rubin, Joshua Weider, Moshe Kestenbaum, 114 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. filed by Cubitac Corp., Hindy Weiss, Menachem Weiss, Alex Lowy, 118 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Dovid Kaplan, Joseph Rubin, Joshua Weider, Moshe Kestenbaum, 125 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Joel Friedman, Rivky Friedman, Silverst one Wireless, LLC. For the foregoing reasons, Counts III, IV, V, VI, VII, VIII, and IX are hereby DISMISSED in their entirety, with prejudice.13 As such, all defendants other than Northeast and Castillo are TERMINATED as parties to this action. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions at ECF Nos. 114, 118, 119, 123, 125, and 129. A separate scheduling order will issue. SO ORDERED. (Samuel Brach, Cubitac Corp., D-Tech Management Company, Joel Friedlander, Joel Friedman, Rivky Friedm an, John Does (1-50), Dovid Kaplan, Moshe Kestenbaum, Eliezer Kohen, Alex Lowy, Hava Reichman, Joseph Rubin, Silverstone Wireless, LLC, Joshua Weider, Hindy Weiss, Menachem Weiss, ABC Companies (1-50) and Joshua Brach terminated.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 10/27/2017) (anc)
|